Spreadbury v. Bitterroot Public Library et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Michael E. Spreadbury
Defendant: Bitterroot Public Library, City of Hamilton, Lee Enterprises Incorporated and Boone Karlberg P.C.
Case Number: 9:2011cv00064
Filed: April 19, 2011
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Missoula Office
County: RAVALLI
Referring Judge: Jeremiah C. Lynch
Presiding Judge: Donald W. Molloy
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2012 Jeremiah C. Lynch no longer assigned to case. (ASG, )
July 11, 2012 312 Featured Case ORDER adopting Findings and Recommendations 309 in full. This matter is closed. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/11/2012. (ASG, ) Modified on 7/11/2012 to reflect that a copy was mailed to Spreadbury on this date. (ASG, ).
June 19, 2012 311 AMENDED CLERK'S JUDGMENT (APP, ) Copy mailed to Spreadbury this date.
June 19, 2012 310 Costs Taxed in amount of $ $425.00 against Michael Spreadbury (APP, ) Copy mailed to Spreadbury this date.
June 8, 2012 309 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 90 Amended Complaint filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. Objections to F&R due by 6/25/2012 Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 6/8/2012. (TXB, ) Modified on 6/12/2012 to reflect copy to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
June 1, 2012 Set Deadlines: Objection to Taxation of Costs due by 6/15/2012. (APP, )
June 1, 2012 308 APPLICATION FOR TAXATION OF COSTS by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in support of Bill of Costs, # 2 Exhibit A to Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit B to Affidavit, # 4 Exhibit C to Affidavit) (Crowley, William)
May 31, 2012 307 Featured Case ORDER granting 304 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 5/31/2012. (TCL, ) Modified on 6/1/2012 to reflect copy to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
May 31, 2012 306 RESPONSE to Motion re 304 MOTION to Dismiss Def Lee Enterprises Inc's Response to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Voluntary Dismissal filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. (Smith, Jeffrey)
May 31, 2012 305 RESPONSE to Motion re 304 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Crowley, William)
May 31, 2012 304 Second MOTION to Voluntary Dismiss by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (APP, )
May 31, 2012 303 TEXT ORDER. Pursuant to the discretion granted the Court by Fed. R.Civ.P. 41(a)(2), IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's "Motion for Voluntary Dismissal" [Dkt.290] is DENIED. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 5/31/2012. (Lynch, Jeremiah) Modified on 5/31/2012 to reflect copy to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
May 31, 2012 302 TEXT ORDER Defendants City of Hamilton and Bitterroot Public Librarys' Motion to Dismiss [Dkt.293] is DENIED as moot in light of the Judgment entered on May 30, 2012[Dkt.301]. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 5/31/2012. (Lynch, Jeremiah) Modified on 5/31/2012 to reflect copy to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
May 30, 2012 301 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (APP, ) Copy mailed to Spreadbury this date.
May 30, 2012 300 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND REJECTING IN PART THE FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS - DENIED as moot 148 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENIED as moot 150 Motion for Summary Judgment... The motions are otherwise GRANTED, and all of Spreadbury's claims against the Municipal Defendants are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Municipal Defendants' 252 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Summary Judgment Motion and Brief is DENIED as moot. Because no claim remains against the Municipal Defendants, all deadlines pertaining to them, including the jury trial scheduled for June 25, 2012, are VACATED. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 5/30/2012. (APP, ) Copy mailed to Spreadbury this date.
May 30, 2012 299 Proposed Pretrial Order sumitted for review by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D) (Crowley, William)
May 30, 2012 298 TRIAL BRIEF of Defendants City of Hamilton and Bitterroot Public Library by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Crowley, William)
May 30, 2012 297 Proposed Jury Instructions by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Crowley, William)
May 30, 2012 296 Proposed Verdict Form by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Crowley, William)
May 29, 2012 295 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 293 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims for Failure to Comply With Court Order filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Crowley, William)
May 29, 2012 294 Brief/Memorandum in Support re 293 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims for Failure to Comply With Court Order filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) (Crowley, William)
May 29, 2012 293 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims for Failure to Comply With Court Order William L. Crowley appearing for Defendants Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Crowley, William)
May 25, 2012 292 RESPONSE to Motion re 290 MOTION Def Lee Enterprises Inc's Response in Opposition to Pl's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5-22-2012 Email from Michael Spreadbury) (Smith, Jeffrey)
May 24, 2012 291 RESPONSE to Motion re 290 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Crowley, William)
May 23, 2012 290 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: # 1 Settlement Agreement) (APP, )
May 23, 2012 289 Featured Case ORDER granting 287 Motion to Compel Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 5/23/2012. (TXB, ) Modified on 5/24/2012 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury (APP, ).
May 21, 2012 288 Brief/Memorandum in Support re 287 MOTION to Compel Participation in Pretrial Order filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I) (Crowley, William)
May 21, 2012 287 MOTION to Compel William L. Crowley appearing for Defendants Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Crowley, William)
May 21, 2012 286 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey Neighbor Johnson on behalf of Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele (Johnson, Tracey)
May 11, 2012 285 Brief/Memorandum in Support re 284 MOTION to Strike 280 Notice (Other), 279 Affidavit/Declaration DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTION TO STRIKE DOCKET NOS 279 AND 280 DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE DOCKET NOS 279 AND 280 filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. (Smith, Jeffrey)
May 11, 2012 284 MOTION to Strike 280 Notice (Other), 279 Affidavit/Declaration DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTION TO STRIKE DOCKET NOS 279 AND 280 Jeffrey Brandon Smith appearing for Defendant Lee Enterprises Incorporated Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Smith, Jeffrey)
May 10, 2012 283 NOTICE of filing discovery by Michael E. Spreadbury (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit) (NOS, )
May 7, 2012 282 REPLY to Response to Motion re 262 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE DEF LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. (Smith, Jeffrey)
May 7, 2012 281 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael E. Spreadbury re 259 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (APP, )
May 7, 2012 280 NOTICE by Michael E. Spreadbury re 259 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (APP, )
May 7, 2012 279 AFFIDAVIT re 259 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Michael E. Spreadbury. (APP, )
May 4, 2012 Notice of Incorrect Docket Event re 278 Brief/Memorandum in Support. Incorrect event used: Brief/Memo in Support. Correct event to use: Reply to Response to Motion. YOU DO NOT NEED TO REFILE. This notice is for your information for future filings. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. A PDF DOCUMENT IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY. Please call our office if you have any questions. Thank you. (APP, )
May 4, 2012 278 Reply to Response re 259 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. (Smith, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/7/2012 to correct event wording (APP, ).
April 24, 2012 277 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Exhibit A - Amended Affidavit of Perry Backus (Newsworthy) re: 259 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, 261 Statement of Undisputed Fact,,,,, (Smith, Jeffrey)
April 23, 2012 276 TEXT ORDER. The Plaintiff's motion requesting the Court to schedule oral argument upon pending motions is DENIED. If the Court, in its discretion, determines oral argument upon any pending matter would be of assistance, the Court will advise the parties accordingly.IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 4/23/2012. (Lynch, Jeremiah) Modified on 4/24/2012 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
April 23, 2012 275 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael E. Spreadbury re 274 Response to Motion, 262 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE, 273 MOTION for Hearing (APP, )
April 23, 2012 274 RESPONSE to Motion re 262 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. (APP, )
April 23, 2012 273 MOTION for Oral Argument with Lee by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (APP, )
April 23, 2012 272 TEXT ORDER. For good cause shown,IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Lee Enterprises, Inc.'s motion to amend Exhibit A to its Statement of Undisputed Facts(Dkt.261-1) is GRANTED. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 4/23/2012. (Lynch, Jeremiah) Modified on 4/24/2012 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
April 20, 2012 271 Brief/Memorandum in Support re 270 MOTION to Amend/Correct 261 Statement of Undisputed Fact,,,,, filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. (Smith, Jeffrey)
April 20, 2012 270 MOTION to Amend/Correct 261 Statement of Undisputed Fact,,,,, Jeffrey Brandon Smith appearing for Defendant Lee Enterprises Incorporated Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Exhibit A) (Smith, Jeffrey)
April 20, 2012 269 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael E. Spreadbury re 268 Statement of Genuine Issues, 267 Response to Motion (APP, )
April 20, 2012 268 Statement of Genuine Issues re: 259 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. (APP, )
April 20, 2012 267 RESPONSE to Motion re 259 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit) (APP, )
April 17, 2012 266 NOTICE by Lee Enterprises Incorporated DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S "RESPONSE TO LEE DAMAGE EXPERT DISCLOSURE" (DKT. 258) (Smith, Jeffrey)
April 16, 2012 265 TEXT ORDER. The Plaintiff's motion requesting the Court to hold Defendant Lee Enterprises, Inc., in contempt for filing a motion for summary judgment is denied, as having no basis in law or fact. The Court will not require the Defendant to unnecessarily expend resources in responding to a baseless motion. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 4/16/2012. (Lynch, Jeremiah) Modified on 4/24/2012 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
April 16, 2012 264 MOTION for Contempt by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (APP, )
April 11, 2012 263 Brief/Memorandum in Support re 262 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE Defendant Lee Enterprises Inc's Brief in Support of Motions in Limine filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. (Smith, Jeffrey)
April 11, 2012 262 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE Jeffrey Brandon Smith appearing for Defendant Lee Enterprises Incorporated Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Smith, Jeffrey)
April 4, 2012 261 Statement of Undisputed Fact re: 259 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Aff of Backus - Newsworthy, # 2 Exhibit B - Petition to Ravalli County, # 3 Exhibit C - Pl to Messina (10-19/2007), # 4 Exhibit D - Pet Recall Sheriff Hoffman, # 5 Exhibit Pet Recall Ravalli Co Attorney Corn, # 6 Exhibit F - Ltr Pl to McCulloch (2/10/2009), # 7 Exhibit G - Ltr Commrs to Pl (2/17/2009), # 8 Exhibit H - Ltr PL to McCulloch w Recall Pet, # 9 Exhibit I - Ltr Kimmet to PL (3/13/2009), # 10 Exhibit J - Ltr Quintana to PL (3/23/2009), # 11 Exhibit K - Ravalli Republic Article (2/19/2009), # 12 Exhibit L - Blog Bitterroot Rising (2010), # 13 Exhibit M - Blogger User Profile, # 14 Exhibit N - Crystal Cox Blog (2011), # 15 Exhibit O - Blog - Ravalli Co Sheriff Dept (8/8/2009), # 16 Exhibit P - Crystal Cox Blog (2012), # 17 Exhibit Q - Library Thing, # 18 Exhibit R - Spreadbury Youtube MT, # 19 Exhibit S - Ravalli Republic Article (11/3/2009), # 20 Exhibit T - Find My Threat Story (11/17/2011), # 21 Exhibit U - Ravalli Republic Article (6/9/2010), # 22 Exhibit V - USDC Complaint (7/30/20100, # 23 Exhibit W - Aff Backus (Standard of Care), # 24 Exhibit X - Aff Devlin (4/2/2012), # 25 Exhibit Y - Bitterroot Rising Archives (2010)) (Smith, Jeffrey)
April 4, 2012 260 Brief/Memorandum in Support re 259 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. (Smith, Jeffrey)
April 4, 2012 259 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Jeffrey Brandon Smith appearing for Defendant Lee Enterprises Incorporated Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Smith, Jeffrey)
April 4, 2012 258 NOTICE of filing Response to Lee Damage Expert Disclosure by Michael E. Spreadbury (APP, )
March 26, 2012 257 Reply to Objection to Findings and Recommendations re 250 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 150 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's State Law Claims filed by Ryan Oster, Steve Snavely, Nansu Roddy, Robert Brophy, Trista Smith, Steven Bruner-Murphy, Kenneth S. Bell, Jennifer B. Lint filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. (APP, )
March 19, 2012 256 OBJECTION to 250 Findings and Recommendations filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Leonard, Thomas)
March 16, 2012 255 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 211 Motion in Limine. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 3/16/2012. (TCL, ) Modified on 3/19/2012 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
March 13, 2012 254 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 237 Motion to Compel Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 3/13/2012. (TXB, ) Modified on 3/14/2012 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date(APP, ).
March 9, 2012 253 Brief/Memorandum in Support re 252 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Summary Judgment Motion and Brief filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Leonard, Thomas)
March 9, 2012 252 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Summary Judgment Motion and Brief Thomas J. Leonard appearing for Defendants Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Leonard, Thomas)
March 8, 2012 251 TEXT ORDER. Plaintiff Michael Spreadbury moves the Court for leave to file what Spreadbury characterizes as a motion requesting the Court to reconsider its prior interlocutory order pertaining that aspect of his claim of defamation against Lee Enterprises, Inc. that is based upon a story reported in a Lee newspapers on August 20, 2010. Spreadbury argues that additional facts exist that warrant reconsideration of the prior order. Spreadbury's motion, however, fails to satisfy the requisite criteria of L.R. 7.3(b)(1)(B). Therefore the motion is appropriately DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 3/8/2012. (Lynch, Jeremiah) Modified on 3/8/2012 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
March 6, 2012 250 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 150 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's State Law Claims filed by Ryan Oster, Steve Snavely, Nansu Roddy, Robert Brophy, Trista Smith, Steven Bruner-Murphy, Kenneth S. Bell, Jennifer B. Lint, Jerry Steele, City of Hamilton, Bitterroot Public Library, 148 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Federal Claims filed by Ryan Oster, Steve Snavely, Nansu Roddy, Robert Brophy, Trista Smith, Steven Bruner-Murphy, Kenneth S. Bell, Jennifer B. Lint, Jerry Steele, Bitterroot Public Library, City of Hamilton. Objections to F&R due by 3/23/2012 Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 3/6/2012. (TCL, ) Modified on 3/6/2012 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
March 6, 2012 249 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 210 Findings and Recommendations and 181 Findings and Recommendations regarding 108 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated - granting in part and denying in part 108 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting in part Findings and Recommendations re 181 Findings and Recommendations; adopting in part Findings and Recommendations re 210 Findings and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 3/6/2012. (APP, ) Copy mailed to Spreadbury this date.
March 5, 2012 248 TEXT ORDER. Plaintiff Michael Spreadbury moves in limine to preclude the Defendants City of Hamilton, Bitterroot Public Library, and the individual defendants from presenting the opinion testimony of the following three individuals identified by the Defendants as liability expert witnesses: (1)Trista Smith - opinion testimony regarding application of American Library Association standards: (2)Kenneth Bell - opinion testimony regarding trespass upon public property; and (3)Ryan Oster - opinion testimony regarding whether p probable cause existed to arrest Spreadbury for criminal trespass and intimidation. Spreadbury argues, in general, that these individuals lack any specialized knowledge - gained through education, training, or experience - that makes them qualified to render reliable opinion testimony upon the issues in this case under Fed.R.Evid. 702. The issues of whether the opinion testimony the Defendants intend to elicit from these individuals satisfy the requirements of Rule 702, and otherwise do not invade the province of the Court in instructing the jury on the law applicable to this case, are best decided in the context of trial. Therefore. the Court deems it appropriate to DENY Spreadbury's motion at this juncture, subject to his right to renew all aspects of his motion at the time of trial as appropriate. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 3/5/2012. (Lynch, Jeremiah) Modified on 3/6/2012 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
March 5, 2012 247 RESPONSE to Motion re 237 MOTION to Compel DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S RESPONSE BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DKT 237 filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. (Smith, Jeffrey)
March 5, 2012 246 TEXT ORDER. Defendants City of Hamilton, Bitterroot Public Library, and the individually name defendants move the Court to amend the caption of this case to remove the law firm of Boone Karlberg P.C. as a defendant. Plaintiff Michael Spreadbury voices an ill-defined objection to the motion. Having considered the parties' respective positions, the Court deems it appropriate to Deny the motion to the extent it seeks to have Boone Karlberg P.C. simply removed from the caption for purposes of all future pleadings. But the Court deems it appropriate to Grant the motion to the extent it requests the Court to delete Boone Karlberg P.C. from the caption of any documents, i.e. instructions to the jury and verdict form, that may be presented to the jury. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 3/5/2012. (Lynch, Jeremiah) Modified on 3/5/2012 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
March 5, 2012 245 RESPONSE to Motion re 235 MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. (APP, )
March 5, 2012 244 TEXT ORDER. Defendant Lee Enterprises, Inc., moves the Court to amend the order entered December 13, 2011 (Dkt. 189) as that order pertains to the protection of the personal information of Plaintiff Michael Spreadbury obtained by other Defendants via F.R.Civ.P.45 subpoenas from numerous non-parties. The gist of Lee Enterprises' motion is that the Court allow Lee Enterprises access to the materials produced in response to the referenced subpoenas - subject to the protective proscriptions detailed in the December 13, 2011 order. Spreadbury resists Lee Enterprises attempt to access his personal information. For the reasons discussed in the December 13, 2011 order, Lee Enterprises is entitled to discovery of the materials produced in response to the referenced subpoenas because those materials contain information pertaining to Spreadbury's health, education, and past employment - information that is relevant to the claims for damages Spreadbury has advanced against Lee Enterprises. And Lee enterprises may obtain the subject materials from the other defendants. Lee Enterprises is, of course, subject to the same protective proscriptions detailed in the December 13, 2011 order. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 3/5/2012. (Lynch, Jeremiah) Modified on 3/5/2012 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
March 2, 2012 243 RESPONSE to Motion re 241 MOTION for Leave to File filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Crowley, William)
March 1, 2012 242 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael E. Spreadbury re 240 Response to Motion, 241 MOTION for Leave to File (APP, )
March 1, 2012 241 MOTION for Leave to Reconsider by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (APP, )
March 1, 2012 240 RESPONSE to Motion re 233 MOTION to Amend/Correct 189 Order on Motion to Quash, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Order/Judgment,,, DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTION TO AMEND ORDER [DKT 189] filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. (APP, )
February 24, 2012 239 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael E. Spreadbury (APP, )
February 24, 2012 238 NOTICE of filing Pltf Interrogatories, Discovery by Michael E. Spreadbury (Attachments: # 1 Attachment D) (APP, )
February 24, 2012 237 MOTION to Compel by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Attachment B, # 3 Attachment C) (APP, )
February 23, 2012 236 Brief/Memorandum in Support re 235 MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Crowley, William)
February 23, 2012 235 MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption William L. Crowley appearing for Defendants Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Crowley, William)
February 22, 2012 234 Brief/Memorandum in Support re 233 MOTION to Amend/Correct 189 Order on Motion to Quash, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Order/Judgment,,, DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTION TO AMEND ORDER [DKT 189] DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO AMEND ORDER [DKT 189] filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. (Smith, Jeffrey)
February 22, 2012 233 MOTION to Amend/Correct 189 Order on Motion to Quash, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Order/Judgment,,, DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTION TO AMEND ORDER [DKT 189] Jeffrey Brandon Smith appearing for Defendant Lee Enterprises Incorporated Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Smith, Jeffrey)
February 22, 2012 232 TEXT ORDER. Plaintiff Michael Spreadbury moves the Court,under L.R.7.3, for leave of Court to file a motion requesting the Court to reconsider prior interlocutory orders relating to former Defendant Boone Karlberg P.C.. Because the motion fails to satisfy any of the requisite criteria of L.R 7.3(b), the motion is properly DENIED. To the extent the referenced motion seeks to have certain individual attorneys in the law firm of Boone Karlberg P.C. arrested, that aspect of the motion is also DENIED as having no basis in the law. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 2/22/2012. (Lynch, Jeremiah) Copy mailed to Spreadbury on 2/24/12 (NOS, ).
February 22, 2012 231 RESPONSE to Motion re 229 MOTION to Reconsider Claims filed by Boone Karlberg P.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Crowley, William)
February 21, 2012 230 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael E. Spreadbury re 228 Affidavit/Declaration, 229 MOTION (APP, )
February 21, 2012 229 MOTION by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (APP, )
February 21, 2012 228 AFFIDAVIT by Michael E. Spreadbury. (APP, )
February 15, 2012 Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 5/9/2012 (Motions ddl). Pretrial Order due by 8/30/2012 (Proposed Pretrial Order ddl). This relates to 227 Amended Scheduling Order (APP, )
February 15, 2012 227 Amended Scheduling Order as to LEE ENTERPRISES only. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 2/15/2012. (Copy mailed to Plaintiff this date) (APP, ) Modified on 2/15/2012 to reflect editing ddls as to 182 in order to keep the "other defs" pending ddls and incorporating "Lee Ent" ddls. The "Cross Motion" ddl = Motion ddl and "Pretrial Order" ddl = Proposed Pretrial Order ddl (APP, ).
February 14, 2012 226 RESPONSE to Motion re 217 MOTION to Amend/Correct 182 Scheduling Order LEE ENTERPRISES' RENEWED MOTION FOR NEW SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. (APP, )
February 14, 2012 225 Reply to Objection to Findings and Recommendations re 210 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 206 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTION TO RENEW SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION PENDING AT TIME OF MANDATORY STAY filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S 'OBJECTIONS TO COURT FINDINGS IN RE DOC # 210 LEE ENTERPRISES INC SUMMARY JUDGMENT' filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. (Smith, Jeffrey)
February 10, 2012 224 NOTICE of Filing Other Discovery for Trial by Michael E. Spreadbury (Attachments: # 1 Attachments - Voluminous, held on shelf in clerk's office-Msla) (APP, )
February 10, 2012 223 NOTICE of Appearance by Anita Harper Poe on behalf of Lee Enterprises Incorporated (Poe, Anita)
February 9, 2012 222 NOTICE of Filing Additional Discovery for Trial by Michael E. Spreadbury (Attachments: # 1 Attachments) (APP, )
February 9, 2012 221 Featured Case ORDER granting 218 Motion to File Under Seal Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 2/9/2012. (TCL, ) Modified on 2/9/2012 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
February 8, 2012 220 Brief/Memorandum in Support re 218 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal , 219 Lodged Sealed Document,, City and Library Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Motion in Limine filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Crowley, William)
February 8, 2012 219 Sealed Document re: 218 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele City and Library Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Motion in Limine. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G) (Crowley, William) Modified on 2/9/2012 to remove the word "Lodged" from entry (APP, ).
February 8, 2012 218 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal William L. Crowley appearing for Defendants Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Crowley, William)
February 8, 2012 217 MOTION to Amend/Correct 182 Scheduling Order,,, LEE ENTERPRISES' RENEWED MOTION FOR NEW SCHEDULING ORDER Jeffrey Brandon Smith appearing for Defendant Lee Enterprises Incorporated Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Smith, Jeffrey)
February 7, 2012 216 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael E. Spreadbury re 214 Response to Motion, 215 Objection to Findings and Recommendations (APP, )
February 7, 2012 215 OBJECTION to 210 Findings and Recommendations filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. (APP, )
February 7, 2012 214 RESPONSE to Motion re 211 MOTION in Limine filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. (APP, )
February 1, 2012 213 NOTICE by Michael E. Spreadbury (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B - DVD being held on shelf in Clerk's Office-Msla). (NOS, )
February 1, 2012 212 Brief/Memorandum in Support re 211 MOTION in Limine filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Crowley, William)
February 1, 2012 211 MOTION in Limine William L. Crowley appearing for Defendants Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Crowley, William)
January 31, 2012 210 Featured Case ORDER granting 206 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTION TO RENEW SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION PENDING AT TIME OF MANDATORY STAY filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 181 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 108 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON REMAINING COUNTS filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated, and FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 108 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON REMAINING COUNTS filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. ( Objections to F&R due by 2/17/2012) Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 1/31/2012. (TCL, ) Modified on 2/1/2012 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
January 31, 2012 209 Reply to Objection to Findings and Recommendations re 181 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 108 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON REMAINING COUNTS filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S RESPONSE BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO PART AGREE IN PART COURT FINDINGS IN RE LEE ENTERPRISES filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. (Smith, Jeffrey)
January 31, 2012 208 Featured Case ORDER denying 205 Motion to Amend/Correct with leave to renew. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 1/31/2012. (TCL, ) Modified on 2/1/2012 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
January 31, 2012 207 OBJECTION to 181 Findings and Recommendations DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S OBJECTION IN PART TO MAGISTRATE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS RE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON REMAINING COUNTS filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. (Smith, Jeffrey)
January 31, 2012 206 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTION TO RENEW SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION PENDING AT TIME OF MANDATORY STAY Jeffrey Brandon Smith appearing for Defendant Lee Enterprises Incorporated Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Smith, Jeffrey)
January 30, 2012 205 MOTION to Amend/Correct 182 Scheduling Order,,, Motion for Revised Scheduling Order Jeffrey Brandon Smith appearing for Defendant Lee Enterprises Incorporated Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Smith, Jeffrey)
January 30, 2012 204 NOTICE by Lee Enterprises Incorporated Notice of Lifting Stay (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Smith, Jeffrey)
January 26, 2012 203 RESPONSE to Motion re 202 MOTION in Limine filed by Bitterroot Public Library, City of Hamilton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E) (Crowley, William)
January 19, 2012 201 Featured Case ORDER. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 1/19/2012. (APP, ) Mailed to Spreadbury this date along w/ discovery.
January 19, 2012 200 NOTICE by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele of Service of City and Library Defendants' Damage Expert Disclosure (Crowley, William)
January 18, 2012 202 MOTION in Limine regarding expert witnesses by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (ASG, )
January 13, 2012 199 NOTICE by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele (Crowley, William)
January 3, 2012 198 Brief/Response to Order re 189 Order on Motion to Quash, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Order/Judgment,,, 195 Objection (City and Library Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Objection to) filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Crowley, William)
December 23, 2011 197 NOTICE of Violation of 4th Amendment Right by Court by Michael E. Spreadbury (APP, )
December 22, 2011 196 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael E. Spreadbury re 195 Objection, 194 Notice (Other) (APP, )
December 22, 2011 195 Objection re: 189 Order on Motion to Quash, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Order/Judgment. (APP, )
December 22, 2011 194 NOTICE of Second Financial Influence by Michael E. Spreadbury (APP, )
December 16, 2011 193 Featured Case ORDER that the Court DECLINES to adopt Judge Lynch's Findings and Recommendations (dkt # 181) concerning Lee Entetprises, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment, subject to reconsideration when the stay is lifted. Furthermore, all motions pertaining to Lee Entetprises, Inc. are DENIED as moot, subject to renewal when the stay is lifted. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 12/16/2011. (APP, ) Modified on 12/16/2011 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
December 13, 2011 192 Featured Case ORDER STAYING CASE as to Defendant, Lee Enterprises ONLY. Motions terminated: 191 MOTION to Vacate Def Lee Ent Inc All Pending Deadlines filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 12/13/2011. (CDH, ) Modified on 12/14/2011 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
December 13, 2011 191 MOTION to Vacate Def Lee Ent Inc All Pending Deadlines Jeffrey Brandon Smith appearing for Defendant Lee Enterprises Incorporated Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Staying Proceedings Against Lee Ent., Inc) (Smith, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2011 190 NOTICE by Lee Enterprises Incorporated NOTICE OF STAY PENDING BANKRUPTCY COURT PROCEEDINGS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Smith, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2011 189 Featured Case ORDER denying 176 Motion to Quash; granting in part and denying in part 177 Motion ; denying 178 Motion for Order/Judgment Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 12/13/2011. (TXB, ) Modified on 12/14/2011 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
December 12, 2011 188 OBJECTION to 181 Findings and Recommendations filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. (APP, )
December 6, 2011 187 Featured Case ORDER granting 173 Motion for Protective Order Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 12/6/2011. (TCL, ) Modified on 12/7/2011 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
December 5, 2011 186 RESPONSE to Motion re 177 MOTION, 176 MOTION to Quash, 178 MOTION for Order/Judgment filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P) (Crowley, William)
December 5, 2011 185 RESPONSE to Motion re 173 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. (APP, )
December 5, 2011 184 REPLY to Response to Motion re 150 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's State Law Claims, 148 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Federal Claims filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Leonard, Thomas)
December 1, 2011 183 RESPONSE to Motion re 168 MOTION to Continue filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Crowley, William)
November 30, 2011 182 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER:. Amended Pleadings due by 12/29/2011. Discovery due by 2/10/2012. Motions due by 3/9/2012. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/31/2012. As to Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Lee Enterprises, Inc.: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/7/2012 at 02:15 PM in Missoula, MT before Judge Donald W. Molloy. Jury Trial set for 6/18/2012 at 08:30 AM in Missoula, MT before Judge Donald W. Molloy. As to Plaintiff's claims against all other Defendants: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/14/2012 at 02:15 PM in Missoula, MT before Judge Donald W. Molloy. Jury Trial set for 6/25/2012 at 08:30 AM in Missoula, MT before Judge Donald W. Molloy. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 11/30/2011. (TCL, ) Modified on 12/2/2011 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
November 30, 2011 181 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 108 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON REMAINING COUNTS filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. Objections to F&R due by 12/19/2011 Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 11/30/2011. (TCL, ) Modified on 12/2/2011 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
November 30, 2011 180 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael E. Spreadbury re 179 Notice of Submitting Proposed Order, 176 MOTION to Quash, 178 MOTION for Order/Judgment, 177 MOTION (APP, )
November 30, 2011 179 Submission of Proposed Order re: 178 MOTION for Order/Judgment. (APP, )
November 30, 2011 178 MOTION for Order by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (APP, )
November 30, 2011 177 MOTION to Suppress by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (APP, )
November 30, 2011 176 MOTION to Quash by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (APP, )
November 30, 2011 175 RESPONSE to Motion re 159 MOTION Defendant Lee Enterprises Inc.'s Response to Plaintiff's Motion for a Trial Setting filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. (Smith, Jeffrey)
November 29, 2011 174 Brief/Memorandum in Support re 173 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Boone Karlberg P.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Crowley, William)
November 29, 2011 173 MOTION for Protective Order William L. Crowley appearing for Defendant Boone Karlberg P.C. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Crowley, William)
November 28, 2011 172 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael E. Spreadbury re 168 MOTION to Continue, 170 Response to Motion, 169 Affidavit/Declaration, 171 Statement of Genuine Issues, (APP, )
November 28, 2011 171 Statement of Genuine Issues re: 170 Response to Motion, 150 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's State Law Claims, 148 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Federal Claims filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. (APP, )
November 28, 2011 170 RESPONSE to Motion re 150 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's State Law Claims, 148 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Federal Claims filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) (APP, )
November 28, 2011 169 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re 168 MOTION to Continue by Michael E. Spreadbury. (APP, )
November 28, 2011 168 MOTION to Continue by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (APP, )
November 28, 2011 166 RESPONSE to Motion re 159 MOTION for a Trial Setting filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Crowley, William)
November 23, 2011 Remark: Pltf sent in discovery requests to be filed. The court does not want these filed, therefore they were disposed of. (APP, )
November 23, 2011 167 NOTICE of Speech, Law Violation; Modified Exhibit by Michael E. Spreadbury (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B-1, # 2 Exhibit B-2, # 3 Exhibit B-3, # 4 Exhibit B-4, # 5 Exhibit B-5, # 6 Exhibit B-6-7, # 7 Exhibit B-8, # 8 Exhibit B-9, # 9 Exhibit B-10) (APP, )
November 22, 2011 165 TEXT ORDER. Plaintiff Spreadbury, appearing pro se, has filed a document titled "Motion for Authority to Deny Peaceful Assembly". As best as can be ascertained from the disjointed pleading, Spreadbury is asking the court to provide him a legal analysis as to the circumstances under which a governmental entity could legally preclude individuals from assembling on public property. Because there exists no basis in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for the motion presented by Spreadbury, the motion is properly DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 11/22/2011. (Lynch, Jeremiah) Modified on 11/22/2011 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
November 21, 2011 164 TEXT ORDER The Plaintiff has filed a motion(Dkt.#138)requesting the Court to assess sanctions under Fed.R.Civ.P.11 against Defendant Boone Karlberg,P.C.Having considered the merits of the parties' respective arguments, the Court deems it appropriate to deny the Plaintiff's motion. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 11/21/2011. (Lynch, Jeremiah) Modified on 11/22/2011 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
November 21, 2011 163 TEXT ORDER Plaintiff has filed a motion (Dkt.#137) requesting the Court to assess sanctions under Fed.R.Civ.P.11 against Defendant Boone Karlberg,P.C. Having considered the merits of the parties' respective arguments, the Court deems it appropriate to deny Plaintiff's motion. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 11/21/2011. (Lynch, Jeremiah) Modified on 11/22/2011 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
November 18, 2011 162 Featured Case ORDER denying 161 Motion for Leave to File Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 11/18/2011. (APP, ) Copy mailed to Spreadbury this date.
November 17, 2011 158 Sealed Document Unredacted Exhibits I, J, M, P, S, T, X, Z, FF, NN and AAA re: 146 Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, 152 Statement of Undisputed Fact,,,, 150 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's State Law Claims, 151 Brief/Memorandum in Support, filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I, # 2 Exhibit J, # 3 Exhibit M, # 4 Exhibit P, # 5 Exhibit S, # 6 Exhibit T, # 7 Exhibit X, # 8 Exhibit Z, # 9 Exhibit FF, # 10 Exhibit NN, # 11 Exhibit AAA) (Leonard, Thomas)
November 17, 2011 157 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits QQ re: 152 Statement of Undisputed Fact,,,, (Attachments: # 1 Errata QQ) (Leonard, Thomas)
November 17, 2011 156 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits WW, XX, YY and ZZ re: 152 Statement of Undisputed Fact,,,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit WW, # 2 Exhibit XX, # 3 Exhibit YY, # 4 Exhibit ZZ) (Leonard, Thomas)
November 17, 2011 155 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits RR, SS, TT, UU and VV re: 152 Statement of Undisputed Fact,,,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit RR, # 2 Exhibit SS, # 3 Exhibit TT, # 4 Exhibit UU, # 5 Exhibit VV) (Leonard, Thomas)
November 17, 2011 154 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits PP re: 152 Statement of Undisputed Fact,,,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit PP) (Leonard, Thomas)
November 17, 2011 153 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits LL, MM and OO re: 152 Statement of Undisputed Fact,,,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit LL, # 2 Exhibit MM, # 3 Exhibit OO) (Leonard, Thomas)
November 17, 2011 152 Statement of Undisputed Fact re: 148 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Federal Claims, 150 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's State Law Claims, 151 Brief/Memorandum in Support, 149 Brief/Memorandum in Support, by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit K, # 10 Exhibit L, # 11 Exhibit N, # 12 Exhibit O, # 13 Exhibit Q, # 14 Exhibit R, # 15 Exhibit U, # 16 Exhibit V, # 17 Exhibit W, # 18 Exhibit Y, # 19 Exhibit AA, # 20 Exhibit BB, # 21 Exhibit CC, # 22 Exhibit DD, # 23 Exhibit EE, # 24 Exhibit GG, # 25 Exhibit HH, # 26 Exhibit II, # 27 Exhibit JJ, # 28 Exhibit KK) (Leonard, Thomas)
November 17, 2011 151 Brief/Memorandum in Support re 150 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's State Law Claims filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Leonard, Thomas)
November 17, 2011 150 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's State Law Claims Thomas J. Leonard appearing for Defendants Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Leonard, Thomas)
November 17, 2011 149 Brief/Memorandum in Support re 148 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Federal Claims filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Leonard, Thomas)
November 17, 2011 148 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Federal Claims Thomas J. Leonard appearing for Defendants Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Leonard, Thomas)
November 16, 2011 161 MOTION for Leave to File, by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (APP, )
November 16, 2011 160 MOTION for authority to deny peaceful assembly, by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (APP, )
November 16, 2011 159 MOTION to set remaining issues for trial, by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (APP, )
November 14, 2011 147 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 134 Motion to Strike. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 11/14/2011. (TCL, ) Modified on 11/15/2011 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
November 14, 2011 146 Featured Case ORDER granting 127 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 11/14/2011. (TCL, ) Modified on 11/15/2011 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
November 14, 2011 145 REPLY to Response to Motion re 134 MOTION to Strike 130 Notice (Other) Exhibit B filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Crowley, William)
November 14, 2011 144 RESPONSE to Motion re 134 MOTION to Strike 130 Notice (Other) Exhibit B filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Crowley, William)
November 14, 2011 143 RESPONSE to Motion re 138 MOTION for Sanctions, 137 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) (Crowley, William)
November 10, 2011 142 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael E. Spreadbury re 140 Response to Motion, 141 Response to Motion (APP, )
November 10, 2011 141 RESPONSE to Motion re 134 MOTION to Strike 130 Notice (Other) Exhibit B filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. (APP, )
November 10, 2011 140 RESPONSE to Motion re 134 MOTION to Strike 130 Notice (Other) Exhibit B filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. (APP, )
November 8, 2011 139 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael E. Spreadbury re 138 MOTION for Sanctions, 137 MOTION for Sanctions (APP, )
November 8, 2011 138 MOTION for Sanctions by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (APP, )
November 8, 2011 137 MOTION for Sanctions by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) (APP, )
November 1, 2011 136 RESPONSE to Motion re 108 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON REMAINING COUNTS filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A and B) (APP, )
October 31, 2011 135 Brief/Memorandum in Support re 134 MOTION to Strike 130 Notice (Other) Exhibit B filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Crowley, William)
October 31, 2011 134 MOTION to Strike 130 Notice (Other) Exhibit B William L. Crowley appearing for Defendants Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Crowley, William)
October 27, 2011 133 Featured Case ORDER denying 129 Motion for Recusal. Any further motions seeking my disqualification will be stricken. Under Local Rule 7.3, "no party may file amotion for reconsideration without prior leave of Court." Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 10/27/2011. (APP, ) Copy mailed to Spreadbury this date.
October 27, 2011 132 TEXT ORDER denying 129 Motion for Recusal. For the reasons stated in my order of May 25, 2011, the Plaintiff's renewed motion seeking my disqualification pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 455 is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 10/27/2011. (Lynch, Jeremiah) Modified on 10/27/2011 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
October 26, 2011 131 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael E. Spreadbury re 130 Notice (Other), 129 MOTION for Recusal (APP, )
October 26, 2011 130 NOTICE by Michael E. Spreadbury (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 (SEALED per Order) Exhibit B - original being held on shelf in clerk's office-Msla) (APP, )
October 26, 2011 129 MOTION for Recusal by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (APP, )
October 21, 2011 128 Brief/Memorandum in Support re 127 Second MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Leonard, Thomas)
October 21, 2011 127 Second MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Thomas J. Leonard appearing for Defendants Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Leonard, Thomas)
October 20, 2011 126 REPLY to Response to Motion re 108 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON REMAINING COUNTS DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES, INC.'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARYJUDGMENT ON REMAINING COUNTS filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Smith, Jeffrey)
October 20, 2011 125 Featured Case ORDER denying 119 Motion to File Under Seal Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 10/20/2011. (TCL, ) Modified on 10/20/2011 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury (APP, ).
October 18, 2011 124 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. Amendment to 111 Affidavit in Support of Motion,, AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF JEFFREY B. SMITH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON REMAINING COUNTS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K) (Smith, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/21/2011 to create relationship w/ 108 Motion (APP, ).
October 18, 2011 123 RESPONSE to Motion re 119 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A) Appendix B is a DVD and will be retained in the Clerk's Office) (ASG, )
October 18, 2011 122 REPLY to Response to Motion re 119 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Leonard, Thomas)
October 17, 2011 121 Featured Case ORDER denying 70 Spreadbury's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; adopting Findings and Recommendations 79 . Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 10/17/2011. Copy mailed to Spreadbury. (ASG, )
October 11, 2011 120 Brief/Memorandum in Support re 119 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Leonard, Thomas)
October 11, 2011 119 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Thomas J. Leonard appearing for Defendants Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Leonard, Thomas)
October 7, 2011 118 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 76 Findings and Recommendations regarding 30 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 10/7/2011. (APP, ) Copy mailed to Spreadbury this date.
October 7, 2011 117 Featured Case ORDER denying 114 Motion for Leave to File Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 10/7/2011. (TCL, ) Modified on 10/7/2011 to reflect mailing copy to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
October 6, 2011 116 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael E. Spreadbury re 114 MOTION for Leave to File, 115 Response to Motion. (APP, )
October 6, 2011 115 RESPONSE to Motion re 108 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON REMAINING COUNTS filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit to Affidavit) (APP, )
October 6, 2011 114 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Sanctions, Purjury, False Swearing by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (APP, )
October 4, 2011 113 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 75 Findings and Recommendations regarding 5 Motion to Dismiss filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated and 51 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 10/4/2011. (APP, ) Copy mailed to Spreadbury this date.
September 29, 2011 112 Featured Case ORDER imposing an award of attorney's fees under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37 based on 56 MOTION to Compel filed by Bitterroot Public Library, City of Hamilton, and 82 MOTION to Compel Compliance With Discovery Order filed by Ryan Oster, Steve Snavely, Nansu Roddy, Robert Brophy, Trista Smith, Steven Bruner-Murphy, Kenneth S. Bell, Jennifer B. Lint, Jerry Steele, City of Hamilton, Bitterroot Public Library. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 9/29/2011. (TCL, ) Modified on 9/29/2011 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
September 28, 2011 111 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 108 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON REMAINING COUNTS FOUNDATIONAL AFFIDAVIT OF JEFFREY B SMITH IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON REMAINING COUNTS filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J) (Smith, Jeffrey)
September 28, 2011 110 Statement of Undisputed Fact re: 108 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON REMAINING COUNTS by Lee Enterprises Incorporated filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. (Smith, Jeffrey)
September 28, 2011 109 Brief/Memorandum in Support re 108 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON REMAINING COUNTS Def Lee Enterprises Inc's Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment on Remaining Counts filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. (Smith, Jeffrey)
September 28, 2011 108 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON REMAINING COUNTS Jeffrey Brandon Smith appearing for Defendant Lee Enterprises Incorporated Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Smith, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2011 107 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 67 Findings and Recommendations regarding 50 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Michael E. Spreadbury and 11 Motion to Dismiss filed by Boone Karlberg P.C. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 9/27/2011. (APP, ) Copy mailed to Spreadbury this date.
September 14, 2011 106 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Jeremiah C. Lynch: Hearing on Defendants' requests for attorney fees and expenses; Tom Leonard appeared for defendants Bitterroot Public Library et al, Michael Spreadbury appeared pro se; Both sides gave argument; Matter taken under advisement - written order to follow. (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (APP, )
September 12, 2011 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE re 105 Affidavit/Declaration. The signature on this document does not comply with Local Rules or the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures Manual. YOU DO NOT NEED TO REFILE. This notice is for your information for future filings. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. A PDF DOCUMENT IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY. All signatures for affidavits/declarations must be conventionally signed. Please call our office if you have any questions. Thank you. (APP, )
September 9, 2011 105 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re 100 Order on Motion to Compel Regarding Attorney's Fees and Discovery by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Crowley, William)
September 6, 2011 104 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael E. Spreadbury re 103 Objection, 102 Notice (Other) (APP, )
September 6, 2011 103 Objection to Hearing/Court Costs re: 100 Order on Motion to Compel. (APP, )
September 6, 2011 102 NOTICE of filing Joint Response to Defense re: 2nd Amended Complaint by Michael E. Spreadbury re 98 Answer to Amended Complaint, 99 Answer to Amended Complaint (APP, )
August 29, 2011 101 Featured Case ORDER denying 17 Motion for Recusal. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 8/29/2011. (APP, ) Copy mailed to Spreadbury this date.
August 25, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings:. Hearing on Defendants' requests for attorney fees and expenses set for 9/14/2011 at 01:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Jeremiah C. Lynch. (TXB, )
August 25, 2011 100 Featured Case ORDER granting 82 Motion to Compel Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 8/25/2011. (TXB, ) Modified on 8/26/2011 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
August 24, 2011 99 Def Lee Enterprises Inc's ANSWER to 90 Amended Complaint by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. (Smith, Jeffrey)
August 23, 2011 98 Joint ANSWER to 90 Amended Complaint by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Crowley, William)
August 17, 2011 97 Reply to Objection to Findings and Recommendations re 79 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 70 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Michael E. Spreadbury.FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 70 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. DEF LEE'S RESPONSE TO PL'S OBJECTIONS TO FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF US MAGISTRATE JUDGE RE PL'S REQUEST FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. (Smith, Jeffrey)
August 17, 2011 96 Reply to Objection to Findings and Recommendations re 75 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 5 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lee Enterprises, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss All Counts Against Lee Enterprises filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated, 51 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Michael E.FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 5 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lee Enterprises, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss All Counts Against Lee Enterprises filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated, 51 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Michael E. DEF LEE ENTERPRISES' RESPONSE TO PL'S OBJECTIONS TO FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF US MAGISTRATE JUDGE RE LEE ENTERPRISES' MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. (Smith, Jeffrey)
August 16, 2011 95 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael E. Spreadbury re 94 Reply and 93 Reply (APP, )
August 16, 2011 94 REPLY to Defendants Reply to Objection re 76 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 30 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. (Attachments: # 1 Attachments) (APP, )
August 16, 2011 93 REPLY to Response to Motion re 70 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. (APP, )
August 16, 2011 92 Reply to Objection to Findings and Recommendations re 79 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 70 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Michael E. Spreadbury.FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 70 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Boone Karlberg P.C., Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Crowley, William)
August 10, 2011 91 OBJECTION to 79 Findings and Recommendations filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. (APP, )
August 10, 2011 90 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lee Enterprises Incorporated, Jerry Steele, filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. (APP, )
August 10, 2011 89 Reply to Objection to Findings and Recommendations re 76 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 30 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Michael E. Spreadbury.FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 30 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. filed by Bitterroot Public Library, City of Hamilton. (Crowley, William)
August 10, 2011 85 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion for Leave to File second amended complaint. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 8/10/2011. (TCL, ) Modified on 8/10/2011 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date(APP, ).
August 9, 2011 88 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael E. Spreadbury re 86 Objection to Findings and Recommendations, 87 Objection to Findings and Recommendations (APP, )
August 9, 2011 87 OBJECTION to 75 Findings and Recommendations filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. (APP, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2011: # 1 Attachment) (APP, ). Modified on 8/10/2011 to reflect NEF regenerated after attachment added (APP, ).
August 9, 2011 86 OBJECTION to 76 Findings and Recommendations filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. (APP, )
August 9, 2011 84 RESPONSE to Motion re 70 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Defendant Lee Enterprises Inc's Response Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's First Request Injunctive Relief filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Smith, Jeffrey)
August 9, 2011 83 Brief/Memorandum in Support re 82 MOTION to Compel Compliance With Discovery Order, 68 Order on Motion to Compel,,, filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Crowley, William)
August 9, 2011 82 MOTION to Compel Compliance With Discovery Order William L. Crowley appearing for Defendants Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Crowley, William)
August 4, 2011 81 Reply to Objection to Findings and Recommendations re 67 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 50 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Michael E. Spreadbury, 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Boone Karlberg P.C..FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 50 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Michael E. Spreadbury, 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Boone Karlberg P.C.. filed by Boone Karlberg P.C.. (Crowley, William)
August 4, 2011 80 OBJECTION to 67 Findings and Recommendations filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. (APP, )
August 3, 2011 79 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 70 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. Objections to F&R due by 8/22/2011 Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 8/3/2011. (TCL, ) Modified on 8/3/2011 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
July 30, 2011 78 TEXT ORDER denying 62 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike.For the reasons stated in the Court's order denying Plaintiff's motion for protective order(Dkt#77), the Plaintiff's motion to strike is properly DENIED. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 7/30/2011. (Lynch, Jeremiah) Modified on 8/1/2011 to reflect adding "text" to the entry and mailing copy to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
July 29, 2011 77 TEXT ORDER denying 71 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order. The Plaintiff'sinteractions with Defendant Roddy during the time frame pertinent to the Plaintiff's claims would appear to be relevant to the defenses asserted by the various Defendants. The Plaintiff has not established otherwise. The precise evidence that may be admissible to prove the substance of those interactions remains to be determined in the context of trial and in accordance with the applicable Federal Rules of evidence. The Plaintiff's reliance upon Fed.R.Civ.P 26(a)(1)(B)(vii) and 26 (c)(1) is entirely misplaced. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 7/29/2011. (Lynch, Jeremiah) Modified on 8/1/2011 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
July 28, 2011 76 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 30 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. Objections to F&R due by 8/15/2011 Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 7/28/2011. (TXB, ) Modified on 7/28/2011 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
July 28, 2011 75 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 5 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lee Enterprises, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss All Counts Against Lee Enterprises filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated, 51 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. Objections to F&R due by 8/15/2011 Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 7/28/2011. (TXB, ) Modified on 7/28/2011 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
July 27, 2011 74 RESPONSE to Motion re 71 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Boone Karlberg P.C., Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Crowley, William)
July 27, 2011 73 RESPONSE to Motion re 70 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Boone Karlberg P.C., Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Crowley, William)
July 27, 2011 72 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael E. Spreadbury re 70 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 71 MOTION for Protective Order (APP, )
July 27, 2011 71 MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (APP, )
July 27, 2011 70 MOTION for Injunctive Relief by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (APP, )
July 26, 2011 69 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Crowley, William)
July 25, 2011 68 TEXT ORDER Before the Court is 56 Defendants City of Hamilton, Bitterroot Public Library, Brophy, Smith, Roddy, Steele, Snavely, Murphy, Oster, Bell and Lint's Fed.R.Civ.P.37 motion seeking to compel Plaintiff Spreadbury to respond to numerous discovery requests. Having considered the parties' respective positions, the Court finds the Defendants' motion to be well taken. Plaintiff Spreadbury's position that discovery should be stayed is without merit. Therefore, It Is Hereby ORDERED that the Defendant's motion to compel is GRANTED. The Court shall, by separate order, set a hearing upon Defendants' request for an award of expenses under Fed.R.Civ.P. 37(a)(5)(A). Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 7/25/2011. (TCL, ) Modified on 7/25/2011 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
July 21, 2011 67 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 50 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Michael E. Spreadbury, 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Boone Karlberg P.C.. Objections to F&R due by 8/8/2011 Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 7/21/2011. (TCL, ) Modified on 7/25/2011 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
July 13, 2011 66 RESPONSE to Motion re 62 MOTION to Strike DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. (Smith, Jeffrey)
July 8, 2011 65 RESPONSE to Motion re 62 MOTION to Strike filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Boone Karlberg P.C., Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Crowley, William)
July 6, 2011 64 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael E. Spreadbury re 62 MOTION to Strike, 63 Reply to Response to Motion (APP, )
July 6, 2011 63 REPLY to Response to Motion re 51 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. (APP, )
July 6, 2011 62 MOTION to Strike by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (APP, )
June 30, 2011 61 REPLY to Response to Motion re 56 MOTION to Compel, 55 MOTION to Compel filed by Kenneth S. Bell, Bitterroot Public Library, Robert Brophy, Steven Bruner-Murphy, City of Hamilton, Jennifer B. Lint, Ryan Oster, Nansu Roddy, Trista Smith, Steve Snavely, Jerry Steele. (Crowley, William)
June 29, 2011 60 RESPONSE to Motion re 56 MOTION to Compel filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. (APP, )
June 29, 2011 59 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Honorable Jeremiah C. Lynch. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 6/29/2011. Copy mailed to Spreadbury. (ASG, )
June 21, 2011 58 Statement of Genuine Issues re: 51 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. (Smith, Jeffrey)
June 21, 2011 57 RESPONSE to Motion re 51 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment DEF LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO PL'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST LEE ENTERPRISES filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOUNDATIONAL AFFIDAVIT OF JEFFREY B. SMITH, # 2 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Stacey Mueller, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O) (Smith, Jeffrey)
June 16, 2011 56 MOTION to Compel filed by Bitterroot Public Library, City of Hamilton. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Crowley, William) Modified on 6/16/2011 to correct entry to Motion from Brief. Regenerated NEF (APP, ).
June 16, 2011 55 Brief/Memorandum in Support re 56 MOTION to Compel filed by Bitterroot Public Library, City of Hamilton. (Crowley, William) Modified on 6/16/2011 to correct entry to Brief from Motion. Regenerated NEF (APP, ). Modified on 6/16/2011 to create relationship to 56 Motion (APP, ).
June 9, 2011 54 Statement of Genuine Issues re: 53 Response to Motion filed by Boone Karlberg P.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D) (Leonard, Thomas) Modified on 6/10/2011 to create relationship w/ 50 Motion (APP, ).
June 9, 2011 53 RESPONSE to Motion re 50 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Boone Karlberg P.C.. (Leonard, Thomas)
May 31, 2011 52 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael E. Spreadbury re 50 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 51 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (APP, )
May 31, 2011 51 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment & Brief in Support against Lee Enterprises Inc. by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (APP, )
May 31, 2011 50 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment & Brief in Support against Boone Karlberg PC by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (APP, )
May 26, 2011 49 Featured Case ORDER denying 48 Motion for Recusal. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 5/26/2011. (TCL, ) Modified on 5/27/2011 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
May 26, 2011 48 MOTION for Recusal by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (APP, )
May 25, 2011 47 Featured Case ORDER denying 36 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 38 Motion to Remand; denying 42 Motion to Stay Discovery; granting 15 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 16 Motion to Appoint Counsel Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 5/25/2011. (TCL, ) Modified on 5/26/2011 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
May 25, 2011 46 Featured Case ORDER denying 17 Motion for Recusal. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 5/25/2011. (TCL, ) Modified on 5/26/2011 to reflect copy mailed to Spreadbury this date (APP, ).
May 23, 2011 45 RESPONSE to Motion re 36 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Notice of Fraud filed by Bitterroot Public Library, Boone Karlberg P.C., City of Hamilton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Crowley, William)
May 20, 2011 44 RESPONSE to Motion re 36 MOTION to Appoint Counsel DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC.'S RESPONSE BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT LEAD DEFENSE COUNSEL filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. (Smith, Jeffrey)
May 19, 2011 43 RESPONSE to Motion re 42 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Bitterroot Public Library, City of Hamilton. (Crowley, William)
May 19, 2011 42 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (APP, )
May 19, 2011 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Boone Karlberg P.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3) (Jones, Natasha)
May 18, 2011 40 RESPONSE to Motion re 38 MOTION to Remand filed by Bitterroot Public Library, City of Hamilton. (Crowley, William)
May 17, 2011 39 Response to 2 Answer to Complaint, 3 Answer to Complaint filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. (APP, )
May 17, 2011 38 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (APP, )
May 17, 2011 37 RESPONSE to Motion re 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. (APP, )
May 17, 2011 36 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (APP, )
May 17, 2011 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re 5 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lee Enterprises, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss All Counts Against Lee Enterprises DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC'S REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. (Smith, Jeffrey)
May 17, 2011 34 Notice of Joinder by Lee Enterprises Incorporated re: 24 Response to Motion DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC.'S JOINDER IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (Smith, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/23/2011 to create relationship to 21 Motion (APP, ).
May 16, 2011 33 Statement of Genuine Issues re: 32 Response to Motion filed by City of Hamilton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Leonard, Thomas) Modified on 5/17/2011 to create relationship to 30 Motion (APP, ).
May 16, 2011 32 RESPONSE to Motion re 30 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by City of Hamilton. (Leonard, Thomas)
May 13, 2011 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael E. Spreadbury re 30 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and 29 Notice. (ASG, )
May 13, 2011 30 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment against Defendant City of Hamilton, Bitterroot Public Library by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (ASG, )
May 13, 2011 29 NOTICE of Fraud; F.R.Civ.P.(9)(b) by City of Hamilton, Public Library by Michael E. Spreadbury. (ASG, )
May 12, 2011 28 Electronic Mailing of Consent to Counsel: Judge Lynch as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Natasha Prinzing Jones, William L. Crowley, Thomas J. Leonard, Jeffrey Brandon Smith. Consent mailed to Plaintiff Spreadbury via USPS this date. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 6/16/2011. (NOS, )
May 11, 2011 27 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Jeremiah C. Lynch. Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 5/11/2011. (dle) Modified on 5/12/2011 to reflect that a copy of this Order was mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff Spreadbury. (ASG, ).
May 10, 2011 26 Notice of Joinder by Lee Enterprises Incorporated re: 22 Response to Motion DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES INC.'S JOINDER IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION/RECUSAL OF JUDGES (Smith, Jeffrey)
May 10, 2011 25 Notice of Joinder by Lee Enterprises Incorporated re: 19 Response to Motion DEFENDANT LEE ENTERPRISES, INC.'S JOINDER IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL (Smith, Jeffrey)
May 9, 2011 24 RESPONSE to Motion re 21 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by City of Hamilton. (Leonard, Thomas)
May 9, 2011 23 RESPONSE to Motion re 5 MOTION to Dismiss All Counts Against Lee Enterprises, Inc., filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. (ASG, )
May 5, 2011 22 RESPONSE to Motion re 17 MOTION for Recusal filed by Bitterroot Public Library, City of Hamilton. (Crowley, William)
May 4, 2011 21 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury. (ASG, )
May 4, 2011 20 Notice of Joinder by Lee Enterprises Incorporated re: 13 Notice (Other) Defendant Lee Enterprises, Inc.'s Joinder in Response to Plaintiff's Objection to Removal (Smith, Jeffrey)
May 4, 2011 19 RESPONSE to Motion re 16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Bitterroot Public Library, City of Hamilton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Crowley, William)
May 4, 2011 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael E. Spreadbury re 17 MOTION for Recusal, 16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. (ASG, )
May 4, 2011 17 MOTION for Recusal by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (ASG, )
May 4, 2011 16 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (ASG, )
May 4, 2011 15 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael E. Spreadbury. (ASG, )
May 4, 2011 14 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits - Redacted Exhibit A re: 12 Brief/Memorandum in Support (Jones, Natasha)
May 3, 2011 13 NOTICE by Bitterroot Public Library, City of Hamilton of Response to Plaintiff's Objection to Removal (Crowley, William)
May 3, 2011 12 Brief/Memorandum in Support re 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Boone Karlberg P.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D) (Jones, Natasha) Modified on 5/3/2011 to reflect that Exhibit A has been sealed per Chambers and Counsel has been contacted and will refile a redacted version of Exhibit A. (ASG, ).
May 3, 2011 11 MOTION to Dismiss Natasha Prinzing Jones appearing for Defendant Boone Karlberg P.C. (Jones, Natasha)
April 29, 2011 10 STATE COURT AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Michael E. Spreadbury. (ASG, )
April 29, 2011 9 NOTICE of Receipt of State Court File. (Attachments: # 1 1_Notice of Recusal and Invitation to Assume Jurisdiction, # 2 2_Affidavit of Indigence and Order, # 3 3_Complaint, # 4 4_Motion for Substitution of District Judge, # 5 5_Order of Recusal, # 6 6_Letter with Copy of Invitation to Assume Jurisdiction, # 7 7_Invitation to Assume Jurisdiction re Judge Townsend, # 8 10_Affidavit for Non Corporate Status; Judicial Not Administrative Proceeding, # 9 11_Summons Returned Executed - Lee Enterprises, # 10 12_Summons Returned Executed - Bitterroot Public Library, # 11 13_Summons Returned Executed - City of Hamilton, # 12 14_Summons Returned Executed - Boone Karlberg, # 13 15_Objection to Removal, Use of Public Funds by Defense) (ASG, )
April 28, 2011 8 Notice of Joinder by Lee Enterprises Incorporated re: 1 Notice of Removal, Defendant Lee Enterprises' Joinder of Removal (Smith, Jeffrey)
April 28, 2011 7 Brief/Memorandum in Support re 5 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lee Enterprises, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss All Counts Against Lee Enterprises Defendant Lee Enterprises' Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss All Counts Against Lee Enterprises filed by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. (Smith, Jeffrey)
April 28, 2011 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lee Enterprises Incorporated. (Smith, Jeffrey)
April 28, 2011 5 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lee Enterprises, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss All Counts Against Lee Enterprises Jeffrey Brandon Smith appearing for Defendant Lee Enterprises Incorporated (Smith, Jeffrey)
April 26, 2011 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Leonard on behalf of Bitterroot Public Library, Boone Karlberg P.C., City of Hamilton (Leonard, Thomas)
April 26, 2011 3 Joint ANSWER to Complaint (Brophy, Smith, Roddy, Steele, Snavely, Bruner-Murphy, Oster, Bell and Lint) by City of Hamilton. (Crowley, William)
April 26, 2011 2 Joint ANSWER to Complaint by Bitterroot Public Library, City of Hamilton. (Crowley, William)
April 19, 2011 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bitterroot Public Library, City of Hamilton from Montana Twenty-First Judicial District Court, Ravalli County, case number DV-11-184. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0977-870702), filed by Bitterroot Public Library, City of Hamilton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Jones, Natasha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spreadbury v. Bitterroot Public Library et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E. Spreadbury
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bitterroot Public Library
Represented By: Thomas J. Leonard
Represented By: Natasha Prinzing Jones
Represented By: William L. Crowley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hamilton
Represented By: William L. Crowley
Represented By: Natasha Prinzing Jones
Represented By: Thomas J. Leonard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Enterprises Incorporated
Represented By: Jeffrey Brandon Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boone Karlberg P.C.
Represented By: William L. Crowley
Represented By: Natasha Prinzing Jones
Represented By: Thomas J. Leonard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]