Hinton v. Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Marsha Hinton |
Defendant: |
Rogers Sporting Goods Web Sales, LLC, Sportsman Supply, Inc., eBay, Inc., Amazon.com, LLC, Amazon.com.DEDC, LLC, American Sportsman Holdings Co., Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. and VMInnovations, Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv00237 |
Filed: |
October 25, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi |
Office: |
Hattiesburg Office |
County: |
Jones |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael T. Parker |
Presiding Judge: |
Keith Starrett |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract Product Liability |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 9, 2014 |
Filing
194
ORDER granting Defendant eBay, Inc.'s 181 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant eBay, Inc. is dismissed with prejudice. Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant Amazon.com.dedc, LLC are to contact the chambers of the U.S. Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker within seven (7) days of the entry of this Order to schedule a case management conference. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on December 9, 2014 (dsl)
|
September 29, 2014 |
Filing
190
ORDER denying Defendant Bass Pro's 75 Motion for Sanctions; granting Defendant Bass Pro's 76 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot Defendant DSG's 104 Motion to Sever; granting DSG's 109 Motion for Summary Judgm ent; denying Plaintiff's 143 Motion to Strike; denying Plaintiff's 144 Motion in Limine; and granting Plaintiff's 174 Motion for Leave to File Surrebuttal Brief. Additionally, within thirty-one (31) days of the entry of this Order, the Plaintiff shall take possession of the Muddy Outdoors climbing stick, "Exhibit "D" to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to DSG;'s Motion for Summary Judgment, from the Clerk of Court. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on September 29, 2014 (dsl)
|
February 26, 2014 |
Filing
142
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 118 Motion to Stay Proceedings as to Dick's Sporting Goods or in the Alternative for Additional Time Within Which to Respond to the Motion for Summary Judgment and Motion to Sever Filed by Dick's Sporting Goods. Plaintiff shall file her responses to Dick's Motion to Sever 104 and Motion for Summary Judgment 109 within seven (7) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on February 26, 2014 (dsl)
|
February 7, 2014 |
Filing
117
OPINION AND ORDER granting 111 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Plaintiff's time to respond to Bass Pro's Motion for Summary Judgment and Rule 11 Sanctions 75 , 76 is extended until 10 days after Bass Pro respondes to her written discovery requests. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 2/7/2014 (scp)
|
December 6, 2013 |
Filing
61
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 37 Counter-Motion for Pre-Conference Examination of Evidence and; denying Plaintiff's 12 Motion for Immediate Hearing on Plaintiff's Request for Permanent Injunction. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on December 6, 2013 (dsl)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Hinton v. Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Rogers Sporting Goods Web Sales, LLC |
Represented By: |
Russell Latino, III |
Represented By: |
John Stuart Robinson, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Sportsman Supply, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Kyle Stuart Moran |
Represented By: |
James P. Martin - PHV |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: eBay, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Joseph Anthony Sclafani |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Amazon.com, LLC |
Represented By: |
Patrick J. Schepens |
Represented By: |
Edward F. Rudiger |
Represented By: |
Lambert J. Hassinger - PHV, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Amazon.com.DEDC, LLC |
Represented By: |
Patrick J. Schepens |
Represented By: |
Lambert J. Hassinger - PHV, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Edward F. Rudiger |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: American Sportsman Holdings Co. |
Represented By: |
Barry B. Sutton - PHV |
Represented By: |
Timothy J. Sterling |
Represented By: |
Charles Greg Copeland |
Represented By: |
Bishop A. Bartoni - PHV |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Dick's Sporting Goods, Inc. |
Represented By: |
William Polk Thomas |
Represented By: |
Meade W. Mitchell |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: VMInnovations, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Grover Clark Monroe, II |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Marsha Hinton |
Represented By: |
Leslie D. Roussell |
Represented By: |
Lawrence E. Abernathy, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?