Heart K. Land & Cattle Co. v. Sakal et al

Counter_defendant: All Other Persons Unknown, Heart K. Land & Cattle Co., Internal Revenue Service, Montana Department of Revenue and United States Government Department of the Treasury
Cross_defendant: Montana Department of Revenue, All Other Persons Unknown, Internal Revenue Service and United States Government Department of the Treasury
Cross_claimant: Lauren E. Long
Counter_claimant: Lauren E. Long and Francis A. Sakal
Defendant: All Other Persons Unknown, Francis A. Sakal, Lauren E. Long, Internal Revenue Service, United States Government Department of the Treasury and Montana Department of Revenue
Plaintiff: Heart K. Land & Cattle Co.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00162
Filed: December 20, 2012
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Billings Office
County: PARK
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Cebull
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2014 111 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 84 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States of America. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 1/22/2014. (TCL, )
January 29, 2014 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 84 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting Findings and Recommendations re 111 Findings and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/29/2014. (dle)
January 6, 2014 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 80 , to the extent not inconsistent with the analysis in the Order. Plaintiff Heart K's 65 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Sakal and Long's sland er of title counterclaims predicated on Heart K's filing notice of lis pendens and Sakal's claim for attorney's fees as an element of special damages are DISMISSED. The remaining slander of title counterclaims are sufficiently supported by allegations of special damages and Heart K's Motion is DENIED in that respect. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/6/2014. (NOB) Modified on 1/6/2014: Copy mailed to M. Long. (NOB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heart K. Land & Cattle Co. v. Sakal et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: All Other Persons Unknown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Heart K. Land & Cattle Co.
Represented By: Erik Anorus Coate
Represented By: Karl Knuchel
Represented By: Erik Anorus Coate
Represented By: Karl Knuchel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Represented By: Kaycee M. Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Montana Department of Revenue
Represented By: Michelle Rae Dietrich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: United States Government Department of the Treasury
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Represented By: Kaycee M. Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Montana Department of Revenue
Represented By: Michelle Rae Dietrich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: All Other Persons Unknown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Represented By: Kaycee M. Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: United States Government Department of the Treasury
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Represented By: Kaycee M. Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Lauren E. Long
Represented By: Sky Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Lauren E. Long
Represented By: Sky Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Francis A. Sakal
Represented By: Jane Mersen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Other Persons Unknown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis A. Sakal
Represented By: Jane Mersen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren E. Long
Represented By: Sky Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Kaycee M. Sullivan
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Government Department of the Treasury
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Represented By: Kaycee M. Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montana Department of Revenue
Represented By: Michelle Rae Dietrich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heart K. Land & Cattle Co.
Represented By: Karl Knuchel
Represented By: Erik Anorus Coate
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]