McGovern v. Ferriter et al

Plaintiff: Thomas J. McGovern
Defendant: Pat Smith, John/Jane Does, Tom Woods, Mike Ferriter, Leroy Kirkegard, Ross Swanson, Tom Wilson and Kristy Cobbin
 
Case Number: 6:2012cv00101
Filed: October 12, 2012
 
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: POWELL
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Referring Judge: Keith Strong
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING IN PART 14 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Counts 1 and 3 of McGovern's Amended Complaint are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Defendants must further respond to Count 6 of the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/24/2013. Mailed to McGovern. (TAG, )
February 19, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 31 Motion for Declaratory Judgment; denying 33 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/19/2014. Mailed to McGovern. (TAG, )
May 14, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 Motion for Reconsideration. Mr. McGovern's motion for preliminafy injunction 33 with regard to Mr. McGovern's request to register as both a Native American and Wiccan is granted. Preliminary injunction set forth in Order. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/14/2014. Mailed to McGovern. (TAG, )
June 26, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 50 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith Strong on 6/26/2014. Mailed to McGovern. (TAG, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McGovern v. Ferriter et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas J. McGovern
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Woods
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Ferriter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Kirkegard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Swanson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristy Cobbin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]