Brown v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Ron L. Brown
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2010cv01843
Filed: October 21, 2010
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Referring Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 5 Motion to Dismiss Breach of Fiduciary Duty Claim, Breech of Regulatory or Administrative Codes, Vicarious Liability/Respondent Superior Claim, and to Strike Pro Se Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/7/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 8, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER Granting 5 Motion to Dismiss Breach of Fiduciary Duty Claim, Breech of Regulatory or Administrative Codes, Vicarious Liability/Respondeat Superior Claim, and to Strike Pro Se Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/7/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
December 19, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice re: 31 Stipulation for Dismissal. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 12/19/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron L. Brown
Represented By: George R. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.