The Huntington National Bank v. Najero, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: The Huntington National Bank
Defendant: Najero, Inc., Norian Properties, Inc., Kara Development, L.L.C., NCI Services, Inc., Ice Box Sports Center, L.L.C., Johno P Norian and Hagop Norian
Case Number: 2:2013cv11632
Filed: April 11, 2013
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Robert H. Cleland
Referring Judge: Michael J. Hluchaniuk
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing the Parties to Engage in Mediation and setting ( Status Conference for 8/29/2013 11:00 AM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland) Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
August 30, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (Monda, H)
June 19, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED ORDER granting 27 Motion to Appoint Receiver. M. Shapiro Development Company, LLC appointed; case reinstated. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (DPer)
September 15, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 32 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
September 15, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff against Defendants in the amount of $1,552,140.11 (LWag)
October 27, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 37 receiver's Expedited Motion to Confirm Contract for Sale of Real Property. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Huntington National Bank v. Najero, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Huntington National Bank
Represented By: Douglas C. Bernstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Najero, Inc.
Represented By: Jerome D. Frank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norian Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Jerome D. Frank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kara Development, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jerome D. Frank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCI Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jerome D. Frank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ice Box Sports Center, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jerome D. Frank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johno P Norian
Represented By: Jerome D. Frank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hagop Norian
Represented By: Jerome D. Frank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]