Bricklayers Pension Trust Fund - Metropolitan Area et al v. River City Contracting, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Bricklayers Holiday Trust Fund, Metropolitan Area, Bricklayers International Masonry Institute, Labor-Management Cooperation Committee, Bricklayers and Trowel Trades International Retirement Savings Plan, Bricklayers and Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Bricklayers Pension Trust Fund - Metropolitan Area, Detroit Metropolitan Masonry Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee and Trowel Trades Health and Welfare Fund, Detroit and Vicinity
Defendant: River City Contracting, LLC, Willie L. Hartfield and Randy G Martinuzzi
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv10493
Filed: February 7, 2013
 
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
County: Wayne
Referring Judge: Laurie J. Michelson
Presiding Judge: George Caram Steeh
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER granting 11 Motion for Alternate Service. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh (MBea)
July 24, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER granting in part Motion to Strike defendant Willie L. Hartfield's letter or in the alternative, for a more definite statement 20 . Answer by Willie Hartfield due 8/14/13. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
August 19, 2013 26 Featured Case DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of plaintiffs against River City Contracting, LLC. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)
April 10, 2014 42 Featured Case ORDER for administrative closing due to bankruptcy stay as to Randy G Martinuzzi. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (MBea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bricklayers Pension Trust Fund - Metropolitan Area et al v. River City Contracting, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bricklayers Holiday Trust Fund, Metropolitan Area
Represented By: Brett P. Huebner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bricklayers International Masonry Institute
Represented By: Brett P. Huebner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Labor-Management Cooperation Committee
Represented By: Brett P. Huebner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bricklayers and Trowel Trades International Retirement Savings Plan
Represented By: Brett P. Huebner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bricklayers and Trowel Trades International Pension Fund
Represented By: Brett P. Huebner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bricklayers Pension Trust Fund - Metropolitan Area
Represented By: Brett P. Huebner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Detroit Metropolitan Masonry Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee
Represented By: Brett P. Huebner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trowel Trades Health and Welfare Fund, Detroit and Vicinity
Represented By: Brett P. Huebner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: River City Contracting, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie L. Hartfield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy G Martinuzzi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]