Evans v. Fink et al

Petitioner: Marty Evans
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Montana and Martin Fink
Case Number: 9:2011cv00112
Filed: August 17, 2011
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Missoula Office
County: LAKE
Referring Judge: Jeremiah C. Lynch
Presiding Judge: Donald W. Molloy
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 25 Motion for Release. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 9/6/2012. Mailed to Evans. (TAG, )
October 31, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re; 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, claims A-F, H-I and K-Z. These claims are denied; adopting Findings and Recommendations re 22 Findings and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 10/31/2012. (hard copy mailed to Petitioner, Evans) (CDH, )
August 30, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 41 in full to the extent not inconsistent with this Order. Claim G presented in the Petition is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Claim J is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim. The state's Motion to Dismiss 31 is DISMISSED as MOOT. Mr. Evans's 1 Petition is DENIED. A Certificate of Appealability is DENIED. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 8/30/2013. Mailed to Evans. (TAG, )
November 20, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing 49 Petition for Reconsideration. To the extent a certificate of appealability is required and permitted, it is DENIED. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 11/20/2014. Mailed to Evans. (TAG, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Fink et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marty Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Montana
Represented By: C. Mark Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Martin Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.