Lewis v. Extradition Transport of America

Defendant: Extradition Transport of America
Plaintiff: Stanford Allen Lewis, Jr.
 
Case Number: 9:2013cv00138
Filed: July 8, 2013
 
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Missoula Office
County: MISSOULA
Referring Judge: Jeremiah C. Lynch
Presiding Judge: Donald W. Molloy
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 10 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full; denying 3 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 9/25/2013. Mailed to Lewis. (TAG, )
October 24, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 10/24/2013. Mailed to Lewis. (TAG, )
December 2, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Lewis's Motion for Default Judgment 22 to the extent he is requesting entry of default is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter the default of Defendant Extradition Transport of America. A hearing shall be held on Lewis' ;s Motion for Default Judgment on January 9, 2014, at the Russell Smith Courthouse in Missoula, Montana. No later that December 16, 2013, Lewis shall file a notice with the Court indicating that he has made arrangements on his own to appear at the January 9, 2014, hearing or that he wishes to appear by video conferencing. Lewis's Motion to Appoint Receivership 23 is denied. Lewis's Motion to Enforce Judgment and Appoint Receivership 24 is denied. Signed by Jeremiah C. Lynch on 12/2/2013. Mailed to Lewis. (TAG, )
February 5, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 40 in full. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter default judgment in favor of Stanford Allen Lewis, Jr. and against Extradition Transport o fAmerica in the amount of $75,000.00. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 2/5/2014. Mailed to Lewis. (TAG, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lewis v. Extradition Transport of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Extradition Transport of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanford Allen Lewis, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]