Byrd v. United States of America

Defendant: United States of America
Plaintiff: Bennie Byrd, III
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv12174
Filed: May 16, 2012
 
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
Office: Detroit Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Patrick J. Duggan
Referring Judge: David R. Grand
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2012 12 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER granting 5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)
February 7, 2013 24 Featured Case OPINION & ORDER denying 16 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 20 Motion To Amend Judgment & Set Aside Judgment. Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)
January 10, 2014 34 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER denying 31 MOTION to Set Aside 12 Order on Motion to Dismiss, 13 Judgment MOTION to Reopen Case, 32 MOTION Void Order and Judgment ;. Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)
March 3, 2014 36 Featured Case ORDER denying 35 Motion for Reconsideration re 34 Order on Motion to Set Aside, Order on Motion to Reopen Case, Order on Motion - Free filed by Bennie Byrd, III, COURT WILL TERMINATE ANY ADDITIONAL MOTIONS WITHOUT FUTHER ACTION OR EXPLANATION. Signed by District Judge Patrick J. Duggan. (MOre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Byrd v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bennie Byrd, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]