Alliance for the Wild Rockies v. BRADFORD et al

Plaintiff: Alliance for the Wild Rockies
Defendant: PAUL BRADFORD, Jane Cottrell, United States Forest Service and United States Fish and Wildlife Service
 
Case Number: 9:2009cv00160
Filed: November 16, 2009
 
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Missoula Office
County: LEWIS & CLARK
Presiding Judge: Donald W. Molloy
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 16:1538 Endangered Species Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. It is GRANTED as to the request for a temporary restraining order and DENIED subject to renewal as to the request for a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 6/9/2010. (ASG, )
June 29, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court Opinion: It is ordered that both motions for summary judgment 14 and 17 are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part (see Order for details). It is further ordered that the Defendants are ENJOINED from implementing the Grizzly Project, Miller Project, and Little Beaver Project, and this matter is REMANDED to the Forest Service to address the deficiencies in the Project analyses set forth in this opinion. It is further ordered that the Defendants' motion to dissolve the temporary restraining order 32 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 6/29/2010. (ASG, )
April 3, 2012 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 65 motion to dissolve the injunction against the Little Beaver Project. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 4/3/2012. (ASG, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Alliance for the Wild Rockies v. BRADFORD et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alliance for the Wild Rockies
Represented By: Rebecca Kay Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL BRADFORD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Cottrell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]