Lair et al v. Gallik et al

Plaintiff: Doug Lair, Steve Dogiakos, American Tradition Partnership, American Tradition Partnership PAC, Montana Right to Life Association PAC, Sweet Grass Council for Community Integrity, Lake County Republican Central Committee, Beaverhead County Republican Central Committee, Jake Oil, JL Oil, Champion Painting and John Milanovich
Defendant: Steve Bullock, Leo Gallagher and James Murry
 
Case Number: 6:2012cv00012
Filed: September 6, 2011
 
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: SWEET GRASS
Presiding Judge: Charles C. Lovell
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2012 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 102 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 108 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; finding as moot 111 Motion to Amend/Correct Signed by Judge Charles C. Lovell on 6/29/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (DED, )
October 10, 2012 168 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW OPINION AND ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Court's order declaring the contribution limits in Montana Code Annotated § 13-37-126 unconstitutional and permanently enjoining the defendants from enforcing those limits is hereby confirmed subject however to the Circuit's temporary stay order received only minutes ago. Signed by Judge Charles C. Lovell on 10/10/2012. (HEG, )
February 24, 2012 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court GRANTS the motion as to MCA Sections 13-37-131 and 13-35-225(3)(a). The Defendants are ENJOINED from enforcing those statutory provisions pending further o rder from the Court. The Court DENIES the motion as to MCA Section 13-37-216(1),(3),(5) and the corporate-contribution provision in MCA Section 13-35-227. The Court DENIES as moot the motion as to corporate-independent-expenditure provision of MCA Section 13-35-227. Signed by Judge Charles C. Lovell on 2/24/2012. (DED, )
May 16, 2012 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plts' 75 Motion for Summary Judgment: 1. MCA 13-35-225(3)(a) is unconstitutionally vague; 2. MCA 13-37-131 is unconstitutionally vague; and 3. MCA 13-35-227 is unconstitutional to the extent it p rohibits a corporation from making a contribution to a political committee that the committee than uses for independent expenditures in support of or opposition to a candidate. The dfts are PERMANENTLY ENJOINED from enforcing each of these three pro visions. Plts' motion is DENIED in all other respects. The Court further grants in part and denies in part Dfts' 78 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment: MCA 13-35-227 is constitutional to the extent it prohibits a corporation from mak ing direct or indirect contributions to candidates or political parties. Dfts' motion is denied in all other respects. It is further ordered the 2/24/12 preliminary injunction 66 is dissolved. It is further ordered that this order and permanent injunction is the final judgment as to the issues addressed herein. Let this judgment enter. The balance of plts' claims shall be resolved by bench trial. Signed by Judge Charles C. Lovell on 5/16/2012. (DED, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lair et al v. Gallik et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Lair
Represented By: Noel H. Johnson
Represented By: James Edward Brown
Represented By: James Bopp, Jr.
Represented By: John E. Bloomquist
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Dogiakos
Represented By: Noel H. Johnson
Represented By: James Edward Brown
Represented By: James Bopp, Jr.
Represented By: John E. Bloomquist
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Tradition Partnership
Represented By: Noel H. Johnson
Represented By: James Edward Brown
Represented By: James Bopp, Jr.
Represented By: John E. Bloomquist
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Tradition Partnership PAC
Represented By: James Bopp, Jr.
Represented By: John E. Bloomquist
Represented By: James Edward Brown
Represented By: Noel H. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montana Right to Life Association PAC
Represented By: John E. Bloomquist
Represented By: James Bopp, Jr.
Represented By: James Edward Brown
Represented By: Noel H. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sweet Grass Council for Community Integrity
Represented By: John E. Bloomquist
Represented By: James Bopp, Jr.
Represented By: James Edward Brown
Represented By: Noel H. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lake County Republican Central Committee
Represented By: John E. Bloomquist
Represented By: James Bopp, Jr.
Represented By: James Edward Brown
Represented By: Noel H. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beaverhead County Republican Central Committee
Represented By: John E. Bloomquist
Represented By: James Bopp, Jr.
Represented By: James Edward Brown
Represented By: Noel H. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jake Oil
Represented By: John E. Bloomquist
Represented By: James Bopp, Jr.
Represented By: James Edward Brown
Represented By: Noel H. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JL Oil
Represented By: John E. Bloomquist
Represented By: James Bopp, Jr.
Represented By: James Edward Brown
Represented By: Noel H. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Champion Painting
Represented By: John E. Bloomquist
Represented By: James Bopp, Jr.
Represented By: James Edward Brown
Represented By: Noel H. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Milanovich
Represented By: John E. Bloomquist
Represented By: James Bopp, Jr.
Represented By: James Edward Brown
Represented By: Noel H. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Bullock
Represented By: Michael G. Black
Represented By: Andrew Huff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo Gallagher
Represented By: Michael G. Black
Represented By: Andrew Huff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Murry
Represented By: Michael G. Black
Represented By: Andrew Huff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]