Maier v. Mahoney

Respondent: Mike Mahoney
Petitioner: Lloyd Scott Maier
Case Number: 9:2011cv00084
Filed: June 8, 2011
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Missoula Office
County: CASCADE
Referring Judge: Jeremiah C. Lynch
Presiding Judge: Donald W. Molloy
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 14 Motion to File Under Seal Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 11/1/2011. Mailed to Maier. (TAG, )
February 3, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. ; granting 16 Motion to Dismiss; adopting Findings and Recommendations re 27 Findings and Recommendations; FURTHER ORDERED that a certificate of appealability is DENIED. The Clerk is directed to enter, by separate document, a judgment of dismissal without prejudice. (hard copy to Maier) Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 2/3/2012. (CDH, )
July 29, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SEVERANCE. Maier's allegations challenging the conviction and sentence he incurred in 1996 are SEVERED from the remaining allegations in his petition. They will not be further addressed in this action. Case CV 11-79-BLF-RFC-CSO opened; documents filed in that case as directed. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 7/29/2011. Mailed to Maier. (TAG, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maier v. Mahoney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mike Mahoney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lloyd Scott Maier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]