Keary et al v. U.S. Bank National Association ND et al

Defendant: First Mountain Properties, LLC and U.S. Bank National Association ND
Plaintiff: James Robert Keary, Pennie L Keary and Dwight Bennett
 
Case Number: 5:2012cv15359
Filed: December 6, 2012
 
Court: Michigan Eastern District Court
County: Macomb
Presiding Judge: Mark A. Goldsmith
Referring Judge: Mona K. Majzoub
 
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' 11 Motion for Recusal. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Goltz, D)
May 30, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER REJECTING the Magistrate Judge's 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Dated May 13, 2013 and Returning the Matter to the Magistrate Judge for Further Proceedings. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Goltz, D)
June 6, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER WITHDRAWING the 25 Order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge and Denying Plaintiffs' 19 Motion for Relief Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 60(b). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Goltz, D)
December 18, 2012 3 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER of Summary Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (Goltz, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Keary et al v. U.S. Bank National Association ND et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Mountain Properties, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association ND
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Robert Keary
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pennie L Keary
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Bennett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]