Koven v. American Honda Motor Co., Inc.

Defendant: American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Dori H. Koven
Case Number: 2:2010cv00638
Filed: May 4, 2010
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Lloyd D. George
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Paragraphs 8 and 12 of the parties' Stipulated Protect Order 27 are NOT APPROVED. The parties shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule 10-5(b) and the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, with re spect to any documents filed under seal or used at trial. The parties' Stipulated Protective Order 27 , as modified and signed by the court, is APPROVED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/23/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 31, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS that 29 Motion to Certify Class and 41 Motion for Summary Judgment are DENIED without prejudice. THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS that parties shall file a joint report on the status within twenty (20)days. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 1/31/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
February 21, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE Granting 47 Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 2/21/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koven v. American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dori H. Koven
Represented By: James R. Adams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]