Hillerich & Bradsby Co. v. ACE American Insurance Company

Counter_claimant: ACE American Insurance Company
Counter_defendant: Hillerich & Bradsby Co.
Plaintiff: Hillerich & Bradsby Co.
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2011cv00075
Filed: December 14, 2011
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: JEFFERSON
Presiding Judge: Donald W. Molloy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 6/20/2012. (dle)
September 20, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Motion for a declaration of applicable law. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 9/20/2012. (dle)
March 7, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 54 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 58 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court will later issue a detailed opinion addressing these motions. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 3/7/2013. (dle)
March 26, 2013 78 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 3/26/2013. (DED, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hillerich & Bradsby Co. v. ACE American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: ACE American Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher Lee Decker
Represented By: Perry J. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Hillerich & Bradsby Co.
Represented By: Kyle A. Gray
Represented By: Jason S. Ritchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hillerich & Bradsby Co.
Represented By: Jason S. Ritchie
Represented By: W. Scott Mitchell
Represented By: Kyle A. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher Lee Decker
Represented By: Perry J. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.