Does et al v. SNYDER et al

Defendant: KRISTE ETUE and RICHARD D. SNYDER
Plaintiff: John Does and Mary Doe
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv11194
Filed: March 16, 2012
 
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Robert H. Cleland
Referring Judge: David R. Grand
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Motion to Proceed Anonymously and Directing Parties to Submit Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (Werner, L)
May 1, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
May 18, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING 18 Response to Motion, filed by Mary Doe, John Does, AND GRANTING IN PART 17 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Mary Doe, John Does. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
March 18, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Defendant's Amended Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
November 27, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER granting 42 Joint Motion Extending Discovery and other Dates Discovery cutoff 1/3/2014 and Dispositive Motion Deadline is 2/6/2014. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
December 6, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding 47 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Access to Michigan State Police Training on Sex Offender Registration Data Management System. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
March 3, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STRIKE 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment and granting leave for defendants to refile with additional redactions. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
March 14, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Suspending Briefing and Directing Parties to Appear for a ( Status Conference set for 4/15/2014 10:00 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
May 1, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING New Briefing Schedule and Page Limits for Rule 52 Motions and Briefs; DENYING without prejudice 58 Motion for Summary Judgment; 79 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs' Rule 52 Motion for Judgement due by 6/11/2014; Defendants' Response and Motion for Judgment due by 7/2/2014; Plaintiffs' Response and Reply due by 7/23/2014 and Defendants' Optional Reply due by 8/6/2014, . Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Does et al v. SNYDER et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRISTE ETUE
Represented By: Erik A. Grill
Represented By: Margaret A. Nelson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD D. SNYDER
Represented By: Erik A. Grill
Represented By: Margaret A. Nelson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Does
Represented By: William W. Swor
Represented By: Michael J. Steinberg
Represented By: Paul D. Reingold
Represented By: Miriam J. Aukerman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Doe
Represented By: Miriam J. Aukerman
Represented By: Paul D. Reingold
Represented By: Michael J. Steinberg
Represented By: William W. Swor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]