Righthaven LLC v. Hoehn Featured Case

Defendant: Wayne Hoehn
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
702) 527-5909 (fax: John Charles Coons
Case Number: 2:2011cv00050
Filed: January 11, 2011
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2012 91 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 88 Motion Hearing, held on Monday, March 5, 2012, before Judge Philip M. Pro. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, Inc., 361-949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website www.nvd.uscourts.gov before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 4/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2012. (JPQ)
March 13, 2012 90 Featured Case ORDER Transferring Intellectual Property to Receiver Lara Pearson. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 3/13/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
March 8, 2012 89 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on 88 Order on Motion for Writ, Motion Hearing,,,,,, ; filed by Defendant Wayne Hoehn Proposed Order for Transfer of Intellectual Property. (DeVoy, James)
March 5, 2012 88 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 3/5/2012 before Judge Philip M. Pro. Crtrm Administrator: D. Sherwood; Pla Counsel: None Appearing- Appearing Telephonically: Lara Pearson, Receiver; Def Counsel: Marc Randazza, James M. DeVoy; Court Reporter/FTR #: Joan Quiros; Time of Hearing: 4:00 p.m.; Courtroom: 7C; The Court finds Mr. Mangano has failed to appear. The clerk attempts to contact Mr. Mangano's office and receives no answer. The Court hears the representations of Mr. Randazza and Ms. Pearson. The Court ORDERS the interests, copyright, etc., to the extent any such interests remain, be transferred to Defendant. Mr. Randazza shall prepare a Proposed Order for the Court's signature. IT IS ORDERED Defendant's Motion for Writ of Body Attachment 68 is denied. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DMS)
February 29, 2012 87 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Philip M. Pro, on 2/29/2012. By Deputy Clerk: D. Sherwood. IT IS ORDERED the Hearing on 68 Defendants' Motion for Writ of Body Attachment set for 3/5/2012 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Philip M. Pro is RESET TO 04:00 PM ON THE SAME DATE. The Court has a conflict in scheduling.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DMS)
February 21, 2012 86 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Philip M. Pro, on 2/21/2012. By Deputy Clerk: D. Sherwood. IT IS ORDERED a Motion Hearing is set for 3/5/2012 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtrom 7C before Judge Philip M. Pro on 68 Defendants' Motion for Writ of Body Attachment.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DMS)
February 21, 2012 85 Featured Case ORDER denying Defendant's 69 Motion for Contempt. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 2/21/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
February 21, 2012 84 AMENDED WRIT OF EXECUTION in favor of Wayne Hoehn and against Righthaven LLC in the amount of $34,056.90 pursuant to Order 83 . (ECS)
February 21, 2012 83 Featured Case ORDER that Plaintiff Righthavens Motion to Quash Writ of Execution 76 is DENIED. The Writ of Execution 59 entered by the Clerk of Court on November 1, 2011 is hereby amended to provide for execution on the Judgment entered by this Court 44 on August 15, 2011 in the amount of $34,045.50. The Clerk of Court shall forthwith enter and amended writ of execution in conformance with this Order. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 2/21/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
February 20, 2012 82 NOTICE by Receiver Lara Pearson re 70 Notice (Other), Notice (Other). Notice of Receiver's Report (Pearson, Lara)
February 8, 2012 81 NOTICE by Receiver Lara Pearson (Pearson, Lara)
January 26, 2012 80 RESPONSE to 76 MOTION to Quash re 68 MOTION for Writ of Body Attachment, 59 Writ of Execution, 66 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver, filed by Defendant Wayne Hoehn. Replies due by 2/5/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. DeVoy)(DeVoy, James)
January 19, 2012 79 REPLY to Response to 68 MOTION for Writ of Body Attachment ; filed by Defendant Wayne Hoehn. (DeVoy, James)
January 10, 2012 78 Featured Case ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to 45 Notice of Appeal, filed by Righthaven LLC. Appellants emergency motion for stay pending appeal, filed December 20, 2011, is denied. (ECS)
January 9, 2012 77 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Hearing re judgment debtor exam held on 1/9/2012 before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston. Crtrm Administrator: J. Ries; Pla Counsel: Shawn A. Mangano; Def Counsel: James M. DeVoy and Marc Randazza; Court Reporter/FTR #: 9:11 - 9:21; Time of Hearing: 9:00 a.m.; Courtroom: 3D; The court canvasses the parties regarding the judgment debtor exam. ORDERED that any document and or all information produced during the judgment debtor exam are under a protective order. Steven Gibson and Raisha Gibson are both sworn. The parties are excused to conduct the judgment debtor exam. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAR) Modified on 1/12/2012 to include protective order(JAR).
January 9, 2012 76 MOTION to Quash re 68 MOTION for Writ of Body Attachment, 59 Writ of Execution, 66 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. Motion ripe 1/9/2012. (Mangano, Shawn)
January 9, 2012 75 RESPONSE to 68 MOTION for Writ of Body Attachment, filed by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. Corrected Document Replies due by 1/19/2012. (Mangano, Shawn)
January 9, 2012 74 RESPONSE to 68 MOTION for Writ of Body Attachment, filed by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. Replies due by 1/19/2012. (Mangano, Shawn)
January 6, 2012 73 NOTICE by Receiver Lara Pearson re 66 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver. Notice of Distribution of Funds from Domain Name Auction (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lara Pearson)(Pearson, Lara)
January 6, 2012 72 NOTICE by Defendant Wayne Hoehn re 68 MOTION for Writ of Body Attachment. (DeVoy, James)
January 5, 2012 71 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston, on 1/5/2012. By Deputy Clerk: J. Ries. Due to a scheduling conflict with the plaintiff, ORDERED that judgment debtor exam scheduled for today at 1:30 p.m. is continued to January 9, 2012, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3D. Counsel for plaintiff and counsel for defendant must be present in court for this hearing. Counsel are further reminded of certain requirments in order 67 setting the judgment debtor exam. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAR)
January 3, 2012 70 NOTICE by Receiver Lara Pearson Receiver's Report (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lara Pearson, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16)(Pearson, Lara)
December 30, 2011 69 MOTION for Contempt by Defendant Wayne Hoehn. Responses due by 1/16/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. DeVoy, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(DeVoy, James)
December 19, 2011 68 MOTION for Writ of Body Attachment by Defendant Wayne Hoehn. Motion ripe 12/19/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. DeVoy)(DeVoy, James)
December 12, 2011 67 Featured Case ORDER Granting 60 Motion for Judgment Debtor Exam. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 1/5/2012 01:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 12/12/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 12, 2011 66 Featured Case ORDER Granting 62 Motion to Appoint Receiver and Compel Assignment of Intellectual Property. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 12/12/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 7, 2011 65 NOTICE by Defendant Wayne Hoehn re 60 MOTION for Judgment Debtor Exam. Notice of Plaintiff's Concession under Local Rule 7-2(d) (DeVoy, James)
December 7, 2011 64 NOTICE by Defendant Wayne Hoehn re 62 MOTION to Appoint Receiver and Compel Assignment of Intellectual Property. Notice of Plaintiff's Concession under Local Rule 7-2(d) (DeVoy, James)
November 18, 2011 63 WRIT of Execution Returned Executed as to Shawn A. Mangano Ltd.. (MMM)
November 14, 2011 62 MOTION to Appoint Receiver and Compel Assignment of Intellectual Property by Defendant Wayne Hoehn. Motion ripe 11/14/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Malcolm DeVoy, # 2 Declaration of Lara Pearson, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Proposed Order)(DeVoy, James)
November 10, 2011 61 WRIT of Execution Returned Executed as to Bank of Nevada. (MMM)
November 6, 2011 60 MOTION for Judgment Debtor Exam by Defendant Wayne Hoehn. Motion ripe 11/6/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Malcolm DeVoy, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Order)(DeVoy, James)
November 1, 2011 59 WRIT OF EXECUTION in favor of Wayne Hoehn and against Righthaven LLC in the amount of $63,720.80. (MMM)
October 29, 2011 58 Second MOTION for Writ of Execution by Defendant Wayne Hoehn. Motion ripe 10/29/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of James Malcolm DeVoy IV, # 2 Application for Writ of Execution)(DeVoy, James)
October 19, 2011 57 NOTICE by Defendant Wayne Hoehn Notice of New Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(DeVoy, James)
September 28, 2011 56 Featured Case ORDER Granting 52 Motion to Stay, to the extent that a stay of this Court's Judgment 44 awarding attorneys' fees in favor of Defendant Wayne Hoehn and against Plaintiff Righthaven, LLC in the amount of $34,045.50 is GRANTED on condition that within 30 days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff Righthaven, LLC post a bond in the amount of $34,045.50. FURTHER ORDERED that 54 Motion for Order to Show Cause Regarding Plaintiff's Contempt of Court is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 55 Motion for Writ of Execution is DENIED. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 9/28/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 18, 2011 55 MOTION for Writ of Execution by Defendant Wayne Hoehn. Motion ripe 9/18/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit and Request for Writ of Execution, # 2 Proposed Writ of Execution)(DeVoy, James)
September 16, 2011 54 MOTION for Order to Show Cause regarding Plaintiff's Contempt of Court by Defendant Wayne Hoehn. Motion ripe 9/16/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Malcolm DeVoy)(DeVoy, James)
September 12, 2011 53 RESPONSE to 52 Emergency MOTION to Stay re 43 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, on Shortened Time Pursuant to LR 6-1(a)Emergency MOTION to Stay re 43 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, on Shortened Time Pursuant to LR 6-1(a), filed by Defendant Wayne Hoehn. Replies due by 9/22/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Malcolm DeVoy, # 2 Exhibit A)(DeVoy, James)
September 9, 2011 52 Emergency MOTION to Stay re 43 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, on Shortened Time Pursuant to LR 6-1(a) by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. Motion ripe 9/9/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Shawn A. Mangano, Esq. in Support of Righthaven LLC's OSC Response)(Mangano, Shawn)
August 25, 2011 51 CERTIFICATE OF RECORD on 33 , 45 Notice of Appeal. The record on appeal, consisting of the reporter's transcripts and the United States District Court clerk's record is ready for the purpose of the appeal. This file exists in electronic format and is accessible via CM/ECF - PACER. The documents comprising the United States District Court clerk's record have been numbered in conformance with Rule 11(b) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. These document numbers are reflected on the United States District Court's docket sheet and should be used for reference purposes in the briefs. Appeals in Habeas Corpus and 28 USC 2255 Motion to Vacate Sentence cases are treated as civil appeals in the Court of Appeals. Criminal appeals briefing schedules will be issued upon the filing of this document. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (no image attached) (JAG)
August 24, 2011 50 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC re 33 Notice of Appeal,. Transcripts are NOT required for this appeal. Appeal of Judgment (Mangano, Shawn)
August 24, 2011 49 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC re 45 Notice of Appeal,. Transcripts are NOT required for this appeal. Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Mangano, Shawn)
August 22, 2011 48 Featured Case ORDER for Time Schedule as to 45 Notice of Appeal, filed by Righthaven LLC. USCA Case Number 11-16995. (JAG)
August 22, 2011 47 Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for 45 Notice of Appeal,. The forms may also be obtained on the Court's website at www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (JAG)
August 22, 2011 46 USCA Appeal Fees received $455 receipt number 0978-2090497 re 45 Notice of Appeal, filed by Righthaven LLC. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (JAG)
August 19, 2011 45 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 43 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, 44 Judgment on Attorney Fees by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0978-2090497. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Mangano, Shawn)
August 15, 2011 44 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Wayne Hoehn and against Righthaven LLC in the amount of $34,045.50. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 8/15/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 15, 2011 43 Featured Case ORDER Granting 32 Defendant Hoehn's Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Plaintiff shall, not later than 9/14/11, pay to Defendant Wayne Hoehn the sum of $34,045.50 for reasonable attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 8/15/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 12, 2011 42 RESPONSE to 39 MOTION for Judicial Notice re 32 MOTION for Attorney Fees, 32 MOTION for Attorney Fees, filed by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. And Request to Exclude Argument Not Included in Motion or, Alternatively, Request to File Sur-Reply Replies due by 8/22/2011. (Mangano, Shawn)
August 5, 2011 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. (Mangano, Shawn)
August 1, 2011 40 REPLY to Response to 32 MOTION for Attorney Fees ; filed by Defendant Wayne Hoehn. (DeVoy, James)
August 1, 2011 39 MOTION for Judicial Notice re 32 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Defendant Wayne Hoehn. Responses due by 8/18/2011. (DeVoy, James)
July 23, 2011 38 RESPONSE to 32 MOTION for Attorney Fees, filed by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. Replies due by 8/2/2011. (Mangano, Shawn)
July 22, 2011 37 MOTION for Leave to File by Defendant Wayne Hoehn. Motion ripe 7/22/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Malcolm DeVoy, # 2 Exhibit A)(DeVoy, James)
July 22, 2011 36 Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for 33 Notice of Appeal,. The forms may also be obtained on the Court's website at www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (JAG)
July 22, 2011 35 USCA Appeal Fees received $455 receipt number 0978-2057236 re 33 Notice of Appeal, filed by Righthaven LLC. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (JAG)
July 22, 2011 34 Featured Case ORDER for Time Schedule as to 33 Notice of Appeal, filed by Righthaven LLC. USCA Case Number 11-16751. (JAG)
July 19, 2011 33 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 28 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,,,, Terminate Case, 30 Clerk's Judgment by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0978-2057236. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Mangano, Shawn)
July 5, 2011 32 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Defendant Wayne Hoehn. Responses due by 7/22/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Affidavit of J. Malcolm DeVoy, # 3 Exhibit A)(DeVoy, James)
July 1, 2011 31 LETTER dated 6/27/11 to Judge Pro from David, Ardia, Director, Citizen Media Law Project, requesting publication of June 20th Order 28 . (MMM)
June 20, 2011 30 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant Wayne Hoehn against Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 6/20/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 20, 2011 29 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: # 1 Order #28) (MMM)
June 20, 2011 28 Featured Case ORDER Granting granting 16 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; and Granting 8 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 6/20/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 24, 2011 27 STIPULATION re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; Admission of New Evidence by Defendant Wayne Hoehn. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(DeVoy, James)
May 15, 2011 26 REPLY to Response to 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; filed by Defendant Wayne Hoehn. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(DeVoy, James)
May 9, 2011 25 DECLARATION of Mark A. Hineuber in Support of Righthaven LLC's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction re 23 Response to Motion, 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 24 Declaration, ; by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. (Mangano, Shawn)
May 9, 2011 24 DECLARATION of Steven A. Gibson in Support of Righthaven LLC's Response to Defedant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction re 23 Response to Motion, 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. (Mangano, Shawn)
May 9, 2011 23 RESPONSE to 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. Replies due by 5/19/2011. (Mangano, Shawn)
May 6, 2011 22 Copy of email dated 5/6/11 to Court from Attorney Shawn Mangano re extension of time to respond re 16 Motion to Dismiss. (MMM)
May 6, 2011 21 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Philip M. Pro, on 5/6/2011. IT IS ORDERED THAT Plaintiff shall have to and including Monday, May 9, 2011, to file their response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction(Doc. #16).(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DG)
May 4, 2011 20 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; filed by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC Stipulation for Extension of Time. (Mangano, Shawn)
May 3, 2011 19 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 5/3/2011 before Judge Philip M. Pro. Crtrm Administrator: Donna Sherwood; Pla Counsel: Shawn A. Mangano; Def Counsel: James M. DeVoy, Marc J. Randazza; Court Reporter/FTR #: Joan Quiros; Time of Hearing: 1:30 p.m. - 2:00 p.m.; Courtroom: 7C; The Court having heard the arguments of Mr. DeVoy and Mr. Mangano, the Court finds Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 8 stands submitted. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DMS)
May 2, 2011 18 Featured Case ORDER Granting 17 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Marc J. Randazza and approving Designation of Local Counsel J. Malcolm DeVoy IV for Wayne Hoehn. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 5/2/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 29, 2011 17 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Marc J. Randazza and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Malcolm DeVoy IV (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1970333) filed by Defendant Wayne Hoehn. Motion ripe 4/29/2011. (DeVoy, James)
April 17, 2011 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Wayne Hoehn. Responses due by 5/4/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Malcolm DeVoy, # 2 Exhibit A)(DeVoy, James)
March 24, 2011 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Philip M. Pro, on 3/24/2011. By Deputy Clerk: Donna Sherwood. RE: 8 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, IT IS ORDERED a Motion Hearing is set for 5/3/2011 at 01:30 PM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Philip M. Pro.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DMS)
March 24, 2011 14 REPLY to Response to 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Defendant Wayne Hoehn. (DeVoy, James)
March 7, 2011 13 RESPONSE to 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. Replies due by 3/24/2011. (Mangano, Shawn)
February 18, 2011 12 Featured Case ORDER Granting 10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. John Charles Coons withdrawn from the case. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 2/18/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 14, 2011 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Wayne Hoehn that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case.. (DeVoy, James)
February 11, 2011 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by J. Charles Coons. by Plaintiff Righthaven LLC. Motion ripe 2/11/2011. (Coons, John)
February 11, 2011 9 STATEMENT of Material Facts Not Genuinely In Dispute re 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; by Defendant Wayne Hoehn. (DeVoy, James)
February 11, 2011 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Wayne Hoehn. Responses due by 3/7/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Wayne Hoehn, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Declaration of J. Malcolm DeVoy)(DeVoy, James)
February 4, 2011 7 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, filed by Wayne Hoehn. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 2/14/2011. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/21/2011.(DeVoy, James)
February 3, 2011 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Righthaven LLC re 4 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint,. Wayne Hoehn served on 1/14/2011, answer due 2/4/2011. (Mangano, Shawn)
January 21, 2011 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Righthaven LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Net Sortie Systems, LLC, Corporate Parent SI Content Monitor LLC for Righthaven LLC added.. (Coons, John)
January 12, 2011 4 Summons Issued as to Wayne Hoehn re 1 Complaint. (MMM)
January 12, 2011 3 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office, with copy of complaint. (MMM)
January 12, 2011 2 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (MMM)
January 11, 2011 Case assigned to Judge Philip M. Pro and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston. (MMM)
January 11, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against Wayne Hoehn (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0978-1849190), filed by Righthaven LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 1/21/2011. Proof of service due by 5/11/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Coons, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Righthaven LLC v. Hoehn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Hoehn
Represented By: James M DeVoy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Righthaven LLC
Represented By: Shawn A. Mangano
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
702) 527-5909 (fax: John Charles Coons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]