Brown v. Epps et al

Plaintiff: Joseph Patrick Brown
Defendant: Christopher Epps and Emmitt Sparkman
Case Number: 5:2012cv00091
Filed: February 29, 2012
Court: Mississippi Southern District Court
Office: Western Office
County: Sunflower
Presiding Judge: Halil S. Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion to Extend Deadline to Amend Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; amendment due on or before August 30, 2013. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on July 24, 2013 (Rushing, Terryl)
August 13, 2012 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Settling Deadlines for Application to Proceed in forma Pauperis and Motion for Appointment of counsel, both to be filed by September 10, 2012. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on August 13, 2012 (Rushing, Terryl)
August 4, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion to Stay and Abate Pending State Court Successive Petition; Clerk of Court directed to remove case from active docket; Petitioner ordered to notify Court within 30 days of final adjudication of request to file successive petition. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on August 4, 2014 (Rushing, Terryl)
February 19, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING DEADLINES FOR APPOINTING NEW COUNSEL. Mark Jicka and Graham Carner appointed, subject to submission of Motion for Appointment of Counsel and Application to Proceed in forma Pauperis on or before March 20, 2013. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on February 19, 2013 (Rushing, Terryl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Epps et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Patrick Brown
Represented By: James W. Craig
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Epps
Represented By: Jason L. Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emmitt Sparkman
Represented By: Jason L. Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]