Lake v. Cavaliere et al

Defendant: Lifestyle Lifts Holding Inc, Salvatore Cavaliere and Lifestyle Lifts Holding II Inc
Plaintiff: Penny S Lake
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv14976
Filed: November 9, 2012
 
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
County: Wayne
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER Denying MOTION for Default Judgment 11 as moot and Denying Portion of MOTION Set Aside Default and Dismiss 14 as moot. (motion to quash service of process denied as moot also - remainder of motion to be heard on 3/21/13 at 9:30 AM) Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
March 25, 2013 26 Featured Case ORDER vacating 3/21/2013 minute order granting MOTION to Dismiss filed by Salvatore Cavaliere 14 and permitting limited discovery on the notice issue. TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 5/30/2013 01:30 PM before District Judge George Caram Steeh Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
July 3, 2013 30 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER denying defendant Cavalier's Motion to dismiss 14 . Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh (MBea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lake v. Cavaliere et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifestyle Lifts Holding Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salvatore Cavaliere
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifestyle Lifts Holding II Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny S Lake
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]