Compass Airlines v. Montana Department of Labor and Industry, Hearings Bureau

Intervenor_defendant: Dustin Hankinson
Plaintiff: Compass Airlines
Defendant: Montana Department of Labor and Industry, Hearings Bureau
Case Number: 6:2012cv00105
Filed: November 15, 2012
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: LEWIS & CLARK
Presiding Judge: Charles C. Lovell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion for TRO: Def Montana Human Rights Bureau is restrained from exercising jurisdiction in Hankinson Discrimination Complaint Case No. 593-2013/0121015383 (that case stayed pending decision of Plaintiff's prelim inj motion) . FURTHER ORDERED expedited hearing of preliminary injunction motion is set down on Thursday, 12/20/12, at 10:00 a.m., Courtroom II, USDC, Helena. FURTHER ORDERED Def and Intervenor's opposition briefs shall be filed on/before Tuesday, 12/18/12 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Charles C. Lovell on 12/13/2012. (MKB)
December 27, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Charles C. Lovell on 12/27/2012. (MKB)
August 12, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 36 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 50 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Injunctive relief granted to Plaintiff. Clerk to enter judgment and notify Montana Department of Labor & Industry, Hearings Bureau, of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Charles C. Lovell on 8/12/2013. (MKB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Compass Airlines v. Montana Department of Labor and Industry, Hearings Bureau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Dustin Hankinson
Represented By: Linda M. Deola
Represented By: Brian J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Compass Airlines
Represented By: Jeffrey Ellis
Represented By: David J.A. Hayes, III
Represented By: Christopher Mangen, Jr.
Represented By: Daniela E. Pavuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montana Department of Labor and Industry, Hearings Bureau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.