Eastman v. Swanson et al

Defendant: Sgt. Miller, Sgt. Gurstein, Paul Lucier, Dr. Shaack, Ross Swanson, Mike Mahoney, Myron E. Beeson, Ben Bouley, Carla Strutzel, Mike Mazzone, Sgt. Moyotte and Sgt. Fetters
Plaintiff: Franklin Corbin Eastman
 
Case Number: 6:2011cv00073
Filed: December 12, 2011
 
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: POWELL
Presiding Judge: Donald W. Molloy
Referring Judge: Keith Strong
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 10 Affidavit/Declaration filed by Franklin Corbin Eastman. Mr. Eastman's Declaration and proposed Order, to the extent they can be construed as a Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, are DENIED. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 4/18/2012. Mailed to Eastman. (TAG, )
July 11, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 12 in full. Eastman's claims regarding the opening of court mail and threatening verbal and sexual harassment, except as to Sgt. Gurstein, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Mike Mahoney, Ross Swanson, Myron Beeson, Ben Bouley, Carla Stmtzel, Cody Sentell, Paul Lucier, Dr. Shaack, and the mailroom staff are dismissed. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/11/2012. Mailed to Eastman. (TAG, )
August 23, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Franklin Corbin Eastman. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 8/23/2012. Mailed to Eastman at 1135 McDonald #110, Missoula, MT 59801. (TAG, )
January 28, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 35 in full. Defendants' motion for summary judgment 26 and Eastman's motion to Dismiss are GRANTED. Case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/28/2013. Mailed to Eastman. (TAG, )
January 10, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 4 Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 1/10/2012. Mailed to Eastman. (TAG, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Eastman v. Swanson et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Gurstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Lucier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Shaack
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Swanson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Mahoney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myron E. Beeson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Bouley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Strutzel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Mazzone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Moyotte
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Fetters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Corbin Eastman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]