Ibbotson et al v. Mylan Laboratories, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Estate of Judith Ibbotson, Brian Ibbotson and Trevor Ibbotson
Defendant: Mylan Laboratories, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc. and Watson Laboratories, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv01123
Filed: July 8, 2010
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
 
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Ex Parte Motion to Extend Deadline. Responses due by 8/16/2010 re 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mylan Laboratories, Inc., Mylan Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 8/13/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
August 17, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 18 Motion to Dismiss Mylan Laboratories, Inc. and Mylan Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 8/17/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
October 20, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 16 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Certified copy of 22 Order and Docket Sheet mailed to State Court on 10/18/2010. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 10/20/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ibbotson et al v. Mylan Laboratories, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Judith Ibbotson
Represented By: Neil G. Galatz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Ibbotson
Represented By: Neil G. Galatz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Ibbotson
Represented By: Neil G. Galatz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer W. Arledge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer W. Arledge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer W. Arledge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]