Christ v. State of Montana et al

Defendant: Stacy Lear, State of Montana, City of Missoula Police Department, Office of the Public Defender, Karen Townsend, Jennifer Clark and Andrew Paul
Plaintiff: Jason Christ
Case Number: 9:2013cv00075
Filed: April 18, 2013
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Missoula Office
County: MISSOULA
Referring Judge: Jeremiah C. Lynch
Presiding Judge: Donald W. Molloy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Vacating August 29, 2013 preliminary pretrial conference, ORDER re: 11 denying MOTION to Continue, and denying as moot MOTION for Leave to File amended complaint filed by Jason Christ. Motions terminated: 11 MOTION to Continue MOTION for Leave to File filed by Jason Christ. SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Bench Trial set for 6/23/2014 at 08:30 AM in Missoula, MT before Judge Donald W. Molloy., Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/23/2014 at 08:30 AM in Missoula, MT before Judge Donald W. M olloy., Amended Pleadings due by 10/7/2013., Discovery due by 2/24/2014., Motions due by 3/24/2014., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/16/2014.) Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 8/26/2013. (TCL, ) Modified on 8/26/2013 to reflect copy mailed to Christ this date (APP, ).
September 30, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS - granting 9 Motion to Dismiss Clark and Paul. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 9/30/2013. (APP, ) Copy to Christ this date.
October 30, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS - granting 23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 10/30/2013. (APP, ) Copy mailed to Christ this date.
October 30, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 27 Findings and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 10/30/2013. (APP, ) Copy mailed to Christ this date.
November 21, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 Motion to Dismiss Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 11/21/2013. (TXB, ) Modified on 11/21/2013 to reflect copy mailed to Christ this date (APP, ).
December 30, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 37 , GRANTING MOTION to Dismiss 34 filed by Jason Christ. Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch termed; case no longer referred. Claims against City of Missoula Police Department and Detective Lear are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 12/30/2013. Copy mailed to Christ this date. (NOS, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christ v. State of Montana et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Lear
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Montana
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Missoula Police Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Public Defender
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Townsend
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Clark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Paul
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Christ
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]