Righthaven LLC v. Center For Intercultural Organizing et al Featured Case

Defendant: Center For Intercultural Organizing and Kayse Jama
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv01322
Filed: August 5, 2010
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2011 51 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. (Mangano, Shawn)
June 20, 2011 50 CERTIFICATE OF RECORD on 42 Notice of Appeal. The record on appeal, consisting of the reporter's transcripts and the United States District Court clerk's record is ready for the purpose of the appeal. This file exists in electronic format and is accessible via CM/ECF - PACER. The documents comprising the United States District Court clerk's record have been numbered in conformance with Rule 11(b) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. These document numbers are reflected on the United States District Court's docket sheet and should be used for reference purposes in the briefs. Appeals in Habeas Corpus and 28 USC 2255 Motion to Vacate Sentence cases are treated as civil appeals in the Court of Appeals. Criminal appeals briefing schedules will be issued upon the filing of this document. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (no image attached) (ECS)
June 17, 2011 49 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC re 42 Notice of Appeal, 26 Show Cause Hearing,,, 33 Show Cause Hearing,, 27 Transcript,, 36 Transcript,,. (Mangano, Shawn)
June 3, 2011 48 Featured Case ORDER for Time Schedule as to 42 Notice of Appeal filed by Righthaven LLC. USCA Case Number 11-16358. (JAG)
May 31, 2011 47 LETTER from Federal Circuit Court of Appeals Transferring 42 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals. (CC: USCA - ASB)
May 19, 2011 46 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on 5/19/2011. By Deputy Clerk: Michael Zadina. RE: 43 Appeal Fees Paid. Entry applied to wrong appellate court by Clerk.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 43 Appeal Fees Paid is STRICKEN. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MJZ)
May 19, 2011 45 TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to Federal Circuit Court of Appeals re 42 Notice of Appeal. (JAG)
May 19, 2011 44 USCA Appeal Fees received $455 receipt number 0978-1991201 re 42 Notice of Appeal filed by Righthaven LLC. Notice sent to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals. (JAG)
May 19, 2011 43 STRICKEN per 46 Minute Order. (MJZ) USCA Appeal Fees received $455 receipt number 0978-1991201 re 42 Notice of Appeal filed by Righthaven LLC. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (JAG)
May 18, 2011 42 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 40 Judgment, 38 Order, 12 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0978-1991201. Notice sent to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals. (Mangano, Shawn)
May 13, 2011 41 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: # 1 Order Dismissing Case, # 2 Judgment) (ASB)
May 13, 2011 40 JUDGMENT in favor of Center For Intercultural Organizing and Kayse Jama and against Righthaven LLC. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/13/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
May 11, 2011 39 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Defendants Center For Intercultural Organizing, Kayse Jama FINAL JUDGMENT. (Stoberski, Michael)
April 22, 2011 38 Featured Case ORDER Granting Summary Judgment in favor of the defendants. The defendants shall prepare an appropriate judgment for the court's review and signature. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/22/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
April 6, 2011 37 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER re: 33 Minutes Granting Summary Judgment, filed by Defendants Center For Intercultural Organizing, Kayse Jama (Stoberski, Michael) Modified to add document relationship and remove all caps on 4/11/2011 (RFJ).
April 5, 2011 36 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 33 Show Cause Hearing held on 3/18/2011, before Judge James C. Mahan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Joy Garner, 702-384-3188. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website www.nvd.uscourts.gov before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 4/26/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/4/2011. (ABB)
April 1, 2011 35 ERRATA to 34 Response - Other ; filed by Defendants Center For Intercultural Organizing, Kayse Jama. (Stoberski, Michael)
March 25, 2011 34 RESPONSE to 12 Order to Show Cause, filed by Defendants Center For Intercultural Organizing, Kayse Jama. (Stoberski, Michael) Modified to remove duplicate wording on 4/1/2011 (RFJ).
March 18, 2011 33 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Show Cause Hearing held on 3/18/2011 before Judge James C. Mahan. Crtrm Administrator: David Oakes; Pla Counsel: Shawn Mangano; Def Counsel: Chris Richardson, Chad Bowers, Jason Schultz - amicus curiae; Court Reporter/FTR #: Joy Garner; Time of Hearing: 1:30 p.m.; Courtroom: 6A; Representations of counsel are heard. The court made its findings. Court ordered Mr. Richardson to prepare and submit an appropriate order for signature. Submission of Proposed Order obo defendant is due by 3/25/2011.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXO)
March 18, 2011 32 Featured Case ORDER Denying 7 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/18/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
February 17, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings: Order to show cause hearing set for 2/22/2011 1:30 PM is hereby VACATED and rescheduled for 3/18/2011 01:30 PM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. (SRB)
February 2, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings: Order to show cause hearing set for 2/10/2011 1:30 PM is hereby VACATED and rescheduled for 2/22/2011 01:30 PM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. (SRB)
January 21, 2011 31 NOTICE of Hearing Order to show cause hearing why this case should not be dismissed set for 2/10/2011 01:30 PM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. (no image attached)(SRB)
January 14, 2011 30 Reply to 28 Response; filed by Amicus Jason Schultz. (Bowers, Chad) Event modified on 1/20/2011 (RFJ).
January 14, 2011 29 REPLY to 28 Response; filed by Defendants Center For Intercultural Organizing, Kayse Jama. Opposition to Plaintiff's Identification of Genuine Issues of Material Fact that Require Resolution Prior to Continued Fair Use Hearing (Stoberski, Michael) Event modified on 1/20/2011 (RFJ).
January 8, 2011 28 RESPONSE to 24 Response to Motion, 18 Response to Motion, 26 Show Cause Hearing,,, 25 Declaration, 19 Order on Motion,,,, Set/Reset Hearings, 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae at Hearing, 23 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear, 14 Response to Order to Show Cause, 27 Transcript,, 15 Declaration, 12 Order to Show Cause, 22 Notice (Other) ; Genuine Issues of Material Fact Precluding Dismissal on Fair Use Grounds filed by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. (Mangano, Shawn)
January 5, 2011 27 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 26 Show Cause Hearing held on 12/28/2010, before Judge James C. Mahan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Joy Garner, 702-384-3188. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website www.nvd.uscourts.gov before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 1/26/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/5/2011. (ABB)
December 28, 2010 26 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Show Cause Hearing held on 12/28/2010 before Judge James C. Mahan. Crtrm Administrator: David Oakes; Pla Counsel: John Charles Coons, Shawn A. Mangano; Def Counsel: Jason Schultz - Professor, Chad Bowers, Chris Richardson, Matthew Cavanaugh; Court Reporter/FTR #: Joy Garner; Time of Hearing: 10:30 a.m.; Courtroom: 6A; Representations of counsel are heard. Court stated it would adjourn this hearing and give plaintiff's a chance to file their genuine issues of material facts and give defendants a chance to respond. COURT ORDERED Genuine issues of material Facts obo plaintiffs are due by 1/7/2011. Responses obo defendants are due by 1/14/2011.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXO)
December 27, 2010 25 DECLARATION re 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae at Hearing, 17 MOTION to be granted permission to file amicus brief, 21 MOTION amicus curiae brief ; filed by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. Declaration of Shawn A. Mangano, Esq. (Mangano, Shawn)
December 27, 2010 24 RESPONSE to filed by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. to Professor Jason Schultz's Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief and to Appear at Hearing on Order to Show Cause Replies due by 1/6/2011. (Mangano, Shawn)
December 27, 2010 23 Featured Case ORDER that the motion of Professor Jason Schultz to appear in amicus curiae at hearing on order to show cause regarding fair use 20 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/27/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
December 23, 2010 22 NOTICE by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC re 18 Response to Motion,. REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS REPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Coons, John)
December 17, 2010 21 BRIEF re 20 Motion for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae at Hearing; by Amicus Jason Schultz. (Bowers, Chad) Event type corrected on 12/17/2010. (MJZ)
December 17, 2010 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae at Hearing; by Amicus Jason Schultz. Responses due by 1/3/2011. (Bowers, Chad)
December 15, 2010 19 Featured Case ORDER Granting 17 Motion for Permission to File an Amicus Curiae Brief. Show Cause Hearing set for 12/16/10 is VACATED and rescheduled for 12/28/2010 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/15/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 14, 2010 18 RESPONSE to filed by Defendants Center For Intercultural Organizing, Kayse Jama. Opposition to Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause and, Alternatlively, Request for a Continuance to Conduct Discovery Pursuant to FRCP 56(f) Replies due by 12/24/2010. (Stoberski, Michael)
December 14, 2010 17 MOTION to be granted permission to file amicus brief by Amicus Jason Schultz. Responses due by 12/31/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Brief)(Bowers, Chad)
November 29, 2010 16 Featured Case ORDER granting 13 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Steven A. Gibson terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt on 11/29/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAP)
November 29, 2010 15 DECLARATION of SHAWN A. MANGANO, ESQ. re: 14 RESPONSE to order to Show Cause and alternatively, request for a continuance to conduct discovery pursuant to FRCP 56(F) filed by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1)(Mangano, Shawn) added document relationship; removed duplicate word and all caps on 12/20/2010 (RFJ).
November 29, 2010 14 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC and, alternatively, request for a continuance to conduct discovery pursuant to FRCP 56(F). (Mangano, Shawn) Modified to remove all caps on 12/20/2010 (RFJ).
November 23, 2010 13 MOTION to Substitute Attorney SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL BY STIPULATION by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. Motion ripe 11/23/2010. (Coons, John)
November 15, 2010 12 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The plaintiff show cause, in writing, within ten (10) days of the date of filing of this order why the court should not dismiss the instant case. A show cause hearing is scheduled before District Judge James C. Mahan on 12/16/10, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 6A. Failure of plaintiff to appear shall result in the imposition of sanction for that party. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/15/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
September 27, 2010 11 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 8 Stipulation to Withdraw a Portion of Defendants' 7 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/27/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS) Modified text on 10/9/2010 (SRK).
September 27, 2010 10 REPLY to Response to 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; filed by Defendants Center For Intercultural Organizing, Kayse Jama. (Stoberski, Michael)
September 16, 2010 9 RESPONSE to 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. Replies due by 9/26/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Coons, John)
September 15, 2010 8 STIPULATION re 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; AND ORDER TO WITHDRAW A PORTION OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendants Center For Intercultural Organizing, Kayse Jama. (Stoberski, Michael)
August 30, 2010 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Center For Intercultural Organizing, Kayse Jama. Responses due by 9/16/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A", # 2 Exhibit "B")(Stoberski, Michael)
August 11, 2010 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Righthaven LLC re 1 Complaint, 3 Summons Issued. Center For Intercultural Organizing served on 8/9/2010, answer due 8/30/2010; Kayse Jama served on 8/9/2010, answer due 8/30/2010. (Coons, John)
August 9, 2010 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Righthaven LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Net Sortie Systems, LLC, Corporate Parent SI Content Monitor LLC for Righthaven LLC added.. (Coons, John)
August 5, 2010 4 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: # 1 complaint) (EDS)
August 5, 2010 3 Summons Issued as to Center For Intercultural Organizing. (EDS)
August 5, 2010 2 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (EDS)
August 5, 2010 Case assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt. (EDS)
August 5, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against Center For Intercultural Organizing, Kayse Jama (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0978-1698547), filed by Righthaven LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 8/15/2010. Proof of service due by 12/3/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Coons, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Righthaven LLC v. Center For Intercultural Organizing et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Center For Intercultural Organizing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kayse Jama
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Represented By: Joseph C. Chu
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]