Henry v. Google, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Johnny Ishmel Henry
Defendant: Google, Inc. and AOL
 
Case Number: 2:2009cv00099
Filed: May 20, 2009
 
Court: Mississippi Southern District Court
Office: Hattiesburg Office
County: Jones
Referring Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: Keith Starrett
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2009 17 Featured Case ORDER granting 4 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 11/12/2009. (DM)
August 14, 2009 16 Rebuttal re 11 MOTION to Dismiss (In Support of Motion to Dismiss) filed by Google, Inc. (Held, Michael)
August 4, 2009 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re 11 MOTION to Dismiss, 4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Johnny Ishmel Henry (MJR)
July 31, 2009 Pro Hac Vice fee paid by (David Patron) $ 100, receipt number H011792 (MJR)
July 29, 2009 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. David Patron is hereby admitted pro hac vice upon registering for electronic filing and payment of the pro hac admission fee. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on July 29, 2009 (KPM)
July 29, 2009 14 MOTION for David Patron to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Certificate of Familiarity)(Held, Michael)
July 29, 2009 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Stuart Moran on behalf of Google, Inc. (Moran, Kyle)
July 29, 2009 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Google, Inc. (Held, Michael)
July 29, 2009 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A" - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit "A" - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit "B")(Held, Michael)
July 21, 2009 10 ATTACHMENT re 1 Complaint by Johnny Ishmel Henry (MJR)
July 20, 2009 9 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Hire Attorney. Plaintiff is granted thirty (30) additional days to hire an attorney and file his Answer to the Motion to Dismiss, making his response due on or before August 16, 2009. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on July 20, 2009 (dsl)
July 16, 2009 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Hire Attorney by Johnny Ishmel Henry (AKL)
July 9, 2009 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Responses due by 7/17/2009. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 7/9/09 (scp)
June 29, 2009 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Johnny Ishmel Henry (MJR)
June 24, 2009 6 Featured Case ORDER Setting Deadlines and Dates for Response/Rebuttal to Defendant AOL, LLC's 4 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's response is due on or before July 6, 2009. Defendants' rebuttal, if desired, is due on or before July 13, 2009. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on June 24, 2009 (dsl)
June 19, 2009 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re 4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by AOL (Slover, Roland)
June 19, 2009 4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by AOL (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Slover, Roland)
June 18, 2009 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Roland M. Slover on behalf of AOL (Slover, Roland)
May 20, 2009 2 Summons Issued as to Google, Inc., AOL. (MJR)
May 20, 2009 1 COMPLAINT against Google, Inc., AOL ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number H011645), filed by Johnny Ishmel Henry. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(MJR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Henry v. Google, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Ishmel Henry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AOL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]