Nelson et al v. Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest et al

Plaintiff: Lucas Nelson and Shannon Robinson Nelson
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Irma Sullivan and John Does A, B and C
Case Number: 9:2011cv00162
Filed: September 27, 2011
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Missoula Office
County: RAVALLI
Presiding Judge: Donald W. Molloy
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Plaintiffs shall notify the Court by 4/23/2012 of new or additional counsel or intentions to proceed pro se. Depositions are STAYED until 4/23/2012. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 3/8/2012. (dle)
March 20, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 3/20/2012. (dle)
November 20, 2012 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 67 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 81 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 11/20/2012. (dle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson et al v. Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucas Nelson
Represented By: Tracey L. Morin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Robinson Nelson
Represented By: Tracey L. Morin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Represented By: Ian McIntosh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: Paul N. Tranel
Represented By: John E. Bohyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irma Sullivan
Represented By: Ian McIntosh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does A, B and C
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]