PacifiCorp v. Real Bird et al

 
Case Number: 1:2006cv00122
Filed: August 24, 2006
 
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Billings Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Cebull
 
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 24, 2008 120 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 39 Amended Complaint, filed by PacifiCorp Objections to F&R due by 12/12/2008. Signed by Magistrate Carolyn S Ostby on 11/24/2008. (AMC, ) Modified on 11/25/2008 to add link to 103 Motion for Entry by Default of Preliminary Condemnation Order (JDH).
January 5, 2009 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 103 Motion for Order/Judgment, filed by PacifiCorp, 120 Findings and Recommendations,. Signed by Judge Richard F. Cebull on 1/5/2009. (CAA, )
April 27, 2009 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 77 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by PacifiCorp, re 85 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by James Real Bird, Kennard Real Bird, Richard Real Bird, Henry Real Bird, Manuela Real Bird, Birdena Real Bird, and re 81 Motion to Stay filed by PacifiCorp. Signed by Judge Richard F. Cebull on 4/27/2009. See attached order for specifics. (CAA, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: PacifiCorp v. Real Bird et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]