Goldsmith v. Lewis and Clark County et al

Defendant: Benefis Spectrum Medical, Inc., Leo Dutton and Lewis and Clark County
Plaintiff: Darren Dee Goldsmith, Sr.
Case Number: 6:2013cv00051
Filed: September 3, 2013
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: LEWIS & CLARK
Presiding Judge: Donald W. Molloy
Referring Judge: Keith Strong
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 9 in full. Defendant Lewis and Clark County is DISMISSED. Goldsmith's allegations regarding excessive bail and denial of access to legal materials are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 3/3/2014. Mailed to Goldsmith. (TAG, )
September 5, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 42 Motion for Protective Order; denying 55 Motion for Access to Legal Materials. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith Strong on 9/5/2014. Mailed to Goldsmith. (TAG, )
November 4, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 63 Motion for Order and Notice Requesting to TakeDepositions. Deadlines in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith Strong on 11/4/2014. Mailed to Goldmsmith with copy of Rules as directed. (TAG, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldsmith v. Lewis and Clark County et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benefis Spectrum Medical, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo Dutton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis and Clark County
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Dee Goldsmith, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]