Williamson v. Hass et al

Defendant: Meaghan E Walters, Todd Vonhiltmayer, Rondall Hass, Joe Scott and Marrylou Kraft
Plaintiff: Rodney Williamson
Case Number: 1:2013cv11066
Filed: March 8, 2013
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
County: Chippewa
Presiding Judge: Thomas L. Ludington
Referring Judge: Mark A. Randon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 50 Report and Recommendation, Denying in Part and Holding in Abeyance in Part 23 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion for TRO filed by Rodney Williamson. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (SGam)
April 24, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 60 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (MWil)
April 25, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING without PREJUDICE Plaintiff's 62 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (MWil)
May 14, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 67 Report and Recommendation and denying 23 Motion for Emergency Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (SGam)
November 18, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court [DOCKETING ERROR- WRONG IMAGE ASSOCIATED] OPINION and ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 70 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (Loury, R) Modified on 11/18/2014 (Loury, R). (Main Document 85 replaced on 11/18/2014) (Loury, R).
November 18, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court [DOCKETING ERROR- WRONG IMAGE ASSOCIATED] OPINION and ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 71 Motion for Relief from Judgment. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (Loury, R) Modified on 11/18/2014 (Loury, R). (Main Document 86 replaced on 11/18/2014) (Loury, R).
November 18, 2014 89 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 70 MOTION for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (Loury, R)
November 18, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 71 MOTION for Relief from Judgment. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (Loury, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williamson v. Hass et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meaghan E Walters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Vonhiltmayer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rondall Hass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Scott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marrylou Kraft
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Williamson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]