Herrera et al v. Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sylvia Gausch, Wilma Herrera, Carolina Salvador and Edgardo Soliman
Defendant: Totota Motor Manufacturing, Kentucky, Inc., Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. and Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2010cv00924
Filed: June 15, 2010
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants motion to dismiss 7 is GRANTED with respect to counts 5, 7, and 12. Defendants motion to dismiss 7 is DENIED with respect to counts 1, 2, 3, 4, 6, 8, and 9. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/23/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
September 13, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER to the Central District of California. Signed by MDL Panel on 9/9/10. (Attachments: # 1 cover letter)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 17, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER from MDL Panel REMANDING matter back to the District Courts from which they were transferred. (Attachments: # 1 Order)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
November 30, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 30 Notice of Change of Attorney filed by Carolina Salvador, Wilma Herrera, Edgardo Soliman, Sylvia Gausch. Attorney Craig Murphy substituted in place and stead of Attorney Cory R Eichelberger. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 11/30/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 3, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying as moot 59 Motion to Dismiss. Granting 61 Motion to Amend Complaint. Amended Complaint due within 10 days. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/3/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 18, 2013 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 72 Motion for District Judge to reconsider order. Granting 66 Motion to Remand to State Court. Denying as moot 70 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrera et al v. Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Gausch
Represented By: Cory R Eichelberger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilma Herrera
Represented By: Cory R Eichelberger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolina Salvador
Represented By: Cory R Eichelberger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgardo Soliman
Represented By: Cory R Eichelberger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Totota Motor Manufacturing, Kentucky, Inc.
Represented By: Greg W. Marsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.
Represented By: Greg W. Marsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Greg W. Marsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]