August 21, 2015 |
Filing 301
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re #273 Judgment entered In favor of Michael Vannozzi Against Name Intelligence Inc by Defendant Jeff Ehlert. (Bragonje, John)
|
January 9, 2015 |
Filing 300
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT. (SLR)
|
January 8, 2015 |
Filing 299
MOTION for Writ of Garnishment by Receiver Resource Transition Consultants, LLC. Motion ripe 1/8/2015. (Fleming, Scott)
|
December 9, 2014 |
Filing 298
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (TR)
|
December 8, 2014 |
Filing 297
MOTION for Writ of Garnishment by Receiver Resource Transition Consultants, LLC. Motion ripe 12/8/2014. (Fleming, Scott)
|
December 8, 2014 |
Filing 296
WRITS OF GARNISHMENT (SLR)
|
December 8, 2014 |
Filing 295
WRIT OF EXECUTION in favor of Name Intelligence Inc. and against Jeff Ehlert in the amount of $176,226.71. (SLR)
|
December 8, 2014 |
Filing 294
WRITS OF GARNISHMENT. (SLR)
|
December 8, 2014 |
Filing 293
WRIT OF EXECUTION in favor of Name Intelligence Inc. and against Lauchlin McKinnon in the amount of $112,966.01. (SLR)
|
December 5, 2014 |
Filing 292
MOTION for Writ of Garnishment by Receiver Resource Transition Consultants, LLC. Motion ripe 12/5/2014. (Fleming, Scott)
|
December 5, 2014 |
Filing 291
MOTION for Writ of Garnishment by Receiver Resource Transition Consultants, LLC. Motion ripe 12/5/2014. (Fleming, Scott)
|
December 5, 2014 |
Filing 290
MOTION for Writ of Garnishment by Receiver Resource Transition Consultants, LLC. Motion ripe 12/5/2014. (Fleming, Scott)
|
December 5, 2014 |
Filing 289
MOTION for Writ of Garnishment by Receiver Resource Transition Consultants, LLC. Motion ripe 12/5/2014. (Fleming, Scott)
|
December 5, 2014 |
Filing 288
MOTION for Writ of Garnishment by Receiver Resource Transition Consultants, LLC. Motion ripe 12/5/2014. (Fleming, Scott)
|
December 5, 2014 |
Filing 287
MOTION for Writ of Garnishment by Receiver Resource Transition Consultants, LLC. Motion ripe 12/5/2014. (Fleming, Scott)
|
December 5, 2014 |
Filing 286
MOTION for Writ of Garnishment by Receiver Resource Transition Consultants, LLC. Motion ripe 12/5/2014. (Fleming, Scott)
|
December 5, 2014 |
Filing 285
MOTION for Writ of Garnishment by Receiver Resource Transition Consultants, LLC. Motion ripe 12/5/2014. (Fleming, Scott)
|
December 5, 2014 |
Filing 284
MOTION for Writ of Execution by Receiver Resource Transition Consultants, LLC. Motion ripe 12/5/2014. (Fleming, Scott)
|
December 5, 2014 |
Filing 283
AFFIDAVIT of Scott D. Fleming and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution by Receiver Resource Transition Consultants, LLC. (Fleming, Scott)
|
December 5, 2014 |
Filing 282
MOTION for Writ of Garnishment by Receiver Resource Transition Consultants, LLC. Motion ripe 12/5/2014. (Fleming, Scott)
|
December 5, 2014 |
Filing 281
MOTION for Writ of Garnishment by Receiver Resource Transition Consultants, LLC. Motion ripe 12/5/2014. (Fleming, Scott)
|
December 5, 2014 |
Filing 280
MOTION for Writ of Garnishment by Receiver Resource Transition Consultants, LLC. Motion ripe 12/5/2014. (Fleming, Scott)
|
December 5, 2014 |
Filing 279
MOTION for Writ of Garnishment by Receiver Resource Transition Consultants, LLC. Motion ripe 12/5/2014. (Fleming, Scott)
|
December 5, 2014 |
Filing 278
MOTION for Writ of Garnishment by Receiver Resource Transition Consultants, LLC. Motion ripe 12/5/2014. (Fleming, Scott)
|
December 5, 2014 |
Filing 277
MOTION for Writ of Garnishment by Receiver Resource Transition Consultants, LLC. Motion ripe 12/5/2014. (Fleming, Scott)
|
December 5, 2014 |
Filing 276
MOTION for Writ of Garnishment by Receiver Resource Transition Consultants, LLC. Motion ripe 12/5/2014. (Fleming, Scott)
|
December 5, 2014 |
Filing 275
MOTION for Writ of Execution by Receiver Resource Transition Consultants, LLC. Motion ripe 12/5/2014. (Fleming, Scott)
|
December 5, 2014 |
Filing 274
AFFIDAVIT of Scott D. Fleming and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution by Receiver Resource Transition Consultants, LLC. (Fleming, Scott)
|
June 20, 2014 |
Filing 273
JUDGMENT. Plaintiff, Name Intelligence, Inc. Recover from defendant Lauchlin McKinnon, damages for conversion in the amount of $6.821.63 Plaintiff, Name Intelligence, Inc. Recover from defendant Jeffrey Ehlert, damages for conversion in the amount of $70,050.00.Plaintiff, Name Intelligence, Inc. Recover from defendants Lauchlin McKinnon and Jeffrey Ehlert jointly and severally damages for Breach of Fiduciary Duty in the amount of $27,775.00 and damages for civil contempt in the amount of $64,613.00. Plaintiff, Name Intelligence, Inc. to be awarded costs against defendants Lauchlin McKinnon and Jeffrey Ehlert jointly and severally in the amount of $13,698.47. Defendants Lauchlin McKinnon and Jeffrey Ehlert take nothing from plaintiff, Name Intelligence, Inc. pursuant to their counterclaims. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/20/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
June 3, 2014 |
Filing 272
ORDER ON MANDATE as to #258 and #260 Notice of Appeal. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
May 15, 2014 |
Filing 270
ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #258 and #260 Notices of Appeal. USCA Case Number 13-17355, 13-17356. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, these appeals are voluntarily dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. (EDS)
|
May 12, 2014 |
Filing 269
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #268 Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant Michael Vannozzi with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/12/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
May 9, 2014 |
Filing 268
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice; filed by Defendant Michael Vannozzi, Cross Claimant Michael Vannozzi. (Garin, Joseph)
|
March 20, 2014 |
Filing 267
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 223 Jury Trial held on 8/1/2013, before Judge Robert C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Margaret Griener, 775-329-9980. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website < before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 4/10/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2014. (MG)
|
March 20, 2014 |
Filing 266
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 222 Jury Trial held on 7/31/2013, before Judge Robert C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Margaret Griener, 775-329-9980. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website < before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 4/10/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2014. (MG)
|
March 20, 2014 |
Filing 265
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 221 Jury Trial held on 7/30/2013, before Judge Robert C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Margaret Griener, 775-329-9980. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website < before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 4/10/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2014. (MG)
|
March 20, 2014 |
Filing 264
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 217 Jury Trial held on 7/29/2013, before Judge Robert C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Margaret Griener, 775-329-9980. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website < before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 4/10/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2014. (MG)
|
November 18, 2013 |
Filing 263
ORDER for Time Schedule as to #258 Notice of Appeal filed by Name Intelligence Inc and #260 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael Vannozzi. USCA Case Number 13-17355 and 13-17356. (EDS)
|
November 18, 2013 |
Filing 262
ORDER for Time Schedule as to #258 Notice of Appeal filed by Name Intelligence Inc. USCA Case Number 13-17355. (SLD)
|
November 15, 2013 |
Filing 261
Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for #260 Notice of Appeal. The forms may also be obtained on the Court's website at #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (MAJ)
|
November 15, 2013 |
Filing 260
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #247 Order on Motion,, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,, Order on Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order,,,, Terminate Case, by Defendant Michael Vannozzi. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0978-3034369. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Garin, Joseph)
|
November 14, 2013 |
Filing 259
Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for #258 Notice of Appeal. The forms may also be obtained on the Court's website at #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (MAJ)
|
November 14, 2013 |
Filing 258
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Plaintiff Name Intelligence Inc. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0978-3032397. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Kerr, Preston)
|
November 8, 2013 |
Filing 257
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Plaintiff Name Intelligence Inc . (Kerr, Preston)
|
October 22, 2013 |
Filing 256
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Hearing re Accounting Issues and Contempt Violation Against Jeff Ehlert held on 10/22/2013 before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Eileen Wood; Pla Counsel: P. Sterling Kerr; Def Counsel: Mark Smith, Jeff Ehlert (pro se); Court Reporter: Kathy Eismann; Time of Hearing: 2:33-2:54 PM; Courtroom: 4B. Representations of counsel are heard. Defendant Lauchlin McKinnon is sworn and testifies under direct and cross examination of counsel. Mr. McKinnon is excused. Mr. Ehlert addresses Court. Plaintiff to prepare and submit a proposed Judgment for the Court's consideration. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EW)
|
October 22, 2013 |
Filing 255
MEMORANDUM of cost and disbursements filed by Plaintiff Name Intelligence Inc. (Kerr, Preston)
|
October 22, 2013 |
Filing 254
DECLARATION of Keith Howard in Support of Plaintiff, Name Intelligence, Inc;s. Damage Claim in Relation to Civil Contempt by Plaintiff Name Intelligence Inc. (Kerr, Preston)
|
October 17, 2013 |
Filing 253
MEMORANDUM of Costs and Disbursements filed by Plaintiff Name Intelligence Inc. (Kerr, Preston)
|
October 17, 2013 |
Filing 252
DECLARATION of Hamilton H. Gardiner in Support of Name Intelligence Inc;s Request for Attorney Fees Assocaited with Civil Contempt by Plaintiff Name Intelligence Inc. (Kerr, Preston)
|
October 17, 2013 |
Filing 251
DECLARATION of Hamilton H. Gardiner in Support of Name Intelligence Inc's Request for Cost by Plaintiff Name Intelligence Inc. (Kerr, Preston)
|
October 17, 2013 |
Filing 250
DECLARATION of P. Sterling Kerr in Support of Name Intelligenc, Inc's Memorandum of Costs by Plaintiff Name Intelligence Inc. (Kerr, Preston)
|
October 17, 2013 |
Filing 249
DECLARATION of of Sterling Kerr in Support of Name Intelligence, Inc's Request for Attorney fees associated with civil complaint by Plaintiff Name Intelligence Inc. (Kerr, Preston)
|
October 17, 2013 |
Filing 248
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant Michael Vannozzi and against Plaintiff Name Intelligence Inc. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 10/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
October 17, 2013 |
Filing 247
ORDER Denying #245 Plaintiff's Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order; Granting #228 Defendant's Motion for Entry of Clerk's Judgment; Granting #238 Defendant's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; and Denying #236 Defendant's Motion for Attorney Fees. The Clerk shall enter judgment and close the case. Case terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
October 7, 2013 |
Filing 246
ORDER Granting #238 Defendant's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. James R. Adams and Assly Sayyar for Defendant Jeff Ehlert are withdrawn from the case. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/07/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
October 2, 2013 |
Filing 245
OBJECTIONS re LR IB 3-1 or MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order Granting a Directed Verdict to Defendant Michael Vannozzi by Plaintiff Name Intelligence Inc. Responses due by 10/19/2013. (Kerr, Preston) Modified docket event type. (ASB)
|
September 25, 2013 |
Filing 244
NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph P Garin. (Garin, Joseph)
|
September 16, 2013 |
Filing 243
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 223 Jury Trial held on 8/1/2013, before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Margaret Griener, 775-329-9980. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website < before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 10/7/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2013. (MG)
|
September 16, 2013 |
Filing 242
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 221 Jury Trial held on 7/30/2013, before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Margaret Griener, 775-329-9980. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 10/7/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2013. (MG) Modified on 2/27/2014 notified by Court Reporter that transcript is a rough draft and should not have been filed. (BLG).
|
September 16, 2013 |
Filing 241
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 222 Jury Trial held on 7/31/2013, before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Margaret Griener, 775-329-9980. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 10/7/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2013. (MG) Modified on 2/27/2014 notified by Court Reporter that transcript is a rough draft and should not have been filed. (BLG).
|
September 9, 2013 |
Filing 240
REPLY to Response to #236 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Defendant Michael Vannozzi. (Garin, Joseph)
|
September 6, 2013 |
Filing 239
DECLARATION of James R. Adams, Esq. re #238 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney with proposed order to withdraw by James R. Adams and Assly Sayyar ; by Defendant Jeff Ehlert, Counter Claimant Jeff Ehlert, Cross Defendant Jeff Ehlert. (Sayyar, Assly)
|
September 6, 2013 |
Filing 238
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney with proposed order to withdraw by James R. Adams and Assly Sayyar by Defendant Jeff Ehlert, Counter Claimant Jeff Ehlert, Cross Defendant Jeff Ehlert. Motion ripe 9/6/2013. (Sayyar, Assly)
|
August 30, 2013 |
Filing 237
RESPONSE to #236 MOTION for Attorney Fees , filed by Plaintiff Name Intelligence Inc. Replies due by 9/9/2013. (Kerr, Preston)
|
August 15, 2013 |
Filing 236
MOTION for Attorney Fees by Defendant Michael Vannozzi, Cross Claimant Michael Vannozzi. Responses due by 9/1/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Offer of Jgmt, #3 Exhibit C - Rqst for Adm, #4 Exhibit D - Rsp to RFA, #5 Exhibit E - Westerdal Depo Transcr)(Garin, Joseph)
|
August 7, 2013 |
Filing 235
EXHIBIT LIST by Plaintiff Name Intelligence Inc.(AC)
|
August 7, 2013 |
Filing 234
EXHIBIT LIST by Defendants Michael Vannozzi, Lauchlin McKinnon, and Jeff Ehlert. (AC)
|
August 7, 2013 |
Filing 233
REDACTED JURY NOTES. (AC)
|
August 7, 2013 |
Filing 231
JURY VERDICT.(AC)
|
August 7, 2013 |
Filing 229
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Jury Trial (DAY 7) held on 8/7/2013 before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Lesa Ettinger; Pla Counsel: Sterling Preston Kerr; Def Counsel: Assly Sayyar, James Adams, Mark Smith; Court Reporter/FTR #: Margaret Griener; Time of Hearing: 11:50 a.m. - 12:06 p.m.; Courtroom: 4B; The verdict is read in open court (see verdict form for specifics). The jury is polled and the Court finds the verdict is unanimous. The Court thanks and excuses the jury from further jury service. Mr. Kerr to prepare and file a proposed form of judgment no later than 10/22/2013. IT IS ORDERED that a hearing regarding the accounting issues and the civil contempt matter is set for Tuesday, 10/22/2013 02:30 PM in LV Courtroom 4B before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. ( Deadline to return exhibits set for 8/7/2014.)(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
August 7, 2013 |
Filing 228
MOTION Entry of Clerk's Judgment by Defendant Michael Vannozzi. Responses due by 8/24/2013. (Garin, Joseph)
|
August 6, 2013 |
Filing 227
ORDER re: Jury Meals. This Court having ordered the jury impaneled in this action to be kept together during period of deliberation, IT IS ORDERED that all meals for said jury shall be paid by the Clerk of Court. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 08/06/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
August 6, 2013 |
Filing 226
JURY INSTRUCTIONS. (AC)
|
August 6, 2013 |
Filing 225
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Jury Trial (DAY 6) held on 8/6/2013 before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Lesa Ettinger; Pla Counsel: Sterling Preston Kerr, Hamilton Gardiner; Def Counsel: Assly Sayyar, James Adams, Mark Smith; Court Reporter/FTR #: Margaet Griener; Time of Hearing: 8:51 a.m. - 4:38 p.m.; Courtroom: 4B;Closing arguments are presented to the jury. Court instructs jury on the order of deliberations. The bailiff is sworn to take charge of the jury. Jury retires to begin deliberations. At 4:38 p.m. the jury recesses for the evening. IT IS ORDERED that deliberations will resume on Wednesday, 8/07/2013 at 9:00 a.m. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
August 5, 2013 |
Filing 224
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Jury Trial (DAY 5) held on 8/5/2013 before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Lesa Ettinger; Pla Counsel: Sterling Preston Kerr, Hamilton Gardiner; Def Counsel: Assly Sayyar, James Adams, Mark Smith; Court Reporter/FTR #: Margaret Griener; Time of Hearing: 9:08 a.m. - 4:10 p.m.; Courtroom: 4B;Court advises the parties that juror number one called in sick. The parties stipulate to continue the trial with a seven member jury. The Court then releases juror number one from further jury service. Defendants' witness: Lauchlin McKinnon. Plaintiffs' exhibit numbers: 5, 6, and 11 are admitted into evidence. Defendants rest their case-in-chief. Plaintiffs' oral motion for a directed verdict is granted in part and denied in part as stated on the record. Court and counsel settle jury instructions. The Court instructs the jury on the law as contained in the jury instructions. IT IS ORDERED jury trial shall continue on Tuesday, August 6, 2013 at 8:45 a.m. Courtroom 4B before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
August 1, 2013 |
Filing 223
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Jury Trial (DAY 4) held on 8/1/2013 before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Lesa Ettinger; Pla Counsel: Sterling Preston Kerr, Hamilton Gardiner; Def Counsel: Assly Sayyar, James Adams, Mark Smith, Joseph Garin, Stephen Keim; Court Reporter/FTR #: Margaret Griener; Time of Hearing: 9:21 a.m. - 4:48 p.m.; Courtroom: 4B; Plaintiffs' rest their case-in-chief. Defendants' oral Rule 50(a) motion is granted in part and denied in part. Granted as to Michael A. Vannozzi. Denied as to Lauchlin McKinnon and Jeff Ehlert. Defendants' witnesses: Michael A. Vannozzi, Jay Westerdal, Lauchlin McKinnon. Plaintiffs exhibit numbers: 18-61, 151 and 152 are admitted into evidence. Defendants' exhibit numbers: 584, 586, 587, 588, 590, 595, 600, 604, 606, 607, 608, 609, 610, 611, 612 and 613 are admitted into evidence. **Plaintiffs' exhibit number 40 was admitted into evidence on 7/31/2013.IT IS ORDERED that jury trial shall continue on Monday, 8/5/2013 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 4B before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
July 31, 2013 |
Filing 222
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Jury Trial (DAY 3)held on 7/31/2013 before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Lesa Ettinger; Pla Counsel: Sterling Preston Kerr, Hamilton Gardiner; Def Counsel: Assly Sayyar, James Adams, Mark Smith, Joseph Garin, Stephen Keim; Court Reporter/FTR #: Margaret Griener; Time of Hearing: 9:06 a.m. - 5:11 p.m.; Courtroom: 4B; Plaintiffs' witnesses: Jay Westerdal, Lauchlin McKinnon, Jeff Ehlert. Plaintiffs' exhibit numbers 2, 36, 37, 38, 39, 42, 43, 45, 46, 47, 49, 51, 52, 55, 56, 57, 59, 62, 63, 64, 68, 70-1049 thru 70-1089, 71, 72, 73-1113, 73-1114, 73-1115, 74, 75, 76, 77, 78, 79, 80, 81, 82, 83, 84, 85, 86, 87, 90, 100, 121, 146, 147, 148, 149 and Defendants' exhibit numbers 566, 567, 568, 569, 570, 571, 572, 573, 574, 575, 576 and 577 are admitted into evidence. IT IS ORDERED jury trial shall continue on Thursday, August 1, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. in LV Courtroom 4B before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
July 31, 2013 |
Filing 220
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, held on 7/30/2013, before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Margaret Griener, 775-329-9980. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website < before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 8/21/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/31/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/29/2013. (MG)
|
July 30, 2013 |
Filing 221
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Jury Trial DAY 2 held on 7/30/2013 before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Lesa Ettinger; Pla Counsel: Sterling P. Kerr, Hamilton Gardiner; Def Counsel: Assly Sayyar, James Adams, Mark Smith, Joseph Garin, Stephen Keim; Court Reporter/FTR #: Margaret Griener; Time of Hearing: 9:20 a.m. - 4:47 p.m.; Courtroom: 4B; Plaintiffs' witness: Jay Westerdal. Plaintiffs' exhibit numbers 17, 18-57, 18-58, 18-59, 18-60, 23-129, 23-130, 24-181, 24-182, 24-183, 25-239, 25-240, 26-337, 26-338, 26-339, 27-355, 27-356, 27-357, 27-358, 27-359, 27-360, 27-361, 27-362, 27-363, 27-364, 27-365, 27-369, 27-370, 27-371, 27-372, 27-373,28-437, 28-439, 29-470, 29-471, 29-472, 30-571, 30-572, 31-634, 31-635, 32-709, 32-710, 33-775, 34-853, 34-854, 34-856, 34-857, 35-889, 35-890, 89, 142, 143, and Defendants' exhibit numbers 554-008, 554-15, 554-16, 554-22, 554-23, 554-30, 554-31, 554-37, 554-38, 554-44, 554-45, 554-53, 554-54, 554-60, 554-61, 554-63, 554-64, 554-70, 554-71, 554-77, 554-78, 554-84, 554-85, 554-95, 554-96 and 591 are admitted into evidence. Plaintiffs' exhibit number 144 is admitted into evidence as a summary exhibit. IT IS ORDERED Jury Trial shall continue on Wednesday, July 31, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. in LV Courtroom 4B before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
July 30, 2013 |
Filing 218
ORDER that the jurors in the above-entitled action shall be compensated the daily jury attendance fee until such time as a verdict is reached and they are released from jury duty, excluding Saturday and Sunday. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/30/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
July 29, 2013 |
Filing 217
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Jury Trial (DAY 1) held on 7/29/2013 before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Lesa Ettinger; Pla Counsel: Preston Sterling Kerr, Hamilton Gardiner; Def Counsel: Assly Sayyar, James Adams, Mark Smith, Joseph Garin, Stephen Keim; Court Reporter/FTR #: Margaret Griener; Time of Hearing: 8:37 a.m. - 4:45 p.m.; Courtroom: 4B; The Court inquires of counsel whether there are any preliminary matters which need to be addressed. The Court calls for the prospective jurors. Thirty-five prospective jurors enter the courtroom, and are sworn by the clerk. Fourteen prospective jurors are then seated and voir dire begins. The final jury of eight members is seated and sworn by the clerk. The remaining jurors are thanked and dismissed by the Court. Preliminary instructions are given to the jury by the Court. Opening statements are presented. Plaintiffs' witness: Jay Westerdal. Upon stipulation of the parties, Plaintiffs' exhibit numbers 3, 8, 12, 13, 14, 15 and 16 are admitted into evidence. Plaintiffs' exhibit numbers 4-23 and 7 are marked, offered and admitted into evidence.IT IS ORDERED Jury Trial shall continue on Tuesday, July 30, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. in LV Courtroom 4B before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
July 28, 2013 |
Filing 216
ORDER IN THE CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on July 28, 2013, by Carrie Lipparelli, Judicial Assistant.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motions in Limine (ECF Nos. 173, 174, 175) are DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion in Limine (ECF No. 176) is GRANTED IN PART.IT IS SO ORDERED.Signed Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL)
|
July 26, 2013 |
Filing 215
EXHIBIT LIST Amended by Defendant Michael Vannozzi.(Garin, Joseph)
|
July 25, 2013 |
Filing 214
STIPULATION of Dismissal filed by Defendant Charles J. Lybarger. (AC)
|
July 25, 2013 |
Filing 213
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr, on 7/25/2013. By Deputy Clerk: Julia Wright. RE: 211 Minute Order Setting Hearing. A Stipulation and Order of Dismissal as to Charles Lybarger was received by chambers. Accordingly, the status hearing set for July 26, 2013 is vacated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JBW)
|
July 23, 2013 |
Filing 211
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr, on 7/23/2013. By Judicial Assistant: Julia Wright. RE: #170 Settlement Conference : A Telephonic Status Conference is set for Friday, July 26, 2013, at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. The parties are instructed to call telephone number: (702) 868-4910, access code 123456, five (5) minutes prior to the hearing time. Please remain on the line until such time as the Court joins the call and convenes the proceedings. The use of a cell phone or speaker phone during the call is prohibited. The call must be made using a land line. If a stipulation of dismissal as to Defendant Charles Lybarger is filed prior to the hearing, the hearing will be vacated.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JBW)
|
July 22, 2013 |
Filing 212
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - TELEPHONIC Calendar Call held on 7/22/2013 before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Lesa Ettinger; Pla Counsel: Preston Kerr; Def Counsel: Joseph Garin, Assly Sayyar, Stephen Keim, Mark Smith; Court Reporter/FTR #: Margaret Griener; Time of Hearing: 8:41 - 9:02 a.m.Upon inquiry by the Court, the parties represent they are ready to proceed to trial as scheduled. Jury Trial set for 7/29/2013 08:30 AM in LV Courtroom 4B before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Discussion is then held with respect to the Court's #209 Order. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
July 22, 2013 |
Filing 210
OBJECTION to #180 Proposed Jury Instructions ; filed by Defendant Michael Vannozzi. (Garin, Joseph)
|
July 22, 2013 |
Filing 209
ORDER re #204 Order Notifying Counsel of Which Claims the Court intends to try and which claims it intends to resolve in equity, as necessary, after the trial. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/22/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
July 22, 2013 |
Filing 208
REPLY to Response to #173 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff From Arguing it Received a Security as Defined by Washington Law filed by Defendant Michael Vannozzi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Garin, Joseph)
|
July 22, 2013 |
Filing 207
REPLY to Response to #174 MOTION in Limine to Preclude ARguments and/or Testimony that Defendant Michael Vannozzi's Actions Constituted Negligence filed by Defendant Michael Vannozzi. (Garin, Joseph)
|
July 20, 2013 |
Filing 206
REPLY to Response to #176 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Undisclosed and/or Untimely Disclosed Witnesses filed by Defendant Michael Vannozzi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Garin, Joseph)
|
July 20, 2013 |
Filing 205
REPLY to Response to #175 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence of Undisclosed Damages filed by Defendant Michael Vannozzi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Garin, Joseph)
|
July 19, 2013 |
Filing 204
ORDER notifying counsel of which claims the Court intends to try and which claims it intends to resolve in equity, as necessary, after trial. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
July 15, 2013 |
Filing 203
PROPOSED Verdict Form by Defendant Michael Vannozzi .(Garin, Joseph)
|
July 15, 2013 |
Filing 202
STATEMENT of the claim by Plaintiff Name Intelligence Inc. (Kerr, Preston)
|
July 15, 2013 |
Filing 201
PROPOSED Jury Instructions by Defendant Lauchlin McKinnon, Counter Claimant Lauchlin McKinnon Joint Proposed Instructions.(Smith, Mark)
|
July 15, 2013 |
Filing 200
RESPONSE to #174 MOTION in Limine to Preclude ARguments and/or Testimony that Defendant Michael Vannozzi's Actions Constituted Negligence, filed by Plaintiff Name Intelligence Inc. (Kerr, Preston)
|
July 15, 2013 |
Filing 199
WITNESS LIST by Defendant Lauchlin McKinnon, Counter Claimant Lauchlin McKinnon.(Smith, Mark)
|
July 15, 2013 |
Filing 198
EXHIBIT LIST by Defendant Lauchlin McKinnon, Counter Claimant Lauchlin McKinnon.(Smith, Mark)
|
July 15, 2013 |
Filing 197
RESPONSE to #176 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Undisclosed and/or Untimely Disclosed Witnesses, filed by Plaintiff Name Intelligence Inc. (Kerr, Preston)
|
July 15, 2013 |
Filing 196
DECLARATION of Hamilton H. Gardiner in Support of #195 OBJECTION to #173 Motion in Limine by Plaintiff Name Intelligence Inc. (Kerr, Preston)
|
July 15, 2013 |
Filing 195
RESPONSE to #173 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff From Arguing it Received a Security as Defined by Washington Law, filed by Plaintiff Name Intelligence Inc. (Kerr, Preston)
|
July 15, 2013 |
Filing 194
RESPONSE to #175 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence of Undisclosed Damages, filed by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. (Kerr, Preston)
|
July 15, 2013 |
Filing 193
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Preston S Kerr on behalf of Plaintiff Name Intelligence Inc. (Kerr, Preston)
|
July 15, 2013 |
Filing 192
STATEMENT of Defendant/Cross-Claimant Michael Vannozzi's Case Statement by Defendant Michael Vannozzi. (Garin, Joseph)
|
July 15, 2013 |
Filing 191
WITNESS LIST by Defendant Michael Vannozzi.(Garin, Joseph)
|
July 15, 2013 |
Filing 190
PROPOSED Jury Instructions by Defendant Michael Vannozzi .(Garin, Joseph)
|
July 15, 2013 |
Filing 189
EXHIBIT LIST by Defendant Michael Vannozzi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Defendant Vannozzi's Exhibit List)(Garin, Joseph)
|
July 15, 2013 |
Filing 188
STATEMENT of the Case as proposed by Defendant Lauchlin McKinnon and by Defendant Jeff Ehlert, Counter Claimant Jeff Ehlert, Cross Defendant Jeff Ehlert. (Sayyar, Assly)
|
July 15, 2013 |
Filing 187
EXHIBIT LIST by Defendant Jeff Ehlert, Counter Claimant Jeff Ehlert, Cross Defendant Jeff Ehlert.(Sayyar, Assly)
|
July 15, 2013 |
Filing 186
WITNESS LIST by Defendant Jeff Ehlert, Counter Claimant Jeff Ehlert, Cross Defendant Jeff Ehlert.(Sayyar, Assly)
|
July 15, 2013 |
Filing 185
PROPOSED Jury Instructions by Defendant Jeff Ehlert, Counter Claimant Jeff Ehlert, Cross Defendant Jeff Ehlert and by Defendant Lauchlin McKinnon of Special Instructions Only.(Sayyar, Assly)
|
July 15, 2013 |
Filing 184
PROPOSED Voir Dire by Defendant Jeff Ehlert, Counter Claimant Jeff Ehlert, Cross Defendant Jeff Ehlert and by Defendant Lauchlin McKinnon and Michael Vannozzi.(Sayyar, Assly)
|
July 15, 2013 |
Filing 183
EXHIBIT LIST by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal.(Kerr, Preston)
|
July 15, 2013 |
Filing 182
WITNESS LIST by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal.(Kerr, Preston)
|
July 15, 2013 |
Filing 181
PROPOSED Voir Dire by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal .(Kerr, Preston)
|
July 15, 2013 |
Filing 180
PROPOSED Jury Instructions by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal .(Kerr, Preston)
|
July 8, 2013 |
Filing 179
AMENDED ORDER REGARDING TRIAL. Jury Trial set for 7/29/2013 08:30 AM in LV Courtroom 4B before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Telephonic Calendar Call set for 7/22/2013 08:30 AM in Reno Courtroom 6 before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Exhibit List due by 7/15/2013. Proposed Voir Dire due by 7/15/2013. Proposed Jury Instructions due by 7/15/2013. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/8/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
July 2, 2013 |
Filing 178
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on 7/2/2013. By Deputy Clerk: Lesa Ettinger. IT IS ORDERED that Calendar Call currently set for Friday, 7/12/2013 08:30 AM (Pacific Time) in Las Vegas Courtroom 4B is hereby VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a TELEPHONIC Calendar Call is set for MONDAY, 7/22/2013 08:30 AM (Pacific Time) before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. The following instructions are given in that regard: Counsel shall dial into the AT&T meet-me-line number (1-888-675-2535, Access Code 2900398, Security Code 072213) five (5) minutes prior to the hearing. Please remain on the line until such time as the Court joins the call and convenes the proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
June 30, 2013 |
Filing 177
JOINDER to #176 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Undisclosed and/or Untimely Disclosed Witnesses; filed by Defendant Lauchlin McKinnon, Counter Claimant Lauchlin McKinnon. (Smith, Mark)
|
June 28, 2013 |
Filing 176
MOTION in Limine to Preclude Undisclosed and/or Untimely Disclosed Witnesses by Defendant Michael Vannozzi. Responses due by 7/15/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Garin, Joseph)
|
June 28, 2013 |
Filing 175
MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence of Undisclosed Damages by Defendant Michael Vannozzi. Responses due by 7/15/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Garin, Joseph)
|
June 28, 2013 |
Filing 174
MOTION in Limine to Preclude ARguments and/or Testimony that Defendant Michael Vannozzi's Actions Constituted Negligence by Defendant Michael Vannozzi. Responses due by 7/15/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Garin, Joseph)
|
June 28, 2013 |
Filing 173
MOTION in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff From Arguing it Received a Security as Defined by Washington Law by Defendant Michael Vannozzi. Responses due by 7/15/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Garin, Joseph)
|
June 26, 2013 |
Filing 172
ORDER REGARDING TRIAL. Jury Trial set for 7/29/2013 08:30 AM in LV Courtroom 4B before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Calendar Call set for 7/12/2013 08:30 AM in LV Courtroom 4B before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Exhibit List due by 7/9/2013. Witness List due by 7/09/2013. Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law due by 7/9/2013. Proposed Voir Dire due by 7/9/2013. Proposed Jury Instructions due by 7/9/2013. Trial Briefs due by 7/9/2013. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 06/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
June 19, 2013 |
Filing 171
NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Defendant Charles J. Lybarger. Address updated to: 10300 W. Charleston Blvd., Suite 13-121, 89135. (AC)
|
June 6, 2013 |
Filing 170
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Settlement Conference held on 6/6/2013 before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Judicial Assistant: Julia Wright; Pla Counsel: Sterling Kerr; Def Counsel: Mark Smith; Joe Garin; James Adams; Charles Lybarger; Time of Hearing: 9:00 a.m. The court heard presentations of counsel and from each of the parties present. A settlement was reached as to Defendant Charles Lybarger, only. See attached minutes. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for Friday, July 5, 2013, at 4:00 PM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. If dismissal papers have been lodged with the court, the hearing will automatically be vacated. If a status hearing is required, counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the conference call. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JBW)
|
May 29, 2013 |
Filing 169
ORDER Denying #168 Defendant's Motion for Exception to Personal Attendance at Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 05/29/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
May 21, 2013 |
Filing 168
MOTION Request for Exception to Personal Attendance at Settlement Conference re #155 Order Scheduling Settlement Conference, by Defendant Michael Vannozzi. Responses due by 6/7/2013. (Garin, Joseph)
|
April 26, 2013 |
Filing 167
ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part #156 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; Denying #157 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; and Denying #162 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time. The Clerk shall TERMINATE Jay Westerdal as a Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 04/25/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
April 8, 2013 |
Filing 166
ORDER Granting #165 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Mark R. Smith for Lauchlin McKinnon substituted in place and stead of Attorney Brian R Dziminski. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 04/08/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
April 5, 2013 |
Filing 165
MOTION to Substitute Attorney on behalf of Defendant Lauchlin McKinnon, Counter Claimant Lauchlin McKinnon. (Smith, Mark) Modified event on 4/5/2013. (MAJ)
|
March 11, 2013 |
Filing 164
REPLY to Response to #156 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Jeff Ehlert, Counter Claimant Jeff Ehlert, Cross Defendant Jeff Ehlert. (Sayyar, Assly)
|
March 8, 2013 |
Filing 163
RESPONSE to #162 MOTION to Extend Time regarding dispositive matter (First Request) re #157 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendant Michael Vannozzi, Cross Claimant Michael Vannozzi. Replies due by 3/18/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Garin, Joseph)
|
February 27, 2013 |
Filing 162
MOTION to Extend Time regarding dispositive matter (First Request) re #157 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. Motion ripe 2/27/2013. (Kerr, Preston)
|
February 26, 2013 |
Filing 161
NOTICE of Non-Opposition re: [157 Motion for Summary Judgment; filed by Michael Vannozzi. (Garin, Joseph)
|
February 25, 2013 |
Filing 160
ERRATA to #159 RESPONSE to Motion to Determine Choice of Law and for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. (Kerr, Preston)
|
February 22, 2013 |
Filing 159
RESPONSE to #156 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. Replies due by 3/11/2013. (Kerr, Preston)
|
February 1, 2013 |
Filing 158
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #157 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Opposition due twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due fourteen (14) days after the filing of the opposition. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RFJ)
|
January 31, 2013 |
Filing 157
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Michael Vannozzi, Cross Claimant Michael Vannozzi. Responses due by 2/24/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Garin, Joseph)
|
January 31, 2013 |
Filing 156
MOTION to Determine and Establish Choice of Law and for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant Jeff Ehlert, Counter Claimant Jeff Ehlert, Cross Defendant Jeff Ehlert. Responses due by 2/17/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Sayyar, Assly)
|
January 11, 2013 |
Filing 155
ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference: Settlement Conference set for 6/5/2013 09:00 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 01/11/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
January 11, 2013 |
Filing 154
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on 1/11/2013. By Deputy Clerk: Lesa Ettinger.This case is currently stacked on the calendar on Monday, July 29, 2013, for a Jury Trial.IT IS ORDERED that this case is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. for a settlement conference. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
January 10, 2013 |
Filing 153
PRETRIAL ORDER Granting #150 Proposed Pretrial Order: Jury Trial set for 7/29/2013 08:30 AM in LV Courtroom 4B before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Calendar Call set for 7/12/2013 08:30 AM in LV Courtroom 4B before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Proposed Jury Instructions due by 7/9/2013. Proposed Voir Dire due by 7/9/2013. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 01/10/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
January 10, 2013 |
Filing 152
ORDER Granting #151 Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Attorney. The Law Offices of P. Sterling Kerr is substituted in place and stead of Holmquist & Gardiner PLLC for Plaintiff Name Intelligence, Inc. Attorney Hamilton H Gardiner terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 01/10/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
January 9, 2013 |
Filing 151
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. Motion ripe 1/9/2013. (Kerr, Preston)
|
November 15, 2012 |
Filing 150
PROPOSED Pretrial Order by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kerr, Preston)
|
November 5, 2012 |
Filing 149
ORDER that parties shall file a Proposed Joint Pretrial Order by 11/15/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/5/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
October 2, 2012 |
Filing 148
ORDER Granting #121 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #138 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs is Denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #142 Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default is Granted. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/2/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
September 12, 2012 |
Filing 147
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on 9/12/2012. IT IS ORDERED that the oral argument set for 9/17/2012 RE: #138 MOTION for Attorney Fees and costs, #142 MOTION to Set Aside #141 Clerk's Entry of Default, and #121 MOTION for Summary Judgment is VACATED. The court will issue a written order on the pleadings. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
August 31, 2012 |
Filing 146
REPLY to Response to #138 MOTION for Attorney Fees and costs filed by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. (Kerr, Preston)
|
August 23, 2012 |
Filing 145
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on August 23, 2012, by Carrie Lipparelli, Judicial Assistant.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that ORAL ARGUMENT is set as follows:MONDAY, SEPTEMBER 17, 2012 @ 10:00AM[ECF #121] Motion for Summary Judgment;[ECF #138] Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs; and[ECF #142] Motion to Set Aside #141 Clerks Entry of DefaultNOTICE OF HEARING LOCATION: Parties may appear at either location.VIDEO CONFERENCE LAS VEGAS: Lloyd D. George U.S. Courthouse, United States District Court District of Nevada, 333 Las Vegas Blvd. South, Las Vegas, Nevada 89101, COURTROOM LOCATION TO BE DETERMINED AND NOTICED AT PUBLIC ELEVATORS ON HEARING DATE.IN PERSON RENO: COURTROOM 6, Bruce R. Thompson Federal building & U.S. Courthouse, United States District Court District of Nevada, 400 South Virginia Street, Reno, Nevada 89501.IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed Chief Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL)
|
August 14, 2012 |
Filing 144
ORDER Granting #137 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Naomi Arin withdrawn from the case as to Charles Lybarger. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall add the last known address of Charles Lybarger to the docket as listed in this order, and serve with a copy of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/14/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
August 11, 2012 |
Filing 143
RESPONSE to #138 MOTION for Attorney Fees and costs, filed by Defendant Charles J. Lybarger. Replies due by 8/21/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lybarger, Charles)
|
August 11, 2012 |
Filing 142
MOTION to Set Aside #141 Clerk's Entry of Default by Defendant Charles J. Lybarger. Responses due by 8/28/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Charles Lybarger)(Lybarger, Charles)
|
August 2, 2012 |
Filing 141
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Charles J. Lybarger re #139 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default against Defendant Charles Lybarger. (EDS)
|
August 1, 2012 |
Filing 140
ANSWER to #93 Amended Complaint filed by Charles J. Lybarger.(Lybarger, Charles)
|
August 1, 2012 |
Filing 139
MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default against Defendant Charles Lybarger by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. Motion ripe 8/1/2012. (Kerr, Preston)
|
July 26, 2012 |
Filing 138
MOTION for Attorney Fees and costs by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. Responses due by 8/12/2012. (Kerr, Preston)
|
July 26, 2012 |
Filing 137
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Charles Lybarger by Naomi R. Arin. by Defendant Charles J. Lybarger. Motion ripe 7/26/2012. (Arin, Naomi)
|
July 9, 2012 |
Filing 136
ORDER Denying #109 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/9/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
June 22, 2012 |
Filing 134
REPLY to Response to #121 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. (Kerr, Preston)
|
June 21, 2012 |
Filing 135
*AMENDED* - MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing RE: #109 First MOTION to Dismiss pusuant to 12(b)(6) held on 6/21/2012 before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Lesa Ettinger; Pla Counsel: Brandon McDonald appearing in Las Vegas; Def Counsel: Noted on the record; Court Reporter/FTR #: Margaret Griener; Time of Hearing: 12:10 - 12:13 p.m.;Reno Courtroom: 6 and through video conference in Las Vegas Courtroom 4B;The Court takes this matter under submission. Written ruling of the Court will issue. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE) Modified on 6/29/2012 to reflect Mr. McDonald appearance (LE).
|
June 12, 2012 |
Filing 133
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 6/12/2012 before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: Heidi Jordan; Pla Counsel: Preston Kerr; Def Counsel: Brian Dziminski; Stephen Keim; Court Reporter/FTR #: <<0:30:15-11:04:43; Courtroom: 3A; The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears arguments of counsel regarding Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses and for the Imposition of Monetary Sanctions #120 .ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses #120 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows:ORDERED that Defendant's Request No. 1 regarding cell phone records is GRANTED. If Plaintiffs have not preserved the cell phone records, they shall obtain a copy of the records from the service provider(s), redact unrelated telephone numbers or call records, and produce the same to Defendant.FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Request No. 9 regarding tax returns and other financial information is GRANTED to the extent that Plaintiffs will produce financial information which relates to the properties that are the subject matter of this lawsuit. If there is information in the Name Intelligence, Inc.'s federal tax return for 2011 or 2010 that relates to income or payments it has received from the subject properties, or from other relevant entities or persons, that information shall be produced.FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Request No. 10 and 11 regarding Plaintiff's current financial status and net worth as it relates to the punitive damages claim is GRANTED subject to the Court's ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment #121 .FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Request No. 11 and 12 regarding requested discovery of Plaintiffs' expert who is no longer a testifying expert is DENIED subject to the condition that Mr. Westerdal will not be testifying at trial, or offering witness testimony, on reliance of those consulting expert's calculations. The Court recommends that the parties discuss with each other their plan in terms of what happens at trial on this issue, and, if need be, file a motion in limine.FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's request for the imposition of monetary sanctions is DENIED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
|
June 7, 2012 |
Filing 132
RESPONSE to #121 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendant Jeff Ehlert, Counter Claimant Jeff Ehlert, Cross Defendant Jeff Ehlert. Limited Opposition Only Replies due by 6/24/2012. (Sayyar, Assly)
|
June 6, 2012 |
Filing 131
RESPONSE to #121 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendant Lauchlin McKinnon, Counter Claimant Lauchlin McKinnon. Replies due by 6/23/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C)(Dziminski, Brian)
|
June 4, 2012 |
Filing 130
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on 6/4/2012. This case is reassigned back to Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:10-CV-1202 RCJ-GWF. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
June 4, 2012 |
Filing 129
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du, on 6/4/2012. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du recuses herself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KER)
|
June 1, 2012 |
Filing 128
REPLY to Response to #120 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and for the Imposition of Monetary Sanctions ; filed by Defendant Lauchlin McKinnon, Counter Claimant Lauchlin McKinnon. (Dziminski, Brian)
|
June 1, 2012 |
Filing 127
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on 6/1/2012. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Judge Miranda M. Du for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Robert C. Jones no longer assigned to case. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:10-cv-01202-MMD-GWF. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
May 31, 2012 |
Filing 126
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #125 Stipulation to Continue Hearing on #120 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and for the Imposition of Monetary Sanctions. Motion Hearing reset for 6/12/2012 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 05/31/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
May 30, 2012 |
Filing 125
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #120 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and for the Imposition of Monetary Sanctions ; by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. (Kerr, Preston)
|
May 29, 2012 |
Filing 124
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr, on 5/29/2012. By Judicial Assistant: Julia Wright. RE: #120 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and for the Imposition of Monetary Sanctions : Motion Hearing set for Friday, June 8, 2012, at 9:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JBW)
|
May 24, 2012 |
Filing 123
RESPONSE to #120 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and for the Imposition of Monetary Sanctions, filed by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. Replies due by 6/3/2012. (Kerr, Preston)
|
May 15, 2012 |
Filing 122
NOTE: Attorney address and firm information listed on motion for summary judgment does not match CM/ECF account information. Pursuant to Local Rules (LSR 2-2), and Special Order 109, it is the responsibility of all attorneys to maintain and update their information in the case file and the CM/ECF system. It is therefore recommended that Brandon McDonald review and update his CM/ECF account information. (no image attached)(ASB)
|
May 14, 2012 |
Filing 121
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. Responses due by 6/7/2012. (Kerr, Preston)
|
May 7, 2012 |
Filing 120
MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and for the Imposition of Monetary Sanctions by Defendant Lauchlin McKinnon, Counter Claimant Lauchlin McKinnon. Responses due by 5/24/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D)(Dziminski, Brian)
|
May 4, 2012 |
Filing 119
ORDER Granting #113 Defendant Vannozzi's Motion to Continue the Dispositive Motion Deadline. The dispositive motion deadlines will be 30 days after the decision on #109 Lybarger's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/4/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
May 3, 2012 |
Filing 118
REPLY to Response to #113 Second MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request); filed by Defendant Lauchlin McKinnon, Counter Claimant Lauchlin McKinnon. (Dziminski, Brian)
|
May 2, 2012 |
Filing 117
RESPONSE to #113 Second MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) filed by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. Replies due by 5/12/2012. (Kerr, Preston)
|
April 26, 2012 |
Filing 116
JOINDER to #113 Second MOTION to Extend Time regarding dispositive matter (Second Request) Defendant/Cross-Claimant Michael Vannozzi's Emergency Motion to Continue the Dispositive Motion Deadline ; filed by Cross Defendants Jeff Ehlert, Jeff Ehlert, Defendant Jeff Ehlert, Counter Claimant Jeff Ehlert. (Sayyar, Assly) .
|
April 26, 2012 |
Filing 115
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr, on 4/26/2012. By Deputy Clerk: Heidi Ojeda. RE: #113 Second MOTION to Extend Time regarding dispositive matter (Second Request) Defendant/Cross-Claimant Michael Vannozzi's Emergency Motion to Continue the Dispositive Motion Deadline. Any objections to Defendant's Motion (#113) shall be filed no later than Wednesday, May 2, 2012. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Ojeda, Heidi)
|
April 26, 2012 |
Filing 114
JOINDER to #113 Second MOTION to Extend Time regarding dispositive matter (Second Request) Defendant/Cross-Claimant Michael Vannozzi's Emergency Motion to Continue the Dispositive Motion Deadline ; filed by Defendant Lauchlin McKinnon, Counter Claimant Lauchlin McKinnon. (Dziminski, Brian) .
|
April 25, 2012 |
Filing 113
Second MOTION to Extend Time regarding dispositive matter (Second Request) Defendant/Cross-Claimant Michael Vannozzi's Emergency Motion to Continue the Dispositive Motion Deadline by Defendant Michael Vannozzi. Motion ripe 4/25/2012. (Garin, Joseph)
|
April 20, 2012 |
Filing 112
REPLY to Response to #109 First MOTION to Dismiss pusuant to 12(b)(6) ; filed by Defendant Charles J. Lybarger. (Arin, Naomi)
|
April 13, 2012 |
Filing 111
RESPONSE to #109 First MOTION to Dismiss pusuant to 12(b)(6) ; filed by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. (Kerr, Preston) Modified text on 5/2/2012 (SRK).
|
April 2, 2012 |
Filing 110
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on April 2, 2012, by Carrie Lipparelli, Judicial Assistant. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that ORAL ARGUMENT RE: is set as follows:THURSDAY, JUNE 21, 2012 @ 1:30PM #109 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Charles J. Lybarger NOTICE OF HEARING LOCATION:Parties may appear at either location.Video Conference Las Vegas: Lloyd D. George U.S. Courthouse, United States District Court District of Nevada, 333 Las Vegas Blvd. South, Las Vegas, Nevada 89101, COURTROOM LOCATION TO BE DETERMINED AND NOTICED AT PUBLIC ELEVATORS.In Person Reno:COURTROOM 6, Bruce R. Thompson Federal Building & U.S. Courthouse, United States District Court District of Nevada, 400 South Virginia Street, Reno, Nevada 89501.IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed Chief Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL)
|
March 30, 2012 |
Filing 109
First MOTION to Dismiss pusuant to 12(b)(6) by Defendant Charles J. Lybarger. Responses due by 4/16/2012. (Arin, Naomi)
|
March 29, 2012 |
Filing 108
ORDER Granting #95 Defendant McKinnon's Emergency Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Name Intelligence, Inc. and Jay Westerdal's Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosure Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/29/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
March 28, 2012 |
Filing 107
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 3/28/2012 before Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: Heidi Jordan; Pla Counsel: Brandon McDonald; Def Counsel: Brian Dziminski; Assly Sayyar; Stephen Keim; Court Reporter/FTR #: 9:23-9:46; Courtroom: 3A; The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears arguments of counsel with respect to the Emergency Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosure Statement #95 . The Court advises of its intention to grant the Motion #95 and briefly summarizes its reasoning for granting said motion. A written Order of the Court will issue. Plaintiffs inquire about adding Charles Lybarger to the case and ask if the motion would be granted with or without prejudice if the expert deadlines are extended. The Court advises counsel that any interlocutory order can be reconsidered at a later date, and that if circumstances change, it will not rule out a motion on the issue. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
|
March 19, 2012 |
Filing 106
REPLY to Response to #95 Emergency MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosure Statement ; filed by Defendant Lauchlin McKinnon, Counter Claimant Lauchlin McKinnon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Dziminski, Brian)
|
March 12, 2012 |
Filing 105
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #93 Amended Complaint. Charles J. Lybarger Acknowledgement filed by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. (Kerr, Preston)
|
March 9, 2012 |
Filing 104
JOINDER to #95 Emergency MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosure Statement ; filed by Defendant Michael Vannozzi, Cross Claimants Michael Vannozzi, Michael Vannozzi. (Garin, Joseph)
|
March 9, 2012 |
Filing 103
RESPONSE to #95 Emergency MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosure Statement, filed by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. Replies due by 3/19/2012. (Kerr, Preston) .
|
March 8, 2012 |
Filing 102
JOINDER to #95 Emergency MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosure Statement ; filed by Cross Defendants Jeff Ehlert, Jeff Ehlert, Defendant Jeff Ehlert, Counter Claimant Jeff Ehlert. (Sayyar, Assly)
|
March 7, 2012 |
Filing 101
NOTICE of Change of Address by Assly Sayyar. for Adams Law Group, Ltd. (Sayyar, Assly)
|
March 7, 2012 |
Filing 100
Third ANSWER to #93 Amended Complaint filed by Jeff Ehlert. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/17/2012. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/21/2012.(Sayyar, Assly)
|
March 7, 2012 |
Filing 99
ANSWER to #93 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Lauchlin McKinnon. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/17/2012. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/21/2012.(Dziminski, Brian)
|
March 5, 2012 |
Filing 98
First ANSWER to #93 Amended Complaint Defendant Michael Vannozzi's Answer and And Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint and Cross-Claim Against Jeff Ehlert ( Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/15/2012., Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/19/2012.), First CROSSCLAIM against Jeff Ehlert filed by Michael Vannozzi.(Garin, Joseph)
|
February 27, 2012 |
Filing 97
Summons Issued as to Charles J. Lybarger re #93 Amended Complaint. (EDS)
|
February 24, 2012 |
Filing 96
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr, on 2/24/2012. By Deputy Clerk: Heidi Ojeda. RE: #95 Emergency MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosure Statement. Motion Hearing set for Wednesday, March 28, 2012 at 9:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. The Court will hear this motion in its ordinary course. If the Court allows the Plaintiff's designated expert to provide expert opinion testimony pursuant to Rule 26(a), the Court will grant Defendants additional time as reasonable and necesary to conduct expert discovery and disclose rebuttal experts. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Ojeda, Heidi)
|
February 24, 2012 |
Filing 95
Emergency MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosure Statement by Defendant Lauchlin McKinnon, Counter Claimant Lauchlin McKinnon. Responses due by 3/12/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C)(Dziminski, Brian)
|
February 24, 2012 |
Filing 94
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued for Charles J. Lybarger, filed by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. (Kerr, Preston)
|
February 24, 2012 |
Filing 93
THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jeff Ehlert, Charles J. Lybarger, Lauchlin McKinnon, and Michael Vannozzi filed by Jay Westerdal and Name Intelligence Inc. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 6/23/2012. (ASB)
|
February 24, 2012 |
Filing 92
ORDER Granting #89 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Clerk shall file the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/24/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
February 1, 2012 |
Filing 91
ANSWER to #88 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim filed by Jeff Ehlert.(Sayyar, Assly)
|
January 17, 2012 |
Filing 90
DECLARATION of Hamilton H. Gardiner in Support of Plaintiff's #89 Motion to Amend the Complaint by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. (Kerr, Preston) Docket entry relationship modified on 1/19/2012 (SRK).
|
January 17, 2012 |
Filing 89
Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. Responses due by 2/3/2012. (Kerr, Preston)
|
January 12, 2012 |
Filing 88
AMENDED ANSWER to #70 Amended Complaint, and CROSS-CLAIM against Jeff Ehlert filed by Michael Vannozzi.(EDS)
|
January 12, 2012 |
Filing 87
ORDER Granting #86 Defendant Michael Vannozzi's Motion for Leave to File a Cross-claim against Jeff Ehlert. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/11/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
December 21, 2011 |
Filing 86
MOTION for Leave to File A Cross-Claim Against Jeff Ehlert by Defendant Michael Vannozzi. Motion ripe 12/21/2011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Garin, Joseph)
|
October 19, 2011 |
Filing 85
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Lauchlin McKinnon. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Dziminski, Brian)
|
October 19, 2011 |
Filing 84
ORDER for Certificate of Interested Parties. IT IS ORDERED that counsel for Defendants shall file their Certificate of Interested Parties no later than 10/31/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/19/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
October 11, 2011 |
Filing 83
SCHEDULING ORDER Grating #82 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 4/20/2012. Motions due by 5/21/2012. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/20/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/11/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
October 6, 2011 |
Filing 82
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Stipulation and Order to Extend Discovery by Defendant Michael Vannozzi. (Garin, Joseph)
|
October 3, 2011 |
Filing 81
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Michael Vannozzi that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Vegas One Realty for Michael Vannozzi added.. (Garin, Joseph)
|
October 3, 2011 |
Filing 80
ERROR NOTICE to counsel re filing of #79 Certificate of Interested Parties. All interested parties were not properly entered on the docket. Attorney Joseph Garin advised that in the future, Certificates of Interested Parties filed with the District of Nevada shall be filed in accordance with FRCP 7.1 and LR 7.1-1, and shall enter on the docket all persons, associations of person, firms, partnerships or corporations which have a direct, pecuniary interest in the outcome of the case. (no image attached)(ASB)
|
September 30, 2011 |
Filing 79
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Michael Vannozzi. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case Certificate of Interested Parties. (Garin, Joseph)
|
September 30, 2011 |
Filing 78
ANSWER to #70 Amended Complaint filed by Lauchlin McKinnon. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/10/2011. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/14/2011.(Dziminski, Brian)
|
September 30, 2011 |
Filing 77
ANSWER to #70 Amended Complaint filed by Jeff Ehlert. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/10/2011. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/14/2011.(Sayyar, Assly)
|
September 22, 2011 |
Filing 76
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #74 Answer to Counterclaim by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Kerr, Preston)
|
September 22, 2011 |
Filing 75
ANSWER to #66 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Jeff Ehlert's filed by Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal.(Kerr, Preston)
|
September 22, 2011 |
Filing 74
ANSWER to #68 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Lauchlin McKinnon's filed by Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal.(Kerr, Preston) Added corrected image #76 on 9/22/2011 (RFJ).
|
September 20, 2011 |
Filing 73
ANSWER to #70 Amended Complaint Defendant Michael Vannozzi's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Michael Vannozzi. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/30/2011. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/4/2011.(Garin, Joseph)
|
September 1, 2011 |
Filing 72
Summons Issued as to Michael Vannozzi. (ASB)
|
August 31, 2011 |
Filing 71
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Michael Vannozzi, filed by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. (Kerr, Preston)
|
August 31, 2011 |
Filing 70
AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against Jeff Ehlert, Charles J. Lybarger, Lauchlin McKinnon, filed by Name Intelligence Inc. Adds new parties. Proof of service due by 12/29/2011. (Kerr, Preston)
|
August 12, 2011 |
Filing 69
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #67 Stipulation to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/12/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
August 11, 2011 |
Filing 68
AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal filed by Lauchlin McKinnon.(Dziminski, Brian)
|
August 11, 2011 |
Filing 67
STIPULATION and Order to Allow Plaintiffs to Amend Complaint by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. (Kerr, Preston)
|
August 10, 2011 |
Filing 66
AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal filed by Jeff Ehlert.(Sayyar, Assly)
|
August 10, 2011 |
Filing 65
ORDER that Defendant Jeff Ehlerts Motion Seeking Leave to Amend Answer and Leave to Raise Counter Claims #63 is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/10/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
August 10, 2011 |
Filing 64
ORDER that Defendant Lauchlin McKinnons Motion for Leave to Amend Answer #60 is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/10/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
July 20, 2011 |
Filing 63
MOTION to Amend/Correct #46 Answer to Amended Complaint. and seeking leave to raise counter claims by Defendant Jeff Ehlert. Responses due by 8/6/2011. (Sayyar, Assly)
|
July 20, 2011 |
Filing 62
Interim STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. (Kerr, Preston)
|
July 20, 2011 |
Filing 61
MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. Responses due by 8/6/2011. (Kerr, Preston)
|
July 15, 2011 |
Filing 60
MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer by Defendant Lauchlin McKinnon. Responses due by 8/1/2011. (Dziminski, Brian)
|
May 4, 2011 |
Filing 59
NOTICE of Change of Address by Assly Sayyar. (Sayyar, Assly)
|
May 2, 2011 |
Filing 58
SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #56 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 10/19/2011. Motions due by 11/18/2011. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/19/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/2/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
May 2, 2011 |
Filing 57
ORDER re: #55 Response to Order to Show Cause. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that sanctions will not be imposed and this matter shall proceed forward. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/2/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
April 29, 2011 |
Filing 56
PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Name Intelligence Inc. (Kerr, Preston)
|
April 27, 2011 |
Filing 55
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Defendant Lauchlin McKinnon. (Smith, Mark)
|
April 27, 2011 |
Filing 54
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark R Smith on behalf of Defendant Lauchlin McKinnon. (Smith, Mark)
|
April 20, 2011 |
Filing 53
ORDER for the Filing of a Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by 4/29/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/19/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
April 20, 2011 |
Filing 52
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Defendant Lauchlin McKinnon's failure to retain new counsel or advise the Court Defendant would proceed pro se. Show Cause Response due by 4/29/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/19/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
March 28, 2011 |
Filing 51
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Jeff Ehlert. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Sayyar, Assly)
|
March 28, 2011 |
Filing 50
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Assly Sayyar on behalf of Defendant Jeff Ehlert. (Sayyar, Assly)
|
March 18, 2011 |
Filing 49
ORDER Granting #44 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Charles J. Lybarger withdrawn from the case as to Jeff Ehlert and Lauchlin McKinnon. Notice of Retained Counsel or to Proceed Pro Se due by 4/8/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/18/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; CC: Jeff Ehlert and Lauchlin McKinnon - ASB)
|
March 18, 2011 |
Filing 48
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #45 Stipulation for Property and Funds Transfer. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/18/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
March 17, 2011 |
Filing 47
ORDER for Certificate of Interested Parties. IT IS ORDERED that counsel for Defendants shall have until 3/28/2011 to fully comply with the provisions of Local Rule 7.1-1. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/28/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/16/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
February 28, 2011 |
Filing 46
ANSWER to #41 Amended Complaint filed by Jeff Ehlert, Lauchlin McKinnon. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/10/2011. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/14/2011.(Lybarger, Charles)
|
February 25, 2011 |
Filing 45
STIPULATION and Order for Transfer of Property by Defendants Jeff Ehlert, Lauchlin McKinnon. (Lybarger, Charles)
|
February 21, 2011 |
Filing 44
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Charles J. Lybarger. by Defendants Jeff Ehlert, Lauchlin McKinnon. Motion ripe 2/21/2011. (Lybarger, Charles)
|
February 4, 2011 |
Filing 42
ORDER that the Motion to Dismiss for Lack of jurisdiction #26 is DENIED. Ehlert's Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default #25 is GRANTED. However, Ehlert is sanctioned $500, the reasonable costs incurred by Plaintiffs in litigating the issue. Lybarger's Motion to Dismiss #24 is DENIED as moot. Further jurisdictional discovery may be had for 60 days. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/4/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
February 2, 2011 |
Filing 41
AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jeff Ehlert, Lauchlin McKinnon, filed by Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. Removes parties. Proof of service due by 6/2/2011.(Kerr, Preston)
|
January 25, 2011 |
Filing 40
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #34 Reply to Response to Motion, #31 Response to Motion, #26 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; filed by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. Order Denying Defendant Ehlert's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Kerr, Preston)
|
January 25, 2011 |
Filing 39
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #27 Response to Motion, #32 Reply to Response to Motion, #25 MOTION to Set Aside Entry of Default ; filed by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. Order Granting Defendants Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default (Kerr, Preston)
|
January 25, 2011 |
Filing 38
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. Regarding Motion to Dismiss of Charles J. Lybarger (Kerr, Preston)
|
January 21, 2011 |
Filing 43
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing RE: #24 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lybarger, #25 MOTION to Set Aside Entry of Default, #26 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, held on 1/21/2011 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: L. Ettinger; Pla Counsel: Preston Kerr; Def Counsel: Joe Bunin; Court Reporter/FTR #: Margaret Griener; Time of Hearing: 10:54 - 11:03 am; Courtroom: 3D; The Court makes inquiry and hears arguments of counsel with respect to the motions at issue. The Court advises counsel of its intention to deny without prejudice #26 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Defendant shall have a period of sixty (60) days for further jurisdictional discovery. Thereafter, #26 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is denied with prejudice. Further, the Court grants #25 Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default. Mr. Ehlert is sanctioned the sum of five hundred dollars ($500.00) to Plaintiff. Further, #24 Motion to Dismiss is denied as moot. Counsel is directed to prepare and submit a proposed order in accordance with the Court's ruling. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
January 20, 2011 |
Filing 37
NOTICE of Hearing Location: Oral argument on various pending motions previously set for 1/21/2011 10:00 AM will be held in LV Courtroom 3D before Judge Robert C. Jones. (no image attached)(LE)
|
January 7, 2011 |
Filing 36
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Roger L. Hunt, on January 7, 2011.To properly distribute the case load for the magistrate judges in the District of Nevada, IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Judge George W. Foley, Jr., U.S. Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings consistent with his jurisdiction. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2-10-cv-1202-RCJ-GWF. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
|
December 27, 2010 |
Filing 35
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 12/27/2010. By Deputy Clerk: Lesa Ettinger.ORAL ARGUMENT RE: #24 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lybarger, #25 MOTION to Set Aside Entry of Default, #26 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, is scheduled for Friday, 1/21/2011 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom TBD before Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
October 25, 2010 |
Filing 34
REPLY to Response to #26 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; filed by Defendants Jeff Ehlert, Lauchlin McKinnon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H, #4 Exhibit I, #5 Exhibit J)(Lybarger, Charles)
|
October 18, 2010 |
Filing 33
REPLY to Response to #24 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lybarger ; filed by Defendants Jeff Ehlert, Lauchlin McKinnon. (Lybarger, Charles)
|
October 18, 2010 |
Filing 32
REPLY to Response to #25 MOTION to Set Aside Entry of Default ; filed by Defendants Jeff Ehlert, Lauchlin McKinnon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Lybarger, Charles)
|
October 15, 2010 |
Filing 31
RESPONSE to #26 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. Defendants Replies due by 10/25/2010. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hamilton H. Gardiner, #2 Declaration of P. Sterling Kerr, #3 Declaration of Jay Westerdal, #4 Declaration of Jeffery S. Jones)(Kerr, Preston)
|
October 8, 2010 |
Filing 30
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Response to Motion to Dismiss Defendant Charles J. Lybarger; Declaration of Hamilton H. Gardiner in Support of Name Intelligence, Inc. and Jay Westerdal's Response to Motion to Dismiss Defendant Charles J. Lybarger and Name Intelligence, Inc. and Jay Westerdal's Opposition to Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal re #27 Response to Motion, #29 Declaration, #28 Response to Motion. (Kerr, Preston)
|
October 7, 2010 |
Filing 29
DECLARATION re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lybarger ; filed by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. (Kerr, Preston)
|
October 7, 2010 |
Filing 28
RESPONSE to #24 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lybarger, filed by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. Replies due by 10/17/2010. (Kerr, Preston)
|
October 7, 2010 |
Filing 27
RESPONSE to #25 MOTION to Set Aside Entry of Default, filed by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. Replies due by 10/17/2010. (Kerr, Preston)
|
September 28, 2010 |
Filing 26
First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Jeff Ehlert, Charles J. Lybarger, Lauchlin McKinnon. Responses due by 10/15/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Lybarger, Charles)
|
September 20, 2010 |
Filing 25
MOTION to Set Aside Entry of Default by Defendant Jeff Ehlert. Responses due by 10/7/2010. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Counsel)(Lybarger, Charles)
|
September 20, 2010 |
Filing 24
MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lybarger by Defendant Charles J. Lybarger. Responses due by 10/7/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Lybarger, Charles)
|
September 17, 2010 |
Party Charles J. Lybarger terminated pursuant to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #23 . (ECS)
|
September 17, 2010 |
Filing 23
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. of Defendant Charles J. Lybarger and Order Thereon (Kerr, Preston)
|
September 1, 2010 |
Filing 22
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jeff Ehlert re #21 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default. (ECS)
|
August 31, 2010 |
Filing 21
MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. Motion ripe 8/31/2010. (Kerr, Preston)
|
August 30, 2010 |
Filing 20
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Summons, Complaint, etc. by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. (Kerr, Preston)
|
August 11, 2010 |
Filing 19
PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/11/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
August 5, 2010 |
Filing 17
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. (Kerr, Preston)
|
August 2, 2010 |
Filing 18
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Preliminary/Permanent Injunction Hearing held on 8/2/2010 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Lesa Ettinger; Pla Counsel: Charles Lybarger; Def Counsel: Preston Kerr; Court Reporter/FTR #: Kathy French; Time of Hearing: 11:13 - 11:29 AM; Courtroom: 6; The Court hears representations of Mr. Kerr and Mr. Lybarger in relation to the Preliminary Injunction. The Court finds that there would be irreparable harm under the circumstances. Therefore, IT IS ORDERED that the Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED as set forth on the record. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the #13 Temporary Restraining Order shall remain in effect until defendants are served with the Preliminary Injunction Order. The Court denies Mr. Lybarger's request for a bond. Mr. Kerr shall prepare and serve a proposed order in accordance with the Court's ruling. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
July 29, 2010 |
Filing 16
ORDER granting #5 Verified Petition for Permission for Attorney Hamilton Gardiner to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Attorney Preston Kerr as Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/28/10. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
July 28, 2010 |
Filing 15
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 7/28/2010. By Deputy Clerk: Lesa Ettinger. Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, IT IS ORDERED that the Preliminary Injunction Hearing currently scheduled for Monday, 8/2/2010 10:00 AM is RESCHEDULED (IN TIME ONLY) TO 11:00 AM (SAME DATE) in Reno Courtroom 6 before Judge Robert C. Jones. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Parties wishing to appear telephonically shall contact Lesa Ettinger, Courtroom Administrator, at 775-686-5833, at least two (2) days prior to the hearing to confirm his/her appearance by telephone and for instructions on how to connect telephonically. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
July 26, 2010 |
Filing 14
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Kerr, Preston)
|
July 23, 2010 |
Filing 13
ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Robert C. Jones, United States District Judge on 07/23/2010, by Carrie Lipparelli, Judicial Assistant. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #6 Name Intelligence, Inc. and Jay Westerdal's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is GRANTED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL)
|
July 23, 2010 |
Filing 12
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - TRO Hearing held on 7/23/2010 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Lesa Ettinger; Pla Counsel: Preston Kerr; Def : Charles Lybarger; Court Reporter/FTR #: Margaret Griener; Time of Hearing: 12:26 - 12:49 PM; Courtroom: 6; The Court hears arguments of the parties as to their respective positions regarding #6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. For reasons stated on the record, the Court GRANTS #6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Written Order of the Court will issue.A Preliminary Injunction Hearing is scheduled for Monday, 8/2/2010 10:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 6 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Parties wishing to appear telephonically shall contact Lesa Ettinger, Courtroom Administrator, at 775-686-5833, at least two (2) days prior to the hearing to confirm his/her appearance by telephone and for instructions on how to connect telephonically. IT IS SO ORDERED(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 11
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ; filed by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. (Kerr, Preston)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 10
DECLARATION of Jay Westerdal in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ; by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E to Declaration of Jay Westerdal)(Kerr, Preston)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 9
DECLARATION of P. Sterling Kerr in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ; by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. (Kerr, Preston)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 8
DECLARATION of Carl Taylor in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ; by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. (Kerr, Preston)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 7
DECLARATION of Hamilton H. Gardiner In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ; by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. (Kerr, Preston)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 6
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. Motion ripe 7/22/2010. (Kerr, Preston)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 5
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Hamilton H. Gardiner and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Law Offices of P. Sterling Kerr (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1683686) by Plaintiffs Name Intelligence Inc, Jay Westerdal. Motion ripe 7/22/2010. (Kerr, Preston)
|
July 21, 2010 |
Filing 4
Summons Issued as to Jeff Ehlert, Charles J. Lybarger, Lauchlin McKinnon re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ECS)
|
July 21, 2010 |
Filing 3
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel Hamilton H. Gardiner to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Counsel is also required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 9/4/2010.(no image attached) (ECS)
|
July 21, 2010 |
Filing 2
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (ECS)
|
July 21, 2010 |
Case assigned to Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt. (ECS)
|
July 20, 2010 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT for (1) Breach of Contract; (2) Breach of Fiduciary Duties; (3) Accounting; (4) Violation of the Securities Act of Washington - Sale of Unregistered Securities; and (5) Violation of the Securities Act of Washington - Fraudulent Acts and Other Prohibited Practices against Jeff Ehlert, Charles J. Lybarger, Lauchlin McKinnon (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0978-1680986), filed by Name Intelligence, Inc., a Washington Corporation, Jay Westerdal. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/30/2010. Proof of service due by 11/17/2010. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kerr, Preston)
|