Edick v. Allegiant Air, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Sandra Edick
702) 474-7237 (fax: Allegiant Air, LLC
Defendant: Clark County Department of Aviation
Case Number: 2:2011cv00259
Filed: February 15, 2011
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that counsel for Defendant Allegiant Air shall file a Statement regarding removed action is no later than 3/18/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/8/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 12, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 9 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/12/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
June 9, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying as moot 22 Defendant Clark County Department of Aviation's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/9/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 27, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defendant Allegiant Air LLC's 34 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/27/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
October 3, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 48 Motion for Re-Taxation of Costs. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/3/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edick v. Allegiant Air, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Edick
Represented By: Thomas F. Christensen
Represented By: David F Sampson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
702) 474-7237 (fax: Allegiant Air, LLC
Represented By: Bruce Scott Dickinson
Represented By: Roger W Clark
Represented By: Michael E. Hottman
Represented By: David C. McGovern
Represented By: Jacqueline N. Walton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Department of Aviation
Represented By: Christopher Young
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]