Havard v. Epps et al

Plaintiff: Jeffrey Havard
Defendant: Christopher Epps and Jim Hood
Case Number: 5:2008cv00275
Filed: September 15, 2008
Court: Mississippi Southern District Court
Office: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 34 Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery. Plaintiff's 36 Motion for an Evidentiary Hearing is denied without prejudice to Havard's right to re-urge this motion at a later date. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on May 10, 2010 (dsl)
August 30, 2013 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 74 Motion to Clarify; denying 77 Motion to Seal Case. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 8/30/2013 (scp)
May 22, 2014 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 85 Motion to Stay Proceedings. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove this case from the Court's active docket. Petitioner should notify the Court within 30 days of a final adjudication of his request to file a successive petition. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 5/22/2014 (scp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Havard v. Epps et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Havard
Represented By: James M. Priest, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Epps
Represented By: Marvin L. White, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Hood
Represented By: Marvin L. White, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]