Johnson v. American Honda Motor Company, Inc.

Plaintiff: Zane Johnson
Defendant: American Honda Motor Company, Inc.
Case Number: 9:2010cv00126
Filed: November 1, 2010
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Missoula Office
County: MISSOULA
Referring Judge: Jeremiah C. Lynch
Presiding Judge: Donald W. Molloy
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 10, 2013 280 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 4/10/2013. (TXB, )
March 26, 2012 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion in Limine Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 3/26/2012. (TXB, )
March 28, 2012 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion in Limine Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 3/28/2012. (TXB, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. American Honda Motor Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zane Johnson
Represented By: Martin W. Judnich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Company, Inc.
Represented By: Gerry Fagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.