American Family Insurance Group v. Ford Motor Company

Plaintiff: American Family Insurance Group
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv00865
Filed: June 4, 2010
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
 
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring action to the Eastern District of Michigan (case number 10-13584).Case terminated. Signed by MDL on 9/8/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 17, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER that the action on this conditional remand order be remanded to its respective transferor court. Signed by MDL Panel on 4/17/12. (Attachments: # 1 Minute Order)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 22, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER that the action on this conditional remand order be remanded to its respective transferor court. Case reopened. Signed by MDL Panel on 4/17/12. (Attachments: # 1 Designation of Partial Record on Remand)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 29, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 26 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order is NOT APPROVED and is DENIED. The following discovery plan and scheduling order deadlines shall apply: Discovery due by 7/12/2013. Motions due by 8/12/2013. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/10/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/28/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 12, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER that 26 Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order is NOT APPROVED and is DENIED. The following discovery plan and scheduling order deadlines shall apply: Discovery due by 7/12/2013. Motions due by 8/12/2013. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/10/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/28/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: American Family Insurance Group v. Ford Motor Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Family Insurance Group
Represented By: Gilbert S Hernandez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Jay Joseph Schuttert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]