M Street Investments, Inc. v. Zurich American Insurance Company et al

Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company, Belfor Group USA, Inc. and Gary Wilborn
Plaintiff: M Street Investments, Inc.
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00047
Filed: April 1, 2013
 
Court: Mississippi Southern District Court
Office: Western Office
County: Warren
Referring Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: David C. Bramlette
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on June 3, 2013. (KM)
August 2, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on August 2, 2013. (js)
August 8, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Motion to Compel Appraisal and Appoint Umpire. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 8/8/2013 (dtj)
September 23, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 64 MOTION to Appoint Expert Umpire filed by Zurich American Insurance Company, 54 Emergency MOTION to Compel Compliance with OrderEmergency MOTION for Contempt and Sanctions filed by M Street Investment s, Inc. Within five (5) days of the entry of this Order each side shall submit suggested qualifications for the Umpire to be selected. Upon receipt of responses from each party, the Court will proceed with the appointment. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 9/23/13 (dtj)
October 8, 2013 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on October 8, 2013. (lda)
October 15, 2013 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING UMPIRE. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on October 15, 2013. (lda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: M Street Investments, Inc. v. Zurich American Insurance Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard Edward King
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belfor Group USA, Inc.
Represented By: Adria L. Hertwig
Represented By: Bradley C. Moody
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Wilborn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M Street Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Tina L. Nicholson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]