Hertel, et al. v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., et al.

Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., MERSCORP, Inc., Marshall Isaacs, Jeanne Kivi, Ellen Coon, Bank of America, N.A., Chase Home Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., CitiMortgage, Inc., eTITLE Agency, Inc., 1st Choice Title Services, Inc., Attorneys Title Agency, LLC, JP Morgan Chase & Co., Unknown Party and Unknown Parties
Intervenor: Federal Housing Finance Agency
Plaintiff: Nancy Hutchins and Curtis Hertel
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00174
Filed: February 27, 2012
 
Court: Michigan Western District Court
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: Ingham
Presiding Judge: Robert Holmes Bell
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2013 102 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
March 25, 2013 116 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
April 29, 2013 129 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, sdb)
May 3, 2013 131 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
July 19, 2013 137 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
April 4, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER extending time for all defendants to respond to plaintiff's complaint until 21 days following entry of an order deciding plaintiff's motion to remand ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
October 4, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
November 20, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER dismissing Defendant 1st Choice Title Services ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
December 18, 2012 74 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hertel, et al. v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Ann Marie Uetz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Clark Summerfield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERSCORP, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Clark Summerfield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Isaacs
Represented By: Gerald V. Padilla
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne Kivi
Represented By: Brock Allen Swartzle
Represented By: Nicholas Benjamin Gorga
Represented By: Joseph Aviv
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Coon
Represented By: Brock Allen Swartzle
Represented By: Nicholas Benjamin Gorga
Represented By: Joseph Aviv
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Brian Clark Summerfield
Represented By: Joseph F. Yenouskas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Joseph H. Hickey
Represented By: Aaron L. Vorce
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Boettcher
Represented By: Patrick C. Lannen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas V. Panoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eTITLE Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy B. Myers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1st Choice Title Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorneys Title Agency, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Aviv
Represented By: Nicholas Benjamin Gorga
Represented By: Brock Allen Swartzle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Joseph H. Hickey
Represented By: Aaron L. Vorce
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Federal Housing Finance Agency
Represented By: Michael A.F. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Hutchins
Represented By: William E. Maxwell, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel P. Marsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Hertel
Represented By: Daniel P. Marsh
Represented By: William E. Maxwell, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]