Jackson #282320 v. Hogle et al

Defendant: Unknown Nevins, Mike Moran, Erica Huss and F. Hogle
Plaintiff: Curtis O. Jackson #282320
Case Number: 1:2013cv00475
Filed: May 2, 2013
Court: Michigan Western District Court
Office: Southern Division (1) Office
County: Ionia
Referring Judge: Ellen S. Carmody
Presiding Judge: Janet T. Neff
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 18, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 33 ; Plaintiff's motion for transfer 15 is DENIED; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
February 18, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 34 , Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 4 is DENIED; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
May 5, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 65 ; denying 25 motion for injunctive relief; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
September 2, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 82 ; denying motions 71 , 73 ; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
September 19, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 83 ; Defendants' motion for summary judgment 21 is GRANTED; Plaintiff's motion to file supplemental complaint 85 is DENIED; Judgment to issue; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson #282320 v. Hogle et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Nevins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Moran
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Huss
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Hogle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis O. Jackson #282320
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]