Jonas et al v. Waterman et al

Defendant: Ronald F. Waterman, Gough, Shanahan, Johnson & Waterman, PLLP and Charles B. McNeil
Plaintiff: Edwin Ritter Jonas, III and Blacktail Mountain Ranch Co. LLC
Case Number: 9:2013cv00016
Filed: January 24, 2013
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Missoula Office
County: XX out of state
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Referring Judge: Jeremiah C. Lynch
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity - Legal Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 19 Motion to Vacate ; granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appearance Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 3/25/2013. (TXB, )Copy mailed to Plaintiff (NOS, ).
June 5, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 48 Motion to Strike ; denying 48 Motion for Sanctions Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 6/5/2013. (TXB, ) Modified on 6/5/2013 to reflect copy mailed to Pltf this date (APP, ).
June 12, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and granting 10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Judge McNeil is DISMISSED from this action. Plaintiff Blacktail Mountain Ranch Co., LLC is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 6/12/2013. (APP, ) Copy mailed to Jonas this date.
December 2, 2013 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS - granting 42 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 70 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying as moot 76 Motion for Certificate of Appealability; finding as moot 88 Motion to Vacate ; adopting Findings and Recommendations re 91 Findings and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/2/2013. (APP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jonas et al v. Waterman et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald F. Waterman
Represented By: J. Daniel Hoven
Represented By: M. Christy S. McCann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gough, Shanahan, Johnson & Waterman, PLLP
Represented By: J. Daniel Hoven
Represented By: M. Christy S. McCann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles B. McNeil
Represented By: Margaret A. Sampsel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Ritter Jonas, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blacktail Mountain Ranch Co. LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]