United States of America v. Davis et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Ronald Davis, Diane Davis and JP Morgan Chase Bank
Case Number: 2:2013cv11245
Filed: March 21, 2013
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
County: Oakland
Presiding Judge: Terrence G. Berg
Referring Judge: Laurie J. Michelson
Nature of Suit: Taxes

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 19 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, and GRANTING 24 MOTION to Preserve Claim of Expenses. (Affidavit and proposed order due by 10/3/2014) Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (Chubb, A)
April 29, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 34 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (Chubb, A)
April 29, 2015 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SALE. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (Chubb, A)
May 11, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Staying Execution of Judgment Pending Resolution of 42 Defendant's Objection to Order of Sale. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (Chubb, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael R. Pahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Davis
Represented By: Neal Nusholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Davis
Represented By: Neal Nusholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.