Sandy Frank Productions LLC v. Michigan Film Office et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Sandy Frank Productions LLC
Defendant: Michigan Film Office and Michigan Department of Treasury, Business Tax Division
Case Number: 2:2011cv10933
Filed: March 9, 2011
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Gerald E. Rosen
Referring Judge: Mona K. Majzoub
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 2, 2011 16 REPLY to Response re 10 MOTION to Dismiss and Defendants' Brief in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Markman, Mary)
August 19, 2011 15 RESPONSE to 10 MOTION to Dismiss and Defendants' Brief in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Schlussel, Deborah)
August 18, 2011 14 NOTICE of hearing on 10 MOTION to Dismiss and Defendants' Brief in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2011 03:00 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (JHer)
August 5, 2011 Featured Case TEXT-ONLY ORDER Vacating 8 Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JHer)
August 2, 2011 13 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Sandy Frank Productions LLC. (Schlussel, Deborah)
August 2, 2011 12 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Michigan Department of Treasury, Business Tax Division served on 7/7/2011, answer due 7/28/2011. (Schlussel, Deborah)
August 2, 2011 11 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Michigan Film Office served on 7/7/2011, answer due 7/28/2011. (Schlussel, Deborah)
July 28, 2011 10 MOTION to Dismiss and Defendants' Brief in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss by Michigan Department of Treasury, Business Tax Division, Michigan Film Office. (Markman, Mary)
July 28, 2011 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mary K. Markman appearing on behalf of Michigan Department of Treasury, Business Tax Division, Michigan Film Office (Markman, Mary)
July 20, 2011 8 Featured Case ORDER for Sandy Frank Productions LLC to Show Cause why this Case should not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 8/1/2011 Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JHer)
May 18, 2011 7 Featured Case ORDER of DISQUALIFICATION and REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Gerald E. Rosen to District Judge Sean F. Cox. (SSch)
March 30, 2011 6 Featured Case ORDER VACATING 4 Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (RGun)
March 28, 2011 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by All Plaintiffs. (Schlussel, Deborah)
March 15, 2011 4 Featured Case ORDER for Sandy Frank Productions LLC to Show Cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Gerald E. Rosen. (RGun)
March 9, 2011 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Michigan Department of Treasury, Business Tax Division*. (CGre)
March 9, 2011 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Michigan Film Office*. (CGre)
March 9, 2011 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sandy Frank Productions LLC against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-2876615 - Fee: $ 350. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Ingham. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Schlussel, Deborah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandy Frank Productions LLC v. Michigan Film Office et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Frank Productions LLC
Represented By: Deborah K. Schlussel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Film Office
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Department of Treasury, Business Tax Division
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]