Fireman's Fund Insurance Company v. Sloan Valve Company

Plaintiff: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Defendant: Sloan Valve Company
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv01816
Filed: October 19, 2010
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Roger L. Hunt
Referring Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
 
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2013 104 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE Granting 103 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/6/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 16, 2010 11 Featured Case DISCOVERY PLAN and SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 6/3/2011. Motions due by 7/5/2011. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/5/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt on 12/16/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
November 16, 2011 57 Featured Case ORDER that Sloans Motion Partial Summary Judgment 36 is GRANTED. CMS Facilities Motion to Dismiss 29 is GRANTED. CMS Facilities Motion for Hearing 47 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 11/16/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
October 16, 2012 89 Featured Case ORDER Denying 71 Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying 83 Motion to Strike; and Denying 86 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/16/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
January 3, 2013 98 Featured Case ORDER Denying 90 Defendant's Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/3/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company v. Sloan Valve Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Represented By: Gilbert S Hernandez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sloan Valve Company
Represented By: Brian W Goldman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]