Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Lady Godiva's, Inc. et al Featured Case

Defendant: Mark London, Sensations, Inc. and Lady Godiva's Inc.
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., E.O. Smith Music, Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC and EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv01001
Filed: September 20, 2011
 
Court: Michigan Western District Court
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: Kent
Presiding Judge: Robert Holmes Bell
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
February 9, 2012 Certified Copy of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright 25 sent via U.S. Mail to Register of Copyrights (mkc)
February 8, 2012 25 REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Register of Copyrights on the determination of a COPYRIGHT ACTION (mkc)
February 8, 2012 24 Featured Case ORDER of dismissal with prejudice 23 ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
February 7, 2012 23 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Stipulation and Order of Dismissal With Prejudice by all parties by plaintiffs Broadcast Music, Inc., E.O. Smith Music, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC (Wezner, Michelle)
January 25, 2012 22 Featured Case ORDER granting STIPULATION 21 extending deadline until February 3, 2012 for defendants/counter-plaintiffs to respond to plaintiffs' combined motion for 12(b)(6) dismissal of counterclaim, and until February 20, 2012 for plaintiffs/counter-defendants to file a reply; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
January 20, 2012 21 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER by defendants Lady Godiva's Inc., Mark London, Sensations, Inc. (Pfeiffle, Alexander)
December 27, 2011 20 Featured Case ORDER granting STIPULATION 19 extending deadline until January 20, 2012 for defendants/counter-plaintiffs to respond to plaintiffs' combined motion for 12(b)(6) dismissal of the counterclaim. Plaintiffs/counter-defendants may file a reply brief up to, and including, February 6, 2012 ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
December 22, 2011 19 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER by defendants Lady Godiva's Inc., Mark London, Sensations, Inc. (Pfeiffle, Alexander)
December 8, 2011 18 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: final pretrial conference set for 6/19/2012 at 1:15 PM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Robert Holmes Bell; bench trial set for 6/25/2012 at 9:00 AM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Robert Holmes Bell ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
December 7, 2011 17 MINUTES of scheduling conference by telephone held before Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
December 2, 2011 16 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Wezner, Michelle)
November 29, 2011 15 COMBINED MOTION AND BRIEF for 12(b)(6) dismissal of Counterclaim (inlcuding Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC d/b/a Universal Music Z Songs) with Certificate of Service by plaintiffs Broadcast Music, Inc., E.O. Smith Music, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.; (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - Topless Activity Permits and M.C.L. 436.1916, # 3 Exhibit B - Consent Judgment, # 4 Exhibit - Unpublished Opinions)(Wezner, Michelle) Modified text on 11/29/2011 (gjf).
November 14, 2011 14 Featured Case ORDER granting STIPULATION 13 ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, sdb)
November 10, 2011 13 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Deadline for Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants to Respond to Counterclaim by plaintiffs Broadcast Music, Inc., E.O. Smith Music, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC (Wezner, Michelle)
November 3, 2011 12 Featured Case ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 12/7/2011 at 04:00 PM before Judge Robert Holmes Bell; status report due by 12/2/2011; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, sdb)
November 2, 2011 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Michelle M. Wezner on behalf of plaintiffs Broadcast Music, Inc., E.O. Smith Music, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc. and Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC d/b/a Universal Music Z Songs (Wezner, Michelle)
October 25, 2011 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sensations, Inc. (Pfeiffle, Alexander)
October 25, 2011 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lady Godiva's Inc. (Pfeiffle, Alexander)
October 25, 2011 9 COUNTERCLAIM against Broadcast Music, Inc. with exhibits A-J filed by Lady Godiva's Inc., Sensations, Inc.(Pfeiffle, Alexander) Modified text on 10/26/2011 (gjf).
October 25, 2011 8 ANSWER to complaint 1 by Lady Godiva's Inc., Mark London(Pfeiffle, Alexander)
October 25, 2011 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Alexander Bryant Pfeiffle on behalf of defendants Lady Godiva's Inc., Mark London (Pfeiffle, Alexander)
October 12, 2011 7 SUMMONS returned executed; Mark London served on 10/7/2011, answer due 10/28/2011 (McCarthy, Patrick)
October 12, 2011 6 SUMMONS returned executed; Lady Godiva's Inc. served on 10/7/2011, answer due 10/28/2011 (McCarthy, Patrick)
September 26, 2011 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Lady Godiva's Inc., Mark London and returned to attorney for plaintiff (gjf)
September 23, 2011 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re 1 (McCarthy, Patrick)
September 20, 2011 Copy of complaint 1 and Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright 3 sent via U.S. Mail to Register of Copyrights (gjf)
September 20, 2011 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broadcast Music, Inc., E. O. SMITH MUSIC, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., UNIVERSAL MUSIC-Z TUNES LLC d/b/a UNIVERSAL MUSIC Z SONGS identifying Other Affiliate EMI GROUP GLOBAL LTD. for EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.; Other Affiliate VIVENDI SA for UNIVERSAL MUSIC-Z TUNES LLC d/b/a UNIVERSAL MUSIC Z SONGS (McCarthy, Patrick)
September 20, 2011 FILING FEE PAID re 1 by plaintiffs Broadcast Music, Inc., E. O. SMITH MUSIC, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., UNIVERSAL MUSIC-Z TUNES LLC d/b/a UNIVERSAL MUSIC Z SONGS in the amount of $350, receipt number 0646-2044481 (McCarthy, Patrick)
September 20, 2011 3 REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Register of Copyrights on the filing of a COPYRIGHT ACTION (gjf)
September 20, 2011 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED ; none provided by attorney (gjf)
September 20, 2011 2 NOTICE that this electronically-filed case has been assigned to Judge Robert Holmes Bell; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee and corporate disclosure statements (gjf)
September 20, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC d/b/a Universal Music Z Songs, E. O. Smith Music (McCarthy, Patrick) Modified text on 9/20/2011 (gjf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Lady Godiva's, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark London
Represented By: Alexander Bryant Pfeiffle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sensations, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Bryant Pfeiffle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lady Godiva's Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Bryant Pfeiffle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle M. Wezner
Represented By: Patrick M. McCarthy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.O. Smith Music
Represented By: Michelle M. Wezner
Represented By: Patrick M. McCarthy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music-Z Tunes LLC
Represented By: Michelle M. Wezner
Represented By: Patrick M. McCarthy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick M. McCarthy
Represented By: Michelle M. Wezner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]