Weiss et al v. Kempthorne et al

Defendant: Benton Harbor, City of, Rebecca A. Humphries, Dirk Kempthorne, Mary A. Bomar and Ernest Quintana
Movant: Harbor Shores Community Redevelopment, Inc.
Plaintiff: Julie Weiss, Nicole Moon, Emma Kinnard, James H. Duncan, Lea'Anna Locey, Scott Elliott and Ronnie Whitelow
Case Number: 1:2008cv01031
Filed: November 3, 2008
Court: Michigan Western District Court
Office: Environmental Matters Office
County: Berrien
Presiding Judge: Judge Robert Holmes Bell
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2009 117 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
January 15, 2010 138 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
October 6, 2008 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 10/6/08. (KD) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/3/2008.]
April 7, 2009 83 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION granting 33 motion to dismiss and denying request for an award of attorney's fees and costs; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weiss et al v. Kempthorne et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benton Harbor, City of
Represented By: Brad H. Sysol
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca A. Humphries
Represented By: Louis B. Reinwasser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dirk Kempthorne
Represented By: Joseph Hosu Kim
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary A. Bomar
Represented By: Joseph Hosu Kim
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Quintana
Represented By: Joseph Hosu Kim
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Harbor Shores Community Redevelopment, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin A. Ewing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Weiss
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Moon
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Kinnard
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James H. Duncan
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lea'Anna Locey
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Elliott
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Whitelow
Represented By: Terry J. Lodge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]