United States of America v. Ohlin et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Ronald E. Ohlin, Beverly J. Ohlin, State of Montana, Department of Revenue and Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Case Number: 1:2009cv00013
Filed: February 11, 2009
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Taxes Office
County: YELLOWSTONE
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Cebull
Referring Judge: Carolyn S Ostby
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 26:7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending GRANTING of 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States of America. Objections to F&R due by 12/24/2009. READ FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS FOR ALL DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Carolyn S Ostby on 12/7/2009. (Hard-copy mailed to Ronald and Beverly Ohlin.) (POC, )
January 6, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 45 Findings and Recommendations, 21 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Richard F. Cebull on 1/6/2010. (TMD, ) Modified on 1/6/2010 to indicate hard copy mailed to Beverly and Ronald Ohlin (TMD, ).
January 6, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS (TO CORRECT THE DATE ON THE ORIGINAL ORDER TO READ 1/6/2010 INSTEAD OF 1/6/2009). Signed by Judge Richard F. Cebull on 1/6/2010. (TMD, ) Modified on 1/7/2010 to indicate hard copies mailed to Ronald and Beverly Ohlin (TMD, ). Modified on 1/7/2010 to correct filing date. (TMD, ).
February 10, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 51 Ohlins' PRO SE MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Beverly J. Ohlin, Ronald E. Ohlin. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Ohlins' Motion to Dismiss be DENIED. Objections to F&R due by 3/1/2010. Signed by Magistrate Carolyn S Ostby on 2/10/2010. (Hard-copy mailed to Ronald and Beverly Ohlin.) (POC, )
March 5, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Ohlin's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgemtn is DENIED for 51 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Beverly J. Ohlin, Ronald E. Ohlin, 55 Findings and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Richard F. Cebull on 3/5/2010. (C/C to Beverly and Ronald Ohlin) (AMC, )
June 1, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 61 Findings and Recommendations, denying 59 Motion to Stay filed by Beverly J. Ohlin, Ronald E. Ohlin. Signed by Judge Richard F. Cebull on 6/1/2010. (CAA, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Ohlin et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William W. Mercer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald E. Ohlin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly J. Ohlin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Montana
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Revenue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]