Gordon et al v. Urbahns

Plaintiff: Fred Gordon, William Widmyer, Oscar Stefanutti, Brown Road Group, BFO Investment Company and REFCO, Inc.
Defendant: John Urbahns
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv13724
Filed: August 22, 2012
 
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
Office: Detroit Office
County: Oakland
Referring Judge: David R. Grand
Presiding Judge: George Caram Steeh
 
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Motion to Dismiss as moot 12 . Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
April 18, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 20 defendant's Motion to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh (MBea)
September 3, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration and granting in part and denying in part 35 plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a second amended complaint. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh (MBea)
October 8, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 40 defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh (MBea)
September 28, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing 4 Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh (MBea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gordon et al v. Urbahns
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Gordon
Represented By: Michael F. Wais
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Widmyer
Represented By: Michael F. Wais
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Stefanutti
Represented By: Michael F. Wais
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brown Road Group
Represented By: Michael F. Wais
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BFO Investment Company
Represented By: Michael F. Wais
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REFCO, Inc.
Represented By: Michael F. Wais
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Urbahns
Represented By: Patrick N. Butler
Represented By: Laura Donnelly Faussie'
Represented By: Jonathan T. Walton, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]