Howells et al v. General Electric Company et al

Defendant: General Electric Company and Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jack Howells and Virginia Howells
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv00703
Filed: May 14, 2010
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Lloyd D. George
 
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2011 22 Featured Case ORDER Denying 16 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 8/29/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 14, 2012 32 Featured Case ORDER Granting 28 Motion to Preclude Plaintiff from Identifying Expert Witnesses Beyond Deadline or In the Alternative, Motion to Exclude Experts Improperly Identified. Plaintiffs are precluded from identifying Mr. O'Connor or Mr. Ruskauff as experts and from using the Report's information to supply evidence on a motion, at a hearing, or at trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/14/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 30, 2013 36 Featured Case ORDER Granting 31 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 1/30/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
January 30, 2013 37 Featured Case SUMMARY JUDGMENT in favor of General Electric Company against Jack Howells, Virginia Howells, Case Dismissed. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 1/30/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
May 21, 2013 44 Featured Case JUDGMENT in favor of General Electric Company against AAA Nevada Fire & Casualty Insurance Company, Jack Howells, and Virginia Howells. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 5/21/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Howells et al v. General Electric Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Jennifer W. Arledge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Howells
Represented By: Joseph Kyle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Howells
Represented By: Joseph Kyle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]