CCR/AG Showcase Phase I Owner, L.L.C. v. United Artists Theatre Circuit, Inc.

Plaintiff: CCR/AG Showcase Phase I Owner, L.L.C.
Defendant: United Artists Theatre Circuit, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2008cv00984
Filed: July 30, 2008
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Rent Lease & Ejectment Office
County: XX US, Outside State
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: George W Foley
Presiding Judge: Brian E. Sandoval
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2010 106 Featured Case ORDER Granting 98 Plaintiff/Counterdefendant CCR/AG Showcase Phase I Owner, LLC's Motion for Sanctions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that discovery in this case is extended until 8/13/2010. The court will separately issue an amended scheduling order and order setting new trial date. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/13/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 26, 2011 143 Featured Case ORDERED that Defendant United Artists is ordered to pay Plaintiff CCR/AG the total sum of $16,655.00. Defendant is further ordered to make the payment to Plaintiff by June 27, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/26/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 21, 2011 147 Featured Case ORDER Granting 144 Motion to Extend Time to File the Joint Pretrial Order. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/22/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 6/21/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 9, 2011 153 Featured Case ORDER Granting, in part, 149 Second Request to Modify Scheduling Order to Extend Date to File Joint Pretrial Order. Defendant shall provide to Plaintiff its portion of the joint pretrial order no later than 8/19/11. FURTHER ORDERED that the final Joint Pretrial Order shall be filed with the court no later than 8/29/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 8/9/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 12, 2012 182 Featured Case ORDER Denying 173 Motion in Limine requesting a jury view of the property site. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/12/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 17, 2012 223 Featured Case ORDER that the oral argument on 218 MOTION to Enforce Settlement, 219 MOTION to Compel and 220 MOTION for Default Judgment is VACATED. The court will issue a written order on the pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/17/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: CCR/AG Showcase Phase I Owner, L.L.C. v. United Artists Theatre Circuit, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CCR/AG Showcase Phase I Owner, L.L.C.
Represented By: Richard J. Pocker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Artists Theatre Circuit, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]