Slaughter et al v. Uponor, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Edwin K Slaughter, Rebecca Flinn, Mel Healey and Carol Healey
Defendant: Uponor, Inc., Uponor North America, Inc., RCR Plumbing and Mechanical, Inc., Interstate Plumbing & Conditioning, LLC, United Plumbing, LLC, Ferguson Enterprises, Inc., Hughes Water & Sewer, LP, Standard Wholesale Supply Company and HD Supply Construction Supply Limited Partnership
Case Number: 2:2008cv01223
Filed: September 15, 2008
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Contract Product Liability Office
County: Clark
Referring Judge: George W Foley
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2013 1099 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the hearing on Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Class Certification 691 , 692 currently set for MONDAY, August 12, 2013 at 1:30 P.M., in LASVEGAS COURTROOM 4B, before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to WEDNESDAY, AUGUST 7, 2013 at 8:30 A.M., in LAS VEGAS COURTROOM 4B, before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/1/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 14, 2013 1121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a transcript of the Status Conference hearing held on August 7, 2013, before Robert C. Jones shall be prepared for the Court. The Court shall pay for the preparation of the transcript. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/14/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 18, 2010 415 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 356 Motion to Amend/Correct Judgment, Denying 357 Motion to Intervene for Purposes of Appeal, Granting 381 Motion to Strike 374 Supplement, Denying 407 Motion to Strike New Arguments, Denying 408 Motion for Leave to File Surreply, and Granting 412 Motion to Strike 406 Response. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/18/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
September 20, 2010 453 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 432 Motion for Re-Taxation of Costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Ferguson Enterprises, Inc. and United Plumbing, LLC are entitled to $14,554.77 in taxable costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Hughes Wa ter Sewer, LP is entitled to $5,304.37 in taxable costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Interstate Plumbing & Air Conditioning is entitled to $15,469.00 in taxable costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that United Plumbing, LLC is entitled to $10,911.29 in taxable costs. The Clerk of the Court shall retax costs accordingly. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/20/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; CC: Operations Manager - ASB)
November 29, 2010 468 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 350 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Ferguson is awarded 100% of its taxable costs in the amount of $14,554.77; one-fifth (20%) of its attorneys fees and other costs in the amount of $66,731.67 for a total award of $81,286.44. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/29/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
November 29, 2010 469 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Ferguson in the amount of $81,286.44. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 11/29/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
November 29, 2010 470 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 351 Motion for Attorney Fees. United Plumbing is awarded its taxable costs in the amount of $10,911.29; one-fifth (20%) of its attorneys fees and other costs in the amount of $33,679.87 for a total award of $49,591.16. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/29/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
November 29, 2010 472 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 352 Motion for Attorney Fees. Hughes is awarded $52,672.38, which represents twenty percent (20%) of its requested attorneys' fees and non-taxable costs. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/29/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
November 29, 2010 473 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Hughes in the amount of $52,672.38. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 11/29/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
November 29, 2010 474 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 353 Motion for Attorney Fees. RCR is awarded 100% of its taxable costs in the amount of $17,502.72, 20% of its attorneys fees in the amount of $19,312.890, and 20% of its non-taxable costs in the amount of $7,111.50. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/29/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
November 29, 2010 475 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of RCR in the amount of $43,927.13. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 11/29/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
November 29, 2010 476 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 354 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Court awards Defendant Interstate Plumbing & Air Condition, LLC twenty percent (20%) of its requested attorneys' fees and non-taxable costs, including experts& #039; fees, in the amount of $53,831.25. The Court awards Defendant Interstate Plumbing & Air Conditioning, LLC taxable costs in the amount of $15,469.00. As such, the Court award Defendant Interstate Plumbing & Air Conditioning, LLC its attorneys' fees and costs in the total amount of $69,300.25. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/29/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
November 29, 2010 477 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Interstate Plumbing & Air Conditioning, LLC in the amount of $69,300.25. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 11/29/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB) (Main Document 477 replaced on 11/30/2010) (ASB).
April 1, 2011 512 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Motion to Stay State Court Action 485 is DENIED. The Motions to Strike 501 503 are DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/1/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
May 11, 2011 539 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 514 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Denying 515 Motion for TRO. Denying 528 Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/11/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 9, 2012 574 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 558 Motion to Dismiss. FURTHER ORDERED that 551 Motion for Disbursement of Funds is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Court's previous orders and judgments relating to attorney's fees (ECF Nos. 468-477) are VACATED. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/9/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 13, 2012 590 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Motion to Stay 578 is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/13/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 26, 2012 634 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 600 Motion to Intervene. FURTHER ORDERED that 582 Motion for Status Conference is GRANTED; the Status Conference is set on Monday, January 7, 2013 at 11:00 a.m. in Las Vegas Courtroom 4B before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. FURTHER ORDERED that 581 Motion to Sever is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 583 Motion for Clarification is GRANTED. The stays in the member cases are LIFTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 584 Motion for Case Management is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/26/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 14, 2013 673 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Consolidate. It is ORDERED that 2:11-c-1498, 2:11-cv-1875, 2:12-cv-206, 2:12-cv-207, 2:12-cv-002, 2:11-cv-425 are consolidated under 2:08-cv-1223. FURTHER ORDERED that all further pleadings shall be filed in the relevant lead case only. Pla intiffs in the respective lead cases shall have leave to file consolidated amended complaints and, in the Slaughter case, an amended motion for class certification within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order into the electronic docket in o rder to consolidate existing parties and claims into a single pleading. The amended complaint shall not add substance or additional legal theories. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/14/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 23, 2013 686 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 682 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Gregory H. King is substituted in place and stead of Robert E Schumacher for defendant Greystone Nevada, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/23/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 8, 2013 718 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that all claims related to the Vanguard/Viega plumbing system are SEVERED from the following cases: Southern Terrace Homeowners Association v. Viega, Inc., No. 2:12-cv-206; and Anthem Highlands Community Association v. Viega, Inc., No. 2:12-cv-207. FURTHER ORDERED that the Vanguard/Viega claims severed from the Southern Terrace Homeowners Association v. Viega, Inc., No. 2:12-cv-206; and Anthem Highlands Community Association v. Viega, Inc., No. 2:12-cv- 207 actions are CONSOLIDATED for all purposes, including discovery and trial, as member cases into the lead Vanguard/Viega case Waterfall Homeowners Association v. Viega, Inc., No. 2:11-cv-1498. FURTHER ORDERED that all discovery in th e consolidated Uponor/Wirsbo and Vanguard/Viega actions shall be coordinated to the greatest extent possible so as to minimize the expense and burden on all parties in these actions.FURTHER ORDERED that all further Vanguard/Viega-related plea dings and papers shall be filed in the lead Vanguard/Viega case only. Plaintiffs in the lead Vanguard/Viega case shall have leave to file a consolidated amended complaint within 10 days of entry of this order. The amended complaint shall not add addi tional legal theories and shall conform to all of the Courts prior orders in the Waterfall action.FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall enter this Order into the dockets of this action, the lead Vanguard case, and the two Vanguard member cases. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/8/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Main Document 718 replaced on 2/8/2013) (MMM).
February 8, 2013 719 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the stays in the following members cases are lifted as described above: Solera at Anthem Community Association v. Del Webb Communities, Inc., No. 2:11-cv-425; The Seasons Homeowners Association, Inc. v. Richmond American Homes o f Nevada, Inc., No. 2:11-cv-1875; Lamplight Square at Green Valley Homeowners' Association v. Greystone Nevada LLC, No. 2:12-cv-2; and Southern Terrace Homeowners Association v. Viega, Inc., No. 2:12-cv-206. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/8/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 14, 2013 740 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 693 Motion for Leave to File Thrid Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint is GRANTED, and the Clerk shall file the TACCAP and attachments (ECF Nos. 693-1, 694-697). FURTHER ORDERED that the Motions to Dismiss 646 , 647 , 648 , 650 , and 653 are DENIED as moot without prejudice, but may be re-filed as against the TACCAP. FURTHER ORDERED that 702 Motion to Clarify is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 664 Motion to Certify Class is DENIED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/11/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 19, 2013 828 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Granting 747 Motion for Entry of Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/19/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 25, 2013 836 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 739 Motion re: Discovery is DENIED Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/25/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 2, 2013 985 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 984 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer/Respond. Rising Sun Plumbing, LLC dba RSP, Inc. answer due 9/3/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/1/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slaughter et al v. Uponor, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin K Slaughter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Flinn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mel Healey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Healey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uponor, Inc.
Represented By: Peter C Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uponor North America, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCR Plumbing and Mechanical, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Plumbing & Conditioning, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Plumbing, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferguson Enterprises, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hughes Water & Sewer, LP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Wholesale Supply Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HD Supply Construction Supply Limited Partnership
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]